Edward Deets Holding Company, Inc
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 5:11-bk-06869
District Judge Robert N. Opel II, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.pamb.5-11-bk-06869 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Edward Deets Holding Company, Inc, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JEFFREY D. SERVIN +1 215 665 1212 +1 215 654 0357 jdservin@comcast.net
No Logo Michael G Oleyar (Trustee), Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gregory Benjamin Schiller +1 717 221 4515 +1 717 221 4554 Gregory.B.Schiller@usdoj.gov
  Entries (18) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 95 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo for hearing scheduled on: 04/19/2012 Matter: Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 by US Trustee (#39), Objection filed #43. Appearances: Gregory Schiller, Jeffrey Dean Servin by CourtCall. Disposition: Hearing held, Motion to Convert Case settled, Stipulation to be filed within seven (7) days. Record made. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (vCal Hearing ID (195744)). (RE: related document(s)39). (George, Deborah) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 93 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo for hearing scheduled on: 04/12/2012 Matter: Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 by US Trustee (#39), Objection filed #43. Appearances: Gregory Schiller, Esq. Disposition: Hearing Called and Continued (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (vCal Hearing ID (192722)). (RE: related document(s)39). Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2012 at 10:00 AM at 3rd & Walnut Sts, Bankruptcy Courtroom (3rd Fl), Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Harrisburg, PA17101. (Tracy, Jane) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 92 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
Notice is given that counsel intends to appear telephonically at the hearing. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by U.S. Trustee (RE: related document(s) 84 ). (Schiller, Gregory) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 91 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
Certification that 341 Meeting of Creditors Held. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Schiller, Gregory) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 86 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing 3/8/2012 on Motion #51 to Compel Attendanceat Deposition; held. Record Made. Motion Settled. Order to be entered. Appearances: Jeffrey Dean Servin, Esq, Martin J. Weis, Esq.. Non-Appearances: N/A. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (RE: related document(s)51). (Tracy, Jane) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 85 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing 3/8/2012 on Motion #66 to Extend Time to Appeal Under Rule 8002(c); record made. Order to be entered Dismissing Motion for Lack of case or controversy. Appearances: Jeffrey Dean Servin, Esq., Kimberly Bonner, Esq.. Non-Appearances: N/A. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (RE: related document(s)66). (Tracy, Jane) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 84 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing 3/8/2012 on Motion #39 to Convert Case to Chapter 7; called and continued Appearances: Jeffrey Dean Servin, Esq., Gregory Schiller, Esq.. Non-Appearances: N/A. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (RE: related document(s)39). Hearing scheduled for 4/12/2012 at 09:30 AM at 197 South Main Street, Courtroom 2, Max Rosenn US Courthouse, Wilkes-Barre, PA 18701. (Tracy, Jane) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
Notice is given that counsel intends to appear telephonically at the hearing. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by U.S. Trustee (RE: related document(s)45). (Schiller, Gregory) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing 12/14/2011 on Motion #22 to compel response to request of production of documents cancelled.; not held. No objections filed. Order to be entered. Appearances: N/A. Non-Appearances: N/A. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (RE: related document(s)22). (Tracy, Jane) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
Corrective Entry - Entered in Error. Please disregard. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (RE: related document(s) 18 ). (Wilson, Tonia) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
ENTERED IN ERROR Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. (RE: related document(s)1). (Wilson, Tonia) Modified on 11/1/2011 to add text (Wilson, Tonia). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
Matrix filed/Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Jeffrey Dean Servin on behalf of Edward Deets Holding Company, Inc (RE: related document(s)1). (Servin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
Entry of Appearance under 2002 Filed by Martin J Weis of Dilworth Paxson LLP on behalf of Transportation International Pool, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Weis, Martin) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 10/9/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Ch 11 document upon the Securities and Exchange Commission (RE: related document(s) 1 ). Service Date 10/09/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 10/9/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Deficient Filing (Missing Documents) (RE: related document(s) 2 ). Service Date 10/09/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
Notice to Filing Party (J. Servin): Discrepancy between CM/ECF and image. (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Wilson, Tonia) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
Notice of missing documents (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Wilson, Tonia) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 1039.00 Filed by Jeffrey Dean Servin on behalf of Edward Deets Holding Company, Inc. (Servin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 188 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?