William Brandon Prothman
South Carolina Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-06751
District Judge John E. Waites, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.scb.11-06751 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Amanda C Prothman, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaffney Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David C. Gaffney +1 803 528 6972 david@gaffneylawfirm.com
No Logo William Brandon Prothman, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaffney Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David C. Gaffney +1 803 528 6972 david@gaffneylawfirm.com
  Entries (9) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 34 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
Confirmation Hearing Continued. JW. Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/30/2012 at 09:00 AM at Columbia. The case judge is John E. Waites. (Babb, A) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
PACER 22 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Confirmation Hearing Held - JW. CII Order - The plan does not currently comply with the requirements of Chapter 13. Therefore, confirmation of the plan as presently filed is denied. The debtor(s) is/are given ten (10) days from the date of this Order within which to propose and file an amended plan, along with an affidavit which certifies that a copy of such amended plan was mailed to the holder of any claim whose rights may have been adversely affected by an amendment to the plan as previously filed. If no such amended plan and/or certificate of mailing is filed, this case may be dismissed without further notice or hearing. If filed and not confirmed, a continued confirmation hearing shall be held on the amended plan on 03/01/2012 at 09:00AM in Columbia. Any other conditions incident to confirmation which may have been made orally by the Court during the hearing are hereby made a part of this order. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed By: Chief Judge John E. Waites, US Bankruptcy Court - District of South Carolina.(Admin) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
PACER 21 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
Trustee Request For C-II Order Denying Confirmation and Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing. Request that debtor(s) be allowed to file an amended plan in a timely manner and in the absence of such filing that this case be dismissed. Filed by William K. Stephenson Jr. (related document(s)6). Hearing scheduled for 3/1/2012 at 09:00 AM at Columbia. (Stephenson, William) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
PACER 19 Filed: 11/20/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Badcock Home, 592 Bobby Jones Expwy, Martinez GA 30907-5324 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Badcock Home, PO Box 497, Mulberry FL 33860 Filed by David C. Gaffney of Gaffney Law Firm on behalf of Amanda C Prothman, William Brandon Prothman. (Gaffney, David) (Entered: 11/20/2011)
PACER 18 Filed: 11/20/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Odpt/Cbna, 811 East 10th Street, Sioux Falls SD 57103-1647 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Odpt/Cbna, 701 E. 60t St. N., Sioux Falls SD 57104 Filed by David C. Gaffney of Gaffney Law Firm on behalf of Amanda C Prothman, William Brandon Prothman. (Gaffney, David) (Entered: 11/20/2011)
PACER 17 Filed: 11/20/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Bank of America, PO Box 17054, Wilmington DE 19850-7054 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Bank of America, PO Box 982238, El Paso TX 79998-2238 Filed by David C. Gaffney of Gaffney Law Firm on behalf of Amanda C Prothman, William Brandon Prothman. (Gaffney, David) (Entered: 11/20/2011)
PACER 16 Filed: 11/20/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: WFNNB/Abercrombie Fitc, POB 18548, Columbus, OH 43213 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: WFNNB / Abercrombie Fitch, PO Box 182273, Columbus, OH 43218-2273 Filed by David C. Gaffney of Gaffney Law Firm on behalf of Amanda C Prothman, William Brandon Prothman. (Gaffney, David) (Entered: 11/20/2011)
PACER 14 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Gold's Gym, 101 Edgewood Drive, North Augusta SC 29841 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Gold's Gym, 133 Edgewood Drive, North Augusta SC 29841-2878 Filed by David C. Gaffney of Gaffney Law Firm on behalf of Amanda C Prothman, William Brandon Prothman. (Gaffney, David) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
PACER 13 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Wfnnb/The Company Stor, PO Box 2974, Shawnee Mission KS 66201-1374 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Wfnnb/The Company Store, 500 Company Store Road, LaCrosse WI 54601-4477 Filed by David C. Gaffney of Gaffney Law Firm on behalf of Amanda C Prothman, William Brandon Prothman. (Gaffney, David) (Entered: 11/10/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 47 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?