Linda Hawkins et al v. General Mills Inc et al
California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-03306
District Judge Dean D. Pregerson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.2-12-cv-03306 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo George Stez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Christopher B Hayes +1 424 256 2884 +1 424 256 2885 chayes@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Edlridge Bower , +1 310 839 0442 +1 310 558 3005 davidbower@mac.com
No Logo Linda Hawkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Christopher B Hayes +1 424 256 2884 +1 424 256 2885 chayes@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Edlridge Bower , +1 310 839 0442 +1 310 558 3005 davidbower@mac.com
v.
General Mills, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Yoplait Usa, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2301
Nature of Suit 890 Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (11) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 11 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Pursuant to this Stipulation 10 of the parties dated 7/13/2012 and good cause appearing, that (1) Plaintiff shall have twenty one (21) days after the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota rules on Defendants' motion to dismiss in the Taradejna action to amend the currently pending complaint in this action, if she elects to do so; (2) Defendants General Mills, Inc. and Yoplait USA, Inc., will have twenty eight (28) days from the expiration of Plaintiff's twenty-one (21) day period, to either answer or otherwise respond to any amended complaint filed by Plaintiff. (3) This stipulation shall not alter the Court's prior Order regarding the class certification briefing schedule. (jp) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants General Mills Inc, Yoplait USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bali, Sunita) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
ORDER granting Stipulation 6 Defendants General Mills, Inc. and Yoplait USA, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 16, 2012.Plaintiffs deadline to file a motion for class certification shall not begoverned by the Courts Local Rule 23-3. Rather, the parties will reach an agreement on a deadline to a date prior to the close of fact discovery to be set as part of the parties proposed schedule prior to the parties Scheduling Conference. (lc) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff George Stez, Linda Hawkins, upon Defendant General Mills Inc served on 4/18/2012, answer due 5/9/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brandon Sjelin - Person authorized to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Bower, David) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
PACER 7 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. The Court requires delivery of two non-blue backed Mandatory Chambers Copies of onlythe following manual and electronically filed documents: (1) All noticed motions and related documents; (2) All ex parte applications and related documents; and (3) All exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. [Refer to the Court's General Order No. 10-07 regarding ECF Courtesy Paper Copies.] (sch) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
PACER 6 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 16, 2012 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendants General Mills Inc, Yoplait USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Biderman, David) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
PACER 5 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David T Biderman on behalf of Defendants General Mills Inc, Yoplait USA Inc (Biderman, David) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
PACER 4 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff George Stez, Linda Hawkins, upon Defendant Yoplait USA Inc served on 4/24/2012, answer due 5/15/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Francis Burris - National Registered Agents (authorized agent) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Bower, David) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
PACER 3 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
PACER 2 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Linda Hawkins, George Stez. (et) (mg). (Entered: 04/19/2012)
PACER 1 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, General Mills Inc, Yoplait USA Inc.Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs George Stez, Linda Hawkins. (et) (mg). (Entered: 04/19/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 82 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?