Araceli Sotelo
Illinois Northern Bankruptcy Court - Chicago, Case No. 11-47456
District Judge A. Benjamin Goldgar, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnb.11-47456 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Araceli Sotelo, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Harold M Saalfeld, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Harold Marc Saalfeld +1 847 249 7538 +1 847 249 3301 haroldsaalfeld@yahoo.com
  Entries (4) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 15 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
Bankruptcy Case Closed and Trustee Discharged . (Simmons, Carina) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 12/24/2011, Entered: None
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, John E Gierum, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 103437.00, Assets Exempt: $ 16030.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 133703.80, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 133703.80. (Gierum, John) (Entered: 12/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/23/2011 at 03:00 PM at Park City Branch Court, 301 Greenleaf Ave, Rm B, Park City, Illinois 60085-5725. Objections for Discharge due by 02/21/2012. (Saalfeld, Harold) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(11-47456) [misc,volp7a] ( 306.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18634221. Fee Amount $ 306.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 31 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?