Robert Briseno v. Conagra Foods, Inc.
California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-05379
District Judge Margaret M. Morrow, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.2-11-cv-05379 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Alexis Justak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sarah Nicole Westcot +1 925 482 1515 +1 925 407 2700 swestcot@bursor.com

Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A Bursor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott A. Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 scott@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Anita Willman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Anne Cowan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Bonnie McDonald, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Brenda Krein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed and Weiss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric David Freed +1 312 220 0000 +1 312 220 7777 eric@freedweiss.com
Julie Diane Miller +1 312 220 0000 juliem@freedweiss.com

Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheller, Ludwig & Badey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott Alan George +1 215 790 7300 +1 215 546 0942 sgeorge@sheller.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Cheri Shafstall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Christi Toomer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Francis M. Gregorek +1 619 231 1058

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edmund S Aronowitz +1 312 984 0000 aronowitz@whafh.com
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Erika Heins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Janeth Ruiz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leopold-Kuvin, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Charles Wright +1 561 514 0904 +1 561 514 0905 willwright@wrightlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Jill Crouch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Julie Palmer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Kelly McFadden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Reese Richman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael Robert Reese +1 212 579 4625 +1 212 253 4272 michael@reeserichman.com
Kim Eleazer Richman +1 212 643 0500 +1 212 253 4272 ker@kerichman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Leonora Ulitsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sarah Nicole Westcot +1 925 482 1515 +1 925 407 2700 swestcot@bursor.com

Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A Bursor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott A. Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 scott@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Lil Marie-Birr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Maureen Towey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Michele Andrade, Plaintiff

Represented by Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Necla Musat, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Patty Boyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Pauline Michael, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Phyllis Scarpelli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sarah Nicole Westcot +1 925 482 1515 +1 925 407 2700 swestcot@bursor.com

Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A Bursor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott A. Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 scott@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Robert Briseno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Andrei V Rado +1 212 907 0821 +1 212 883 7521 arado@labaton.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Rona Johnston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
v.
Conagra Foods, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 150 Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
  Entries (593) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 570 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 569 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 568 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 567 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 566 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 565 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 564 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 563 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 562 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Leave to Appear
Request RequestSpace
PACER 561 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 559 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Appear
Request RequestSpace
PACER 558 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 557 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 556 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 555 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 554 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 553 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 552 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 551 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 550 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 549 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 548 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace
PACER 546 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Stay Case
Request RequestSpace
PACER 545 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Certify Class Action
Request RequestSpace
PACER 544 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 543 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace
PACER 542 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 541 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 540 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 539 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Leave re Discovery Matter
Request RequestSpace
PACER 538 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 537 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 536 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 535 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 534 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 533 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 531 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 530 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 528 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace
PACER 526 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 525 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 524 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 523 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 522 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 521 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 518 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 517 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 516 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 515 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 512 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 511 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 510 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 509 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 508 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 507 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 506 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 505 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 505 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- AMENDED DECLARATION of Dr. Elizabeth Howlett in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 504 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace
PACER 504 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXPART AMENDED DECLARATION of Colin B Weir in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 503 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 503 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- REBUTTAL REPLY DECLARATION of Colin B Weir in Support of Plaintiffs' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 502 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 502 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Laura Coombe in Support of Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Opposition to PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 501 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 501 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Opposition to PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING CONAGRA'S LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS MATERIAL TO CLASS CERTIFICATION.(mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 500 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 500 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION OF HENRY J. KELSTON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING CONAGRA'S LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS MATERIAL TO CLASS CERTIFICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 499 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 499 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING CONAGRA'S LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS MATERIAL TO CLASS CERTIFICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 498 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 498 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION to Defendant Conagra's MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATIONS OF COLIN B. WEIR AND ELIZABETH HOWLETT, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATIONS OF COLIN WEIR, BETSY HOWLETT, JOHN KOZUP, AND CHARLES BENBROOK IN SUPPORT THEREOF.(mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 497 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 497 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT REPLY DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Support of (1) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND (2) IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATIONS OF COLIN B. WEIR AND ELIZABETH HOWLETT, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 496 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 496 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT REPLY DECLARATION of Colin B Weir in Support of (1) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND (2) IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATIONS OF COLIN B. WEIR AND ELIZABETH HOWLETT, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 495 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 495 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 494 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 494 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY DECLARATION OF KEITH UGONE, PH.D. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2015: # 1 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 1) (mat). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 493 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 493 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 492 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 491 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 491 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- REBUTTAL DECLARATION OF COLIN B. WEIR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 490 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 489 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 489 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- AMENDED DECLARATION OF DR. ELIZABETH HOWLETT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION.(mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 488 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 488 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 44 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 487 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 487 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 43 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 486 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 486 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 42 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 485 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 485 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 36 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 484 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 484 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 35 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 483 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 483 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 34 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 482 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 482 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 30 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 481 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 481 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 29 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 480 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 480 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 28 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 479 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 479 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 27 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 478 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 478 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 26 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 477 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 477 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 25 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 476 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 476 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 24 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 475 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 475 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 20 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 474 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 474 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 18 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 473 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: MOTION to Compel DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. RELATING TO CONAGRAS LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 426 , 447 . COUNSEL RESIDING OUT OF STATE ONLY may appear telephonically for the hearing set on 1/13/2015 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The call in information for the OUT OF STATE COUNSEL is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 1114#; and User Password: 6024#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space & Facilities Held Desk at (213) 894-1400.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 472 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 472 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 15 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 471 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 471 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 14 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 470 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 470 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 12 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 469 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 469 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 11 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 468 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 468 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 10 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 467 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 467 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 9 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 466 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 466 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 8 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 465 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 465 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 7 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 464 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 464 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 5 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 463 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 463 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 4 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 462 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 462 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 3 in Support of Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification.(mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 461 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 461 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 460 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace
PACER 460 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXPERT AMENDED DECLARATION of Colin B. Weir in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 459 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 459 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Amended MOTION for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 458 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing on Discovery Motions
Request RequestSpace
PACER 457 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc., re Response,,,,, 456 served on 01/08/2015. (Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 456 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 455 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 455 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of JOINT STIPULATION on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production from Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Relating to Conagra's Late Production of Documents.(mat) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 454 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 454 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Supplemental Memorandum in Support of JOINT STIPULATION on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Relating to Conagra's Late Production of Documents. (mat) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 453 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to sealed document 542 was docketed separately in error. (mat) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 452 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Exhibit (non-trial)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 452 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT A-H (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 451 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 451 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David E. Azar in Support of JOINT STIPULATION on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Relating to Conagra's Late Production of Documents. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2015: # 1 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits A-H, # 2 part 2 of EXHIBITS A-H, # 3 part 3 of EXHIBITS A-H , # 4 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS I-J part 1, # 5 part 2 of Exhibits I-J , # 6 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits K-M part 1, # 7 part 2 of EXHIBITS K-M ) (mat). Modified on 1/8/2015 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 450 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace
PACER 450 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Cydney Chappel in Support of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Portions of the Joint Stipulation. (mat) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 449 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 449 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Relating to Conagra's Late Production of Documents. (mat) Modified on 1/8/2015 (mat). (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 448 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 447 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace
PACER 446 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Andrew G. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14998195 paid.) 444 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signature on Application. Local counsel did not sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64).. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 445 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 445 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 444 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew W. Phillips on behalf of Defendant, designating A. Brooks Gresham as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 444 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 443 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 443 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Applications to File Under Seal; Granting Defendant's Application to File Under Seal by Judge Margaret M. Morrow granting in part and denying in part 380 Ex Parte Application; granting in part and denying in part 382 Ex Parte Application; granting in part and denying in part 411 Application; granting in part and denying in part 414 Ex Parte Application. Counsel are directed to resubmit the documents identified in the applications under seal by January 8, 2015. The parties are also directed to publicly file versions of each document, which have been redacted in compliance with this order, by the same date. (see document for further details) (bm) Modified on 12/30/2014 (ah). (Entered: 12/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 442 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace
PACER 441 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 440 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Stay Case
Request RequestSpace
PACER 439 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. RELATING TO CONAGRA'S LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 426 scheduled for December 30, 2014 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. The Court takes the motion under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 438 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 437 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Decision: Notice of Recent Authority in Support of Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application to Stay (Dkt #433); Exhibit "A" - USDC ND CA Order Staying Case filed by defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 436 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 435 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 434 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 433 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Stay Case
Request RequestSpace
PACER 432 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 431 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 430 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Decision: (1) USDC ND CA Granting Defendant's Summary Judgment; and (2) USDC ND CA Granting Defendant's Motion to Decertify filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 429 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Electronic Filing re APPLICATION for Order for TO SEAL APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF: (1) JOINT STIPULATION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. RELATING TO CONAGRAS LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, (2) DECLARATION OF 425 , MOTION to Compel DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. RELATING TO CONAGRAS LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 426 , Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion 427 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 428 e-mailed to Attorney Benjamin Diggs at Hogan Lovells US LLP bounced due to invalid email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 428 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Robert Briseno, re APPLICATION for Order for TO SEAL APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF: (1) JOINT STIPULATION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. RELATING TO CONAGRAS LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, (2) DECLARATION OF 425 PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL served on December 9, 2014. (Azar, David) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 427 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 426 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 425 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 424 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace
PACER 423 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Bower counsel for Plaintiffs Alexis Justak, Phyllis Scarpelli, Leonora Ulitsky. Christopher Marlborough is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Phyllis Scarpelli, Alexis Justak, Leonora Ulitsky. (Attorney David E Bower added to party Alexis Justak(pty:pla), Attorney David E Bower added to party Phyllis Scarpelli(pty:pla), Attorney David E Bower added to party Leonora Ulitsky(pty:pla))(Bower, David) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 422 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel. (Azar, David) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 421 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Azar counsel for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Nicole M. Duckett is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 420 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 419 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend The Motion for Class Certification & Appointment of Class Counsel 363 and Defendant ConAgra's Motion to Strike Declarations to Motion for Class Certification 387 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: The court, on its motion, continues the motions to 11/24/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 418 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace
PACER 417 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc., re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), 415 served on 11/13/2014. (Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 416 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 415 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 414 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 413 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Robert Briseno, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order [REDACTED] PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING CONAGRAS LATE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS MATERIAL TO CLASS CERTIFICATION 412 PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL served on 11/12/2014. (Azar, David) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 412 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 411 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 410 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 410 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Robert Brisenoto Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 407 Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Azar, David) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 409 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 408 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 407 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 406 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 405 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 404 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Errata 399 . (bm) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 403 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Robert Briseno, re APPLICATION for Order for TO SEAL APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF: (1) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, (2) DECLARATION OF MARY S. THOMAS IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLA 402 (Azar, David) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 402 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 401 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 400 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 399 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE Errata filed by Plaintiffs Robert Briseno. NOTICE OF ERRATA RE SIGNATURE PAGE OF REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION [DOC 393] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Azar, David) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 398 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 397 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 396 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 395 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 394 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 393 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 392 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 391 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Hearing re MOTION to Strike Declarations of Weir and Howlett in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification Declaration (Motion related) 367 , Declaration (Motion related) 368 387 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 390 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace
PACER 389 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 388 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 387 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace
PACER 386 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 385 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 384 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 383 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 382 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 381 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 380 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 379 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 379 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 376 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard T. Taylor on behalf of Defendant, designating Laura E. Coombe as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 378 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 377 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document, 366 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Errata. Other error(s) with document(s): Applicant failed to supply Good Standing Certificates for each of the state bar for each of the states that the attorney is admitted of that particular state bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 376 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 375 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Robert Briseno, re Amended MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel 363 PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL served on 09/08/2014. (Azar, David) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 374 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING PROOF OF SERVICE DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL 372 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) 373 . The incorrect event was selected. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency issued on September 9, 2014, and refile the Proof of Service using the correct event. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 373 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service of Documents filed Under Seal 372 . (bm) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 372 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Affidavit
Request RequestSpace
PACER 371 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 370 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 369 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 368 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 367 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 366 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace
PACER 365 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 364 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 363 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Certify Class Action
Request RequestSpace
PACER 362 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING Angela M. Spivey TO SUBMIT GOOD STANDING CERTIFICATE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) 360 . Angela M. Spivey is directed to submit cure the deficiency issued on 09/05/2014 (Docket No. 360) and submit Good Standing Certificate required by Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3 on or before 09/15/2014. Failure to do so will result in the court striking her application. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 361 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 360 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Angela M. Spivey to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14401772 paid.) 359 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Applicant failed to supply Good Standing Certificates for each of the state bar for each of the states that the attorney is admitted of that particular state bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 359 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 358 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace
PACER 357 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint REQUEST for Ruling ON JOINT REPORT SETTING FORTH PARTIES PROPOSED SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS FOR FILING AND BRIEFING OF AN AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DKT. 334) 355 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. (NO PROPOSED ORDER)In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lw) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 356 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Enlargement of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace
PACER 355 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Ruling
Request RequestSpace
PACER 354 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED APPLICATION AND DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE PORTIONS OF THE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER SEAL (DKT. No. 281) by Judge Margaret M. Morrow granting 346 Ex Parte Application: The Renewed Application to File Portions of the Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification under Seal came before this Court. Upon review of the Renewed Application, and the supporting Declaration of HealthFocus International and exhibits thereto, the Court finds that good cause exists to seal the following document in support of the Declaration of Adam J. Levitt in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification: Exhibit D a true and correct copy of the first 32 pages of a report by HealthFocus International, Health Focus Natural Study (2011), bearing Bates number HEALTHFOCUS00003465 through HEALTHFOCUS00003496. The Renewed Application is GRANTED. (bm) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 353 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Exhibit (non-trial)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 352 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING CONAGRA'S RENEWED APPLICATION 337 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Motion Related Document,, 337 . The court grants ConAgra's renewed application to seal Exhibit L (supplemental brief in support of application to file portions of the reply, etc under seal. Docket No. 281).THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 351 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Notice of Filing Transcript 348 , Transcript (CV),, 347 , as to Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Court Reporter. Court will contact Sherlynn Hicks at SHicks@mcguirewoods.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Class Certification and Motion to Strike, July 14, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Gresham, A) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 350 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Order
PACER 349 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Dismiss Party
Request RequestSpace
PACER 348 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, JULY 14, 2014 10:08 A.M. re Transcript 347 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 347 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, JULY 14, 2014 10:08 A.M. Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2014. (Nirenberg, C) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 346 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 345 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 344 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 343 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) STRIKING MEMORANDUM by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: MOTION to Certify Class Redacted Version of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal 332 . Incorrect document attached. See deficiency issued on 07/21/2014 342 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 342 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Certify Class 332 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. (bp) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 341 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Robert Briseno Court Reporter. Court will contact Jennifer Conte at jconte@milberg.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 07/14/14 Motion to Certify Class. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Azar, David) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 340 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Amendment (Motion related) 338 . The document is stricken for the following reasons: 1.The text entry and attached document do not match. 2. Incorrect event selected. The document should be filed under Ex Parte Applications. 3. Plaintiff must comply with the procedures for the Under Seal Program. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 339 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED** EXHIBIT 4 IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF HENRY J. KELSTON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION Filed filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. as to Exhibit to Motion 329 . (bp) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 338 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
[STRICKEN] Amendment to APPLICATION for Order for for Permission to File Portions of the Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Declarations in Support Thereof, and Evidentiary Objections, Under Seal 281 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of HealthFocus International In Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Application To File Portions of the Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Seal (Dkt#281))(Coombe, Laura) Modified on 7/22/2014 (ah). (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 337 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Application to File Portion of the Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Seal (Dkt. #281) re APPLICATION for Order for for Permission to File Portions of the Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Declarations in Support Thereof, and Evidentiary Objections, Under Seal 281 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support)(Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 336 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Exhibit O in Support of Declaration of Adam J. Levitt in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification as to Declaration (Motion related), 287 . (Azar, David) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 335 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), 266 of Raquelle Hunter filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 334 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT of Parties' Proposed Schedule and Page Limits for Filing and Briefing An Amended Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Robert Briseno, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Lil Marie-Birr, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Cheri Shafstall, Maureen Towey, Anita Willman. (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 333 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED** PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHROTIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR re MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (bp) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 332 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
[STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Redacted Version of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Coombe, Laura) Modified on 7/23/2014 (ah). (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 331 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
EXHIBIT 21 IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF HENRY J. KELSTON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION Filed filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. as to Declaration (Motion related) 244 . (bp) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 330 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED** EXHIBIT 27 IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF HENRY J. KELSTON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (bp) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 329 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 30 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 328 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 29 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 327 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 28 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification.(mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 326 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 26 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 325 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 25 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification.(mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 324 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 24 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 323 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 20 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification.(mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 322 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 18 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 321 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 15 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 320 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 14 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 319 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 12 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification.(mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 318 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 11 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 317 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 10 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 316 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 9 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 315 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 8 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 314 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 7 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 313 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 5 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 312 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 3 in Support of DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 311 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT N in Support of DECLARATION of Adam J. Levitt in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in further support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 310 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT M in Support of DECLARATION of Adam J. Levitt in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in further support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 309 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT F in Support of DECLARATION of Adam J. Levitt in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in further support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 308 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT E in Support of DECLARATION of Adam J. Levitt in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in further support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 307 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Plaintiff's Motion to Certify and Appointment of Class Counsel 241 Defendant's Motion to Strike Declaration of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, PH.D. 262 Motion Hearing held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court having fully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, denies plaintiffs' motion for class certification without oral argument of counsel, denies plaintiffs' motion for class certification without prejudice to its renewal. If grants defendant's motion to strike the declaration of Colin Weir for purposes of this proceeding only. It grants in party and denies in part defendant's motion to strike the declaration of Charles Benbrook for purposes of this proceeding only. Counsel shall meet and confer and submit to the Court, no later than 1 week from today, a joint report that sets forth the parties' proposed schedule for the filing and briefing of an amended motion for class certification. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court will issue a final order that embodies these rulings after it receives the joint report from counsel. All other case management dates remain unchanged.Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg. (bp) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 306 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED**DECLARATION of Robert B. Hawk in opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 DECL PART TWO)(bp) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 305 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED** DECLARATION of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D, in opposition to Plaintiffs' MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 DECL PART TWO, # 2 DECL PART THREE, # 3 DECL PART FOUR, # 4 DECL PART FIVE, # 5 DECL PART SIX, # 6 DECL PART SEVEN)(bp) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 304 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED** DECLARATION of Dominique M. Hanssens, PH.D. in opposition to plaintiffs' MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (bp) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 303 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED** DECLARATION of Raquelle Hunter in opposition to Plaintiffs' MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (bp) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 302 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
**SEALED** DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' re MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (bp) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 301 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, re Order on Application for Order, 300 , APPLICATION for Order for for Permission to File Portions of the Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Declarations in Support Thereof, and Evidentiary Objections, Under Seal 281 : Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. ("ConAgra") applied to the Court for an order sealing documents disclosing ConAgra's and third party Information Resources, Inc.'s confidential information. The Court finds that compelling reasons exist to seal the following, and the justifications for sealing outweigh any public interest in disclosure of the specified materials: 1. Confidential portions of Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; 2. Confidential portions of the Declaration of Raquelle Hunter in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification; 3. Confidential portions of the Declaration of Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification; 4. Confidential portions of the Declaration of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and exhibits thereto; and 5. Exhibit O to the Declaration of Robert B. Hawk. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unredacted versions of the above-listed documents be sealed. (lw) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 300 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Applications to File Under Seal; Granting Defendant's Application to File Under Seal by Judge Margaret M. Morrow denying 261 Application; granting 264 Application for Order; granting in part and denying in part 281 Application: For the reasons stated, the court denies plaintiffs' first application to seal Weir's declaration, and grants the remainder of the application. The court grants ConAgra's application to seal in its entirety. The court denies plaintiffs' second application to seal Exhibits D and O to Levitt's declaration, and plaintiffs' evidentiary objections to Hunter's declaration. The court defers ruling on Exhibit L to Levitt's declaration, and directs ConAgra to file a supplemental brief and/or declaration identifying the portions of Dr. Ugone's deposition transcript it seeks to seal, and the compelling reasons that support sealing, no later than July 18, 2014. The court grants plaintiffs' second application to seal Exhibits E, F, M, and N to Levitt's declaration. Plaintiffs may file a renewed application to seal within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this order, identifying those portions of the documents they seek to have sealed, the confidential information they contain, and the compelling reasons that justify their sealing, including the specific harm that would result from publicly disclosing the allegedly confidential information. Where appropriate, plaintiffs should file proposed redacted versions of the documents for the court's review. As with the present applications, the court directs ConAgra to cooperate with plaintiffs in preparing any renewed application. If plaintiffs do not file a renewed application to seal the documents, they are directed to file unredacted copies of the documents for which the court has denied their application publicly within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this order. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 299 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO NEW EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR THE FIRST TIME ON REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 298 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re: MOTION to Certify Class 241 to New Evidence Submitted by Plaintiffs for the First Time on Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 297 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Recent Authority filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Robert Briseno, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Cheri Shafstall, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A In re IKO Roofing Shingle Products Liability Litigation, No. 14-1532 (7th Cir. July 2, 2014))(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 296 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
REPLY in support MOTION to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, Ph.D. MOTION to Certify Class 241 262 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Gresham, A) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 295 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
REPLY support APPLICATION for Order for for Permission to File Portions of the Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Declarations in Support Thereof, and Evidentiary Objections, Under Seal 281 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gresham, A) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 294 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE LEGAL ARGUMENTS AND DECLARATION by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: APPLICATION for Order for for Permission to File Portions of the Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Declarations in Support Thereof, and Evidentiary Objections, Under Seal 281 . Defendant is directed to provide legal argument and declaration in response to the ex parte application to seal by 5pm, July 2, 2014. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 293 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Recent Authority filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 292 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit)(Azar, David) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 291 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Edmund S. Aronowitz in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits 61-68 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Azar, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 290 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Edmund S. Aronowitz in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits 41-60 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Azar, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 289 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Edmund S. Aronowitz in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits 21-40 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Azar, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 288 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Dr. Elizabeth Howlett In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 287 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Adam J. Levitt in Support of MOTION to Certify Class 241 Reply Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C part 1, # 4 Exhibit C part 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P)(Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 286 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Pauline Michael In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class 241 Reply Declaration of Plaintiff Pauline Michael In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 285 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of COLIN B. WEIR In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class 241 REBUTTAL DECLARATION OF COLIN B. WEIR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 284 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix 3, # 2 Appendix Appendix 4, # 3 Appendix Appendix 5)(Azar, David) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 283 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), 266 of Raquelle Hunter filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 282 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), 267 of Dominique M. Hanssens filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 281 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Order for for Permission to File Portions of the Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Declarations in Support Thereof, and Evidentiary Objections, Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Azar, # 2 Proposed Order)(Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 280 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, Ph.D. MOTION to Certify Class 241 262 filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edmund S. Aronowitz in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 279 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE TIME FOR HEARING ON CONAGRA FOODS, INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATIONS OF COLIN B. WEIR AND CHARLES M. BENBROOK, PH.D. by Judge Margaret M. Morrow granting 277 Ex Parte Application: NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The ex parte Application by Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. for an order advancing the time for hearing on ConAgras Motion to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, Ph.D. came before this Court. Upon review of the Application, the supporting Declaration of Laura Coombe and exhibits thereto, and any opposition thereto, the Court orders as follows: the Application is GRANTED. ConAgra's Motion to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook is set for hearing on July 14, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to strike is due no later than June 26, 2014, and ConAgra's reply is due no later than July 3, 2014. (bm) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 278 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Advancing the Time for Hearing on ConAgra Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, Ph.D. 262 and Declaration of Laura Coombe in Support (with Exhibit) 277 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Azar, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 277 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Advancing the Time for Hearing on ConAgra Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, Ph.D. 262 and Declaration of Laura Coombe in Support (with Exhibit) filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 276 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 275 Request to Substitute Attorney A. Brooks Gresham as attorney of record instead of Attorney Robert B Hawk for Defendant ConAgra Foods Inc. (lom) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 275 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
REQUEST to Substitute Request for Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 274 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman, re MOTION to Withdraw Individual Claims of Plaintiffs McDonald and Scarpelli MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Phyllis Scarpelli, Bonnie McDonald 273 served on 6/3/14. (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 273 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw Individual Claims of Plaintiffs McDonald and Scarpelli ( Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow.), MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Phyllis Scarpelli, Bonnie McDonald filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Christi Toomer, Lil Marie-Birr, Anita Willman, Robert Briseno, Brenda Krein, Phyllis Scarpelli, Julie Palmer, Pauline Michael, Kelly McFadden, Rona Johnston, Erika Heins, Leonora Ulitsky, Patty Boyer, Bonnie McDonald, Jill Crouch, Maureen Towey, Necla Musat, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Cheri Shafstall, Anne Cowan, Janeth Ruiz, Alexis Justak. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 272 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Conagra Foods, Inc., re APPLICATION for Order for Application to Seal 264 served on 6/2/2014. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 271 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Marcella Thompson in Opposition MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 270 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Stacy R. Hovan in Opposition MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 269 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Robert B. Hawk in Opposition APPLICATION for Order for Application to Seal 264 , MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C1, # 2 Exhibit D - E, # 3 Exhibit F - L, # 4 Exhibit M-1, # 5 Exhibit M-2, # 6 Exhibit N-1, # 7 Exhibit N-2, # 8 Exhibit O - R)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 268 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Keith R. Ugone In Opposition APPLICATION for Order for Application to Seal 264 , MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Appendix E, # 6 Exhibit 1-4, # 7 Exhibit 5-14)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 267 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Dominique M. Hanssens, PH.D. in Opposition MOTION to Certify Class 241 , APPLICATION for Order for Application to Seal 264 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-C, # 2 Exhibit 1-3)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 266 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Raquelle Hunter Declaration of Raquelle Hunter in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certiciation and Appointment of Counsel MOTION to Certify Class 241 , APPLICATION for Order for Application to Seal 264 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 265 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
Opposition Defendant Conagra Inc.'s Opposition for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class 241 , APPLICATION for Order for Application to Seal 264 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 264 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION for Order for Application to Seal filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 7/14/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stacy Hovan in Support of Application to Seal, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stacy Hovan, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 263 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Electronic Filing re Renewed APPLICATION for Order for Plaintiffs' Renewed Application to Seal 261 e-mailed to Christopher Marlborough bounced due to invalid/rejected email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 262 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, Ph.D. MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Declarations of Colin B. Weir and Charles M. Benbrook, Ph.D.)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 261 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Renewed APPLICATION for Order for Plaintiffs' Renewed Application to Seal filed by Plaintiff Conagra Foods, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 7/14/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 260 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joan S Dinsmore counsel for Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Adding Joan S. Dinsmore as attorney as counsel of record for Conagra Foods, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attorney Joan S Dinsmore added to party Conagra Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dinsmore, Joan) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 259 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Laura E Coombe counsel for Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Adding Laura Coombe as attorney as counsel of record for Conagra Foods, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attorney Laura E Coombe added to party Conagra Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Coombe, Laura) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 258 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney A Brooks Gresham counsel for Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Adding A. Brooks Gresham as attorney as counsel of record for Conagra Foods, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attorney A Brooks Gresham added to party Conagra Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gresham, A) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 257 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal by Judge Margaret M. Morrow denying 240 Application: Plaintiffs have not met their burden of showing that there are compelling reasons to seal portions of their motion for class certification and thirty supporting exhibits. The court therefore denies the application. Plaintiffs may file a renewed application to seal within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this order, identifying those portions of the documents they seek to have sealed, the confidential information they contain, and the compelling reasons that justify their sealing, including the specific harm that would result from publicly disclosing the allegedly confidential information. Where appropriate, plaintiffs should file proposed redacted versions of the documents for the court's review. Because plaintiffs sought to file the documents under seal because ConAgra had designated them confidential, the court directs ConAgra to cooperate with plaintiffs in preparing any renewed application. If plaintiffs do not file a renewed application to seal the documents, they are directed to file unredacted copies of all documents at issue publicly within ten (10) days of the date of entry of this order. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 256 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING CONAGRA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow granting 254 Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Excess Pages: NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Court, having considered Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Extend Page Limits for Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and to Continue Briefing Schedule, ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: The court grants ConAgra an additional 15 pages for its Opposition brief, and grants plaintiffs 15 additional pages for their Reply brief. The court DENIES ConAgra's request to continue the briefing schedule. (bm) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 255 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE; DECLARATION OF DAVID E. AZAR (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 254 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation for Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and to Continue Briefing Schedule; Declaration of Robert B. Hawk filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 253 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 252 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED (I) REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF MARC 10, 2014 ORDER, AND (II) PROCEDURAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING COMPLIANCE AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS 248 filed by Plaintiffs. (mp) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 251 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY ARGUMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF MARCH 10, 2014 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting 250 Ex Parte Application for Leave. The Court, having considered Plaintiffs' (I) Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Reply Argument in Support of Their Ex Parte Application for Clarification of March 10, 2014 Order, and (II) Notice of Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Compliance and Imposing Sanctions and good cause appearing therefor, ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to submit a reply argument in support of their pending Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the March 10, 2014 Order (Dkt. No. 248, "Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application") is GRANTED. (mp) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 250 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Plaintiffs (I) Ex Parte Application For Leave To File Reply Argument In Support Of Their Ex Parte Application For Clarification Of March 10, 2014 Order, And (II) Notice Of Opposition To Defendants Ex Parte Application For Order Compelling Compliance And Imposing Sanctions filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Combined (I) Reply in Further Support of Ex Parte Application and (II) Procedural Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application, # 2 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 249 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Clarify PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF MARCH 10, 2014 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 248 ; Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Compliance and Imposing Sanctions; Declaration of Robert B. Hawk filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 248 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Clarify PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF MARCH 10, 2014 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 247 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Errata to Application to Seal filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 246 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE Notice of Errata filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Henry J. Kelston, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14 - 30)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 245 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno, re Declaration (Motion related) 244 , APPLICATION for Order for APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND (2) DECLARATION OF HENRY J. KELSTON IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF DAVID E. AZAR
Request RequestSpace
PACER 244 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelston in support of MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14-30)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 243 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Colin B. Weir in support of MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 242 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Charles M. Benbrook, PH.D. in support of MOTION to Certify Class 241 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 241 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Appendix 1, # 3 Appendix 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
PACER 240 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Order for APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND (2) DECLARATION OF HENRY J. KELSTON IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF DAVID E. AZAR filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 239 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION 236 AS MOOT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 238 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS 190 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: See order for details. (ah) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 237 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment 1: Proposed Order 236 . (bm) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 236 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING ON MOTION ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AND VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS OF PATTY BOYER, ANNE COWAN, BRENDA KREIN, JANETH RUIZ, AND CHRISTI TOOMER filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 235 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for Allowing Withdrawal and Voluntary Dismissal of Individual Claims of Patty Boyer, Anne Cowan, Brenda Krein, Janeth Ruiz, and Christi Toomer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 Or 41(a)(2) 190 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 234 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Order for Allowing Withdrawal and Voluntary Dismissal of Individual Claims of Patty Boyer, Anne Cowan, Brenda Krein, Janeth Ruiz, and Christi Toomer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 Or 41(a)(2) 190 Conditional Non-Opposition filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 233 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/28/14 8:53 a.m. re Transcript 232 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 232 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/28/14 8:53 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2014. (ha) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 231 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS 223 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum of Law in Support of Class Certification may be up to 35 pages. (ah) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 230 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Modify Scheduling Order 220 195 222 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court therefore extends the deadline for the filing of a class certification motion to May 5, 2014. ConAgra's opposition to the motion must be filed on or before June 2, 2014. Any reply by plaintiffs must be filed on or before June 30, 2014. The court will hear the motion on July 14, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (ah) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 229 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Ex Parte Application for Order 225 , as to Plaintiff Robert Briseno Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Dana Powers at dpowers@milberg.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Defendant's Compliance with March 10 Order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Azar, David) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 228 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting in part and denying in part 224 Ex Parte Application for Order. TELEPHONIC HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT'S COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 10, 2014 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record, and after reviewing all filed documents and hearing arguments of counsel, Plaintiffs' ex parte application (Dkt. No. 225) is GRANTED IN PART as follows: 1. On or before March 31, 2014. ConAgra shall run an electronic search of the consumer insights library with the terms in paragraph 1 of this court's March 10, 2014 order except for the word natural. Defense counsel shall advise Plaintiffs' counsel whether this search turns up documents other than what is being produced on March 31, 2014. If there are additional documents, they shall be produced on or before April 4. 2014. 2. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel shall meet and confer regarding ConAgra's review of a random sample of hits from the electronic search term "natural" in the consumer insights library. 3. In all other respects, Plaintiffs' ex parte application is denied. (mp) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 227 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
Opposition re: Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Compliance With The Court's March 10, 2014 Order 225 ; Declaration of Stacy Hovan filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 226 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Compliance With The Court's March 10, 2014 Order 225 . Telephone Hearing is set for 3/28/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The call in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 7002#; User Password: 3742#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space & Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 225 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Compliance With The Court's March 10, 2014 Order filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno.(Azar, David) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 224 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Compliance With The March 10, 2014 Order filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Henry J. Kelston, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Azar, David) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 223 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation of opening memorandum of law in support of class certification filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 222 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to To File Reply In Support of Ex Parte Application To Modify Scheduling Order Or, In the Alternative, For Expedited Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Ex Parte Application to Modify Scheduling Order Or, In the Alternative, For Expedited Scheduling Conference)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 221 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Class Certification Deadlines set in Scheduling Order (Dkt No. 183) EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification, Reply 220 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Robert B. Hawk, # 2 Declaration Stacy Hovan, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 220 Filed: 3/16/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Class Certification Deadlines set in Scheduling Order (Dkt No. 183), EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification, Reply filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 03/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 219 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/10/14 1:58 p.m. & 3:18 p.m re Transcript 218 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 218 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/10/14 1:58 p.m. & 3:18 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2014. (ha) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 217 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelston in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. (mat) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 216 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Chad Meyer in Support of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Portions of Joint Stipulation. (mat) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 215 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Henry J. Kelston in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.. (mat) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 214 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Chad Meyer in Support of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Potions of Joint Stipulation. (mat) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 213 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- JOINT STIPULATION of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. (mat) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 212 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF JOINT STIPULATION ON PLAINTIFFS'MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting 207 Application for Order. Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. (ConAgra) applied to the Court for an order sealing documents disclosing ConAgra's confidential internal information. The Court finds that good cause exists to seal the confidential portions of the following documents: 1. Exhibits H, L, and O to the Declaration of Henry J. Kelston in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. ("Kelston Declaration") (Dkt. No. 203-1) 2. Declaration of Chad Meyer in Support of Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.'s Portions of Joint Stipulation ("Meyer Declaration") (Dkt. No. 203-2) 3. Joint Stipulation on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production From Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. ("Joint Stipulation") (Dkt. No. 203) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unredacted versions of the above-listed documents be sealed. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mp) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 211 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE: APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting 201 Application for Order. Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 of the United States District Court for the Central District of California, the Court hereby grants Plaintiffs' application to file the following documents under seal: (See Order for details.) (mp) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 210 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Michael Ewers at michael.ewers@hoganlovells.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Testimony of: Hearing re Motions to Compel. Pre-Trial Proceeding: March 10, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 209 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion to Compel; Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL. On March 7 and 8, 2014, Defendant filed a motion to compel the production of documents responsive to Document Request Nos. 1-7. (Dkt. Nos. 196-99, 204-05.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART as follows: 1. On or before March 31, 2014, Plaintiffs shall produce documents responsive to Document Request Nos. 1-2. With respect to Document Request No. 3, Plaintiffs stipulated at oral argument that they have consumed, and are continuing to consume, GMO-containing foods. 2. In all other respects, Defendant's motion to compel is denied without prejudice. (See Order for Details.) Court Recorder: CS 3/10/2014. (mp) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 208 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF granting in part and denying in part 202 Motion to Compel; Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. On March 7, 2014, Plaintiffs filed a motion to compel production of documents in response to Document Request Nos. 1-3 and 5-14. (Dkt. Nos. 201-03.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART as follows. On or before March 31, 2014, Defendant shall: 1. Run an electronic search of the consumer insights library with the search terms natural, GMO, GMOs, genetic, genetics, genetically, bioengineer, bioengineered, bioengineering, biotech, biotechnology and/or biotechnologies. Produce the responsive studies and disclose, for all studies produced in response to Document Request No. 7, the entity that conducted each study. 2. Respond to Plaintiffs' request that ConAgra stipulate that the ingredients in Wesson Oils are not identity preserved and are not organic. 3. Produce purchase records sufficient to show the ingredients of Wesson Oils and the identity of the suppliers of those ingredients during the class period. 4. Respond to Plaintiffs' request that ConAgra stipulate that the IRI and Neilsen retail data is the only retail data that will be used in the class certification motion. If ConAgra does not so stipulate, confirm that ConAgra does not have in its possession, custody or control the retail information requested in revised Document Request No. 10 (pages 86-87 in the Joint Stipulation) other than information from IRI or Neilsen, or else produce the responsive information. 5. Request IRI's and Neilsen's consent that ConAgra run report(s) containing the retail information requested in Revised Document Request No. 10 (to the extent it exists), and produce those reports to Plaintiffs. 6. In all other respects, the motion is denied without prejudice. (See Order for details.) Court Recorder: CS 3/10/2014. (mp) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 207 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION for Order for TO SEAL PORTIONS OF JOINT STIPULATION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC. filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 3/10/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 206 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Motion to Compel, 202 , as to Plaintiff Robert Briseno Court Reporter. Court will contact David Azar at dazar@milberg.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 03/10/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Azar, David) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 205 Filed: 3/8/2014, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Document Production 196 Corrected filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 204 Filed: 3/8/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. correcting Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion 197 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 203 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Document Production from Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. 202 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Henry Kelston, # 2 Declaration of Chad Meyer, # 3 Declaration of Robert Hawk, # 4 Declaration of Stacey Hovan, # 5 Proof of Service)(Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 202 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Document Production from Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 3/10/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 201 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION for Order for re Application To File Documents Under Seal Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Application set for hearing on 3/10/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 200 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
Opposition in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO RULE 16 195 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 199 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Henry Kelston in support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Document Production 196 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 198 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Benjamin T. Diggs in support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Document Production 196 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-S)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 197 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Document Production 196 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 196 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Document Production filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/10/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 195 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO RULE 16 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO RULE 16)(Azar, David) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 194 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 193 Plaintiff Robert Briseno's Request to Substitute Attorney, Nicole Duckett Fricke as attorney of record instead of attorney Jeff S. Westerman, who is hereby withdrawn. Attorney Jeff S Westerman terminated. (lw) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 193 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
REQUEST to Substitute /Withdraw Jeff Westerman filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 192 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg:, Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Case is called. Counsel state their appearances. The Court and counsel confer as reflected on the record. The Court sets the following schedule: 1. If any party files a motion to compel, joint stipulation shall be filed on or before Friday,March 7, 2014. 2. The Motions shall be noticed for March 10, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. The call in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 7002#; User Password: 3340#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space & Facilities Help Desk at (213)894-1400. 0:30InitiaCourt Recorder: CS 2/20/2014. (mp) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 191 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Order for Allowing Withdrawal and Voluntary Dismissal of Individual Claims of Patty Boyer, Anne Cowan, Brenda Krein, Janeth Ruiz, and Christi Toomer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 Or 41(a)(2) 190 CORRECTED filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 190 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Allowing Withdrawal and Voluntary Dismissal of Individual Claims of Patty Boyer, Anne Cowan, Brenda Krein, Janeth Ruiz, and Christi Toomer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 Or 41(a)(2) filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 189 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting 185 Motion for Order. PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE. On February 14, 2014, Plaintiff requested an expedited status conference to discuss "the current status of the case and possible adjustments to the case schedule set on February 13, 2014." As defendant points out, this court cannot alter Judge Morrow's schedule. Any request to change the schedule must be directed to the District Judge. On the other hand, Plaintiff's reply indicates that there are discovery matters at issue as well. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. A telephonic discovery status conference is set for Thursday, February 20, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. The call in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 1116#; User Password: 1672#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space & Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400. (mp) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 188 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT Plaintiffs' Request for Expedited Status Conference to Update Court as to Case Status and Address Schedule Set on February 13, 2014 filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman. (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 187 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing,, 183 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 186 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Request for Expedited Status Conference to Update Court as to Case Status and Address Schedule Set on February 13, 2014 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 185 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
Plaintiffs' Request for Expedited Status Conference To Update Court As To Case Status And Address Schedule Set On February 13, 2014 filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing,, 183 (Duckett, Nicole) Modified on 2/19/2014 (mp). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 184 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/10/2015. (ah) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 183 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS Order Re Class Certification Motion and Remaining Case ManagementDates 149 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2015 08:30 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Telephone Conference set for 9/25/2014 05:15 PM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ah) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 182 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert B Hawk counsel for Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Robin Wechkin is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 181 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY STRIKING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Notice (Other) 180 . Incorrect form and event used. Counsel may use form G-06. The correct event is: Civil Events Other Filings - Notices - Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 180 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
[STRICKEN] NOTICE OF WTHDRAWAL OF ROBIN WECHKIN filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2014 (ah). (Entered: 01/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 179 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of address by Robert B Hawk attorney for Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 4085 Campbell Avenue, Suite 100, Menlo Park, CA 94025. Filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 178 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER MODIFYING ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Margaret M. Morrow granting 174 Motion: Plaintiffs moved for an order, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d)(2) and (g)(1)(A), modifying the November 1, 2011 Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel (Dkt. No. 48) to substitute Grant and Eisenhofer P.A. ("Grant and Eisenhofer") for Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC ("Wolf Haldenstein") as Interim Class Counsel, to serve together with Milberg LLP as Interim Class Counsel in this litigation. Because such modification is in the interests of justice, and for the reasons as further set forth in Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, the Court hereby ORDERS that: 1. The November 1, 2011 Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel (Dkt. No. 48) is hereby modified to substitute Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. for Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLC. 2. Milberg LLP and Grant and Eisenhofer P.A. are appointed Interim Class Counsel. (bm) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 177 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Order for Modify Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel 174 filed by Miscellaneous Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP. (Rickert, Rachele) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 176 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TEXT ENTRY CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: MOTION for Order for Modify Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel 174 previously scheduled for 12/23/2013 AT 10:00 am has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 175 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Modify Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel 174 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion is noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 174 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modify Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 173 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: denying 171 Defendant's Ex Parte Application for an Order Staying Action Pending Outcome of Referral to Food and Drug Administration. (rne) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 172 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending OUTCOME OF REFERRAL TO FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION 171 (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Proceedings Pending Outcome of Referral to FDA) filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Henry J, Kelston)(Azar, David) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
  • Attachment 1
PACER 171 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending OUTCOME OF REFERRAL TO FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 170 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julie Diane Miller counsel for Plaintiff Brenda Krein. Julie D. Miller is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Brenda Krein. (Miller, Julie) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 169 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY STRIKING MOTION TO WITHDRAW 168 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Counsel is direced to file Form G-123 ("Notice of Appearance or WITHDRAWAL of Counsel"). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 168 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
APPLICATION of Julie D. Miller to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Brenda Krein. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Julie) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 167 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY STRIKING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTYORNEY 166 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Incorrect event used. Correct event is -Motions and Related Filings- Applications- Substitution of Attorney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 166 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
[STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Julie D. Miller to Withdraw as Attorney filed by plaintiff Brenda Krein. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Julie) Modified on 7/10/2013 (ah). (Entered: 07/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 165 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ENTRY ONLY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 164 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Protective Order 163 . Due to clerical error incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. The incorrect document is replaced with the correct document entitled Stipulated Protective Order. (mp) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 163 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter 162 . IT IS STIPULATED, AGREED, AND JOINTLY REQUESTED by Plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") and Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. ("Defenda nt")(Collectively, the "Parties"), by and through their respective counsel, that a protective order should be entered according to the following terms and provisions ("Protective Order") pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c): (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) ***** NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT ***** (mp) (Main Document 163 replaced on 6/25/2013) (mp).
PDF 163 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter 162 . IT IS STIPULATED, AGREED, AND JOINTLY REQUESTED by Plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") and Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. ("Defendant")(Collectively, the "Parties"), by and through their respective counsel, that a protective order should be entered according to the following terms and provisions ("Protective Order") pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c): (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) ***** NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT ***** (mp) (Main Document 163 replaced on 6/25/2013) (mp). (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 162 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Order. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OPEN ISSUES ON PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for entry of a protective order is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The court has revised the proposed protective order submitted by the parties and ORDERS the entry of that protective order. (mp) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 161 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: MOTION for Order for Resolution of Limited Open Issues on [Proposed] Confidentiality Protective Order 159 . The motion previously scheduled for July 16, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. is advanced to Tuesday, June 25, 2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Counsel are ordered to appear telephonically on this date and time. The call-in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 1112#; User Password: 6206#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space and Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 160 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno, re MOTION for Order for Resolution of Limited Open Issues on [Proposed] Confidentiality Protective Order 159 served on 06/14/2013. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 159 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Resolution of Limited Open Issues on [Proposed] Confidentiality Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Statement of Plaintiffs' Motion)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 158 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert B Hawk on behalf of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 157 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Jeff S. Westerman on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 156 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeff S Westerman counsel for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Changing firm name and address to Westerman Law Corp., 1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Changing e-mail and fax number to jwesterman@jswlegal.com and (310) 201-9160. Adding Jeff S. Westerman as attorney as counsel of record for plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 155 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Nicole M Duckett counsel for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Adding Nicole M. Duckett as attorney as counsel of record for plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno (Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 154 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL - CHRISTIAN KEENEY filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 153 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 151 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Henry J. Kelston on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno, designating David E. Azar as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 152 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 150 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ariana J. Tadler on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno, designating David E. Azar as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 151 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Henry J. Kelston to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11674143 paid.) filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 150 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Ariana J. Tadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11674062 paid.) filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 149 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno.. (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 148 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of address by Adam J Levitt attorney for Plaintiffs Patty Boyer, Christi Toomer, Anita Willman. Changing attorneys address to 30 North LaSalle Street, Suite 1200 Chicago Illinois, 60602. Filed by Plaintiffs Patty Boyer, Christi Toomer, Anita Willman. (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 147 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Adam J Levitt counsel for Plaintiffs Patty Boyer, Christi Toomer, Anita Willman. Changing Firm and Address to Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. 826 West Oakdale Avenue Chicago Illinois 60657. Changing email to alevitt@gelaw.com. Adding Adam J. Levitt as attorney as counsel of record for Christi Toomer, Anita Willman and Patty Boyer for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christi Toomer, Anita Willman and Patty Boyer (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 146 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED JOINT 26(f) REPORT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in a timely fashion and to file an updated Joint Rule 26(f) Report on or before 02/11/2013. (ah) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 145 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint 143 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc..(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 144 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David E Azar counsel for Plaintiff Robert Briseno.Christian Keeney is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno (Azar, David) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 143 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
SECOND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against defendants Conagra Foods, Inc. amending CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, 80 . (bm) (bm). (Entered: 12/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 142 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive 137 . (bm) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 141 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 140 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Plaintiff's have until 12/19/2012 to file a Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. Defendant shall answer or respond by 1/16/2013. (vdr) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 140 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 139 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese, Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 138 . (bm) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 138 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION 84 TO DISMISS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the entry of this order. (vdr) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 137 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court orders CV 11-08421 consolidated with the above cases under the following caption: In re ConAgra Foods, Inc. CASE No. CV 11-05379-MMM(AGRx). See order. (ah) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 136 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese - RETURNED TO SENDER re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), 134 (lw) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 135 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION 131 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. See deficiency notice issued on 10/09/2012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 134 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 131 . The following error(s) was found: Form G-06 is filled-out per attorney, please do not combine another attorney's information. A separate Form G-06 should be filled-out for attorney Eric Freed. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 133 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 109 . (csi) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 132 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Order 108 . (csi) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 131 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
[STRICKEN] NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Julie Diane Miller counsel for Plaintiff Brenda Krein. Changing address and firm name to Complex Litigation Group LLC 513 Central Avenue, Suite 300, Highland Park IL 60035. Changing fax number to 847-433-2500. Adding Julie Diane Miller as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff Brenda Krein for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Brenda Krein (Miller, Julie) Modified on 10/10/2012 (ah). (Entered: 10/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 130 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 129 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Erid D. Freed re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 128 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 127 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D. Freed re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 126 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 125 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to MICHAEL ROBERT REESE re Order on Motion for Protective Order Motion Hearing 110 . (rne) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 124 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to JULIE DIANE MILLER re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 109 . (rne) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 123 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order,, 108 (bp) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 122 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D. Freed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, 109 (bp) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 121 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D. Freed re Order,, 108 (bp) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 120 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/24/12 9:48 a.m. re Transcript 119 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 119 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/24/12 9:48 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2012. (mo) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 118 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 99 . (csi) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 117 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order Taking Motion Under Submission 99 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 116 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D Freed re Order Taking Motion Under Submission 99 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 115 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 103 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 114 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D Freed re Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 103 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 113 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 103 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 112 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 7/24/2012 to 7/24/2012 re: Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 , as to plaintiff Robert Briseno Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Cecille Chaffins at cchaffins@milberg.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 7/24/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 111 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 7/24/2012 to 7/24/2012 re: Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 , as to Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Kris May at kris.may@hoganlovells.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Testimony of: Entire Telephonic Hearing of 7/24/2012. Other: 7/24/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 110 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF granting 104 Motion for Protective Order re MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 ; Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. On July 2, 2012, Plaintiffs filed a motion for protective order. On July 10, 2012, Plaintiffs filed a supplemental memorandum. The court heard oral argument on July 24, 2012. At oral argument, the court made clear that it was ruling only on Plaintiffs' motion for protective order as to the two categories in dispute as currently written. The court expresses no opinion as to the viability of discovery requests that cover the same subject matter. Moreover, the court cannot give an advisory opinion as to the scope of appropriate preservation of evidence. The parties are free to meet and confer in an effort to narrow the scope of ConAgra's request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for protective order is GRANTED.(See Order for details.)Court Recorder: CS 7/24/2012. (mp) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 109 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 . The Court on its own motion advances the time of the hearing from 10:00 a.m. to 9:45 a.m. on July 24, 2012. The telephone number to call is (213) 894-0800, Meeting ID Number is 7002#, and User Password is 0042#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space and Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400. Counsel are ordered to appear telephonically on this date and time. (mp) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 108 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TELEPHONICALLY by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation for Leave 107 . Pursuant to the parties Joint Motion to Appear at Hearing on Motion for Protective Order Telephonically, and for good cause, the Court HEREBY ORDERS that counsel for all parties are authorized to appear telephonically at the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order scheduled for July 24, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mp) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 107 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Motion for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 106 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 105 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Christian Keeney, # 2 Declaration Plaintiff Briseno, # 3 Declaration Plaintiff Toomer, # 4 Declaration Plaintiff Wilman, # 5 Declaration Robert Hawk)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 104 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 103 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05-21-2012 11:55 a.m. re Transcript 102 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Duvall, Richard) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 102 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05-21-2012 11:55 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARK SCHWEITZER, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number (213) 663-3494. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2012. (Duvall, Richard) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 101 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 5/21/2012 to 5/21/2012 as to Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Court Reporter Mark Schweitzer. Court will contact Michael Ewers at michael.ewers@hoganlovells.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion to Dismiss 5/21/12. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 100 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 5/21/2012 to 5/21/2012 re: Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Motion Hearing,, 99 , as to plaintiff Robert Briseno Court Reporter Mark Schweitzer. Court will contact Cecille Chaffins at cchaffins@milberg.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion to Dismiss 5/21/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 99 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action 84 held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, the court takes the motion to dismiss consolidated class action under submission.Court Reporter: Mark Schweitzer. (bp) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 98 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 94 . (csi) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 97 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 93 . (csi) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 96 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 95 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 94 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS Order Continuing Hearing Date On Defendants Motion to Dismiss 84 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is continued to 5/21/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Opposition due 4/30/2012; Reply due 05/07/2012. (ah) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 93 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 84 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court continues the motion to dismiss to 5/21/2012 at 10:00 AM pursuant to the stipulation 92 . Opposition due 4/30/2012. Reply due 05/07/2012. (ah) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 92 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 91 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jill M Manning on behalf of Plaintiff Michele Andrade (Manning, Jill) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 85 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 84 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow (bp) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 82 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Conagra Foods, Inc. answer now due 2/24/2012, re Consolidated Complaint, 80 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 81 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Julio J Ramos on behalf of Plaintiff Lil Marie-Birr (Ramos, Julio) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 80 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT related to: Complaint - (Discovery), 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Christi Toomer, Robert Briseno, Brenda Krein, Phyllis Scarpelli, Kelly McFadden, Janeth Ruiz, Anne Cowan, Julie Palmer, Patty Boyer, Necla Musat, Pauline Michael, Rona Johnston, Cheri Shafstall, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Maureen Towey, Michele Andrade, Anita Willman, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald (bp) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
PACER 61 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND CONSOLIDATION OF ADDITIONAL ACTION by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, re Order 60 (bp) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 60 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, RESPONSE TO AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND CONSOLIDATION OF ADDITIONAL ACTION by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, (bp) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 59 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, (bp) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 58 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 11-08513 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 57 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amended Consolidated Complaint, Response to Consolidated Complaint, and Consolidation of Additional Action filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 56 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Order Consolidating Cases. The court orders CV11-9308 consolidated with the above cases under the following caption: In re ConAgra Foods, Inc. (bp) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 55 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 53 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robin Wechkin on behalf of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc., designating Robert B. Hawk as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 54 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 24 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Plaintiffs prayer for an order requiring ConAgra to adopt and enforce a policy that requires appropriate disclosure of genetically modified ingredients is preempted. Accordingly, that prayer may not be included in any amended complaint. With that exception, Briseno may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. (ah) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
PACER 53 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Robin Wechkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9533237 paid.) filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 52 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, NOVEMBER 7, 2011 (dc) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 51 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, NOVEMBER 7, 2011. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARK SCHWEITZER,, phone number (213) 663-3494. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2012. (dc) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 50 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference; Defendan ConAgra's Motion to Dismiss 24 held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. The court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, the court takes the motion to dismiss under submission. The Scheduling Conference is not held. The clerk will notify the parties when a new date has been scheduled.Court Reporter: Mark Schweitzer. (bp) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 49 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rachele R Rickert counsel for Plaintiff Christi Toomer. Adding Rachele R. Rickert as attorney as counsel of record for Christi Toomer for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christi Toomer (Rickert, Rachele) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 48 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel 35 43 44 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court enters this order on plaintiffs' stipulation, appointing Milberg and Wolf Halderstein as interim class counsel. In light of this ruling, the pending motions for appointment of interim class counsel (Docket Nos.43 and 44) are denied as moot. (bp) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Vacating Order re Consolidation by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: On October 15, 2011, the court issued an order consolidating this case with CV11-5379-MMM in error. The court vacates its October 14, 2011 order consolidating cases. (bp) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno.. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 45 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - Interim Class Counsel 44 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 44 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - Interim Class Counsel filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) filed by Plaintiffs ALEXIS JUSTAK, PHYLLIS SCARPELLI, LEONORA ULITSKY. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3), # 2 Declaration Declaration of Scott A. Bursor in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3))(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lawrence Timothy Fisher on behalf of Plaintiffs ALEXIS JUSTAK, PHYLLIS SCARPELLI, LEONORA ULITSKY (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Hearing re Appoint Interim Class Counsel and Set Briefing Schedule filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 24 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court orders CV11-8513 consolidated with the above cases under the caption: In re Conagra Foods, Inc., CASE NO.CV11-5379-MMM(AGRx) (bp) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Plaintiff Kelly McFadden filed by Plaintiff Kelly McFadden Robert Briseno. (Reese, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
Copy of Certified Order from MDL Panel creating MDL 2:11-ml-02291 MMM (AGRx) See MDL docket for any documents common to two or more actions. (ghap) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulated Case Management Order filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 24 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Taking Off Calendar and Denying as Moot Motion of Plaintiffs Briseno and Toomer to Consolidate Related Actions and Designate Interim Class Counsel 8 . The court orders these matter consolidated under the caption: In re Conagra Food, Inc., Case No.CV11-5379-MMM(AGRx). Because the cases have now been consolidated, the parties are directed to file a stipulation and proposed order designating interim class counsel. (bp) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Status Conference held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow:Court Reporter: Mark Schweitzer. (bp) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC.S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, (bp) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow The Court hereby ORDERS the documents listed below be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules. RE: Miscellaneous Document 27 (bp) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
[STRICKEN] Letter to Judge Margaret M. Morrow re Ex Parte Applications filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. (Hawk, Robert) Modified on 8/26/2011 (ah). (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Court Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/7/2011 10:00 AM. (bp) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 24 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrei V. Rado on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Jeff S. Westerman as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jessica J. Sleater on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Jeff S. Westerman as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Related Case(s): CV 11-6127 DMG (AGRx); CV 11-6402 DMG (PLAx); CV 11-6480 GW (MANx) (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Andrei V. Rado to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9099523 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Jessica J. Sleater to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9099423 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
DENIED BY ORDER OF Judge Margaret M. Morrow, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 16 (bp) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. correcting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 15 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc., (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert B Hawk on behalf of Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. (Hawk, Robert) Modified on 8/22/2011 (bp). (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Jeff S. Westerman in support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 [CORRECTED - Exhibits G, K, P] filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Jeff S. Westerman in support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR),, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno, upon Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. served on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/24/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ORDER. Defendant requested, and Plaintiff agrees to, an extension of time for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendant shall have until August 24, 2011 to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint. (bp) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Order to Enter Case Management Order filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application to Andrei V Rado for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-ResidentAttorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (car) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application to Jessica Sleater for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-ResidentAttorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (car) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno (car) (mg). (Entered: 06/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 1 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Conagra Foods, Inc. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno.(car) (mg). (Entered: 06/30/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 278 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?