Moore v. Lightstorm Entertainment et al
Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:11-cv-03644
District Judge Roger W Titus, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.mdd.8-11-cv-03644 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Bryant Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald M. Temple +1 202 628 1101 +1 202 628 1149 dtemplelaw@gmail.com
v.
No Logo 20th Century Fox, Inc., Defendant
No Logo James Cameron, III, Defendant
No Logo Lightstorm Entertainment, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 190 Contract: Other
  Entries (176) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 176 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Judgment
Request RequestSpace
PDF 175 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Memorandum Opinion
PACER 174 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace
PDF 173 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
PACER 172 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 171 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 170 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 169 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace
PACER 168 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PDF 167 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Motion to Strike
  • Attachment 1: Supplement Memo of Law
  • Attachment 2: Text of Proposed Order
  • Attachment 3: Affidavit Williams
  • Attachment 4: Exhibit Williams 1
  • Attachment 5: Exhibit Williams 2
  • Attachment 6: Exhibit Williams 3
  • Attachment 7: Exhibit Williams 4
PACER 166 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 165 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 164 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 163 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 162 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 161 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 160 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace
PACER 159 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 158 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 157 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Supplemental
Request RequestSpace
PACER 156 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 155 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 154 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 153 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 152 Filed: 10/20/2013, Entered: 10/20/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 151 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 150 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace
PACER 149 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace
PACER 148 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 147 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 146 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 145 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 144 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 143 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: 10/14/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 142 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion for Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace
PACER 141 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 140 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 139 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 138 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace
PACER 137 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Order on Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 136 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 135 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Sealed Document
Request RequestSpace
PACER 134 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 133 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Notice (Other)
PACER 132 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PDF 131 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
PACER 130 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 129 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace
PDF 128 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Response
  • Attachment 1: Affidavit Williams
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit Ex 1
  • Attachment 3: Exhibit Ex 2
  • Attachment 4: Exhibit Ex 3
  • Attachment 5: Exhibit Ex 4
  • Attachment 6: Exhibit Ex 5
  • Attachment 7: Exhibit Ex 6
PACER 127 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 126 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 125 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Local Rule
Request RequestSpace
PACER 124 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 123 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 122 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 121 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 120 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 119 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 118 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace
PACER 117 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 116 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: 9/13/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 115 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal
Request RequestSpace
PACER 114 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 113 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Response in Opposition
Request RequestSpace
PACER 112 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PDF 111 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Notice (Other)
PACER 110 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 109 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Status Report
Request RequestSpace
PACER 108 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Status Report
Request RequestSpace
PACER 107 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace
PACER 106 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Order on Motion to Quash
Request RequestSpace
PACER 105 Filed: 9/2/2013, Entered: 9/2/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace
PACER 104 Filed: 9/1/2013, Entered: 9/1/2013 Motion to Quash
Request RequestSpace
PACER 103 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PDF 102 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Motion to Quash
PACER 101 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Local Rule
Request RequestSpace
PACER 100 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 99 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace
PACER 98 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 97 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 96 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 95 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 94 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Notice (Other)
PACER 93 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace
PDF 92 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Memorandum Opinion
PACER 91 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 90 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
  • Attachment 1: Text of Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 89 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 88 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace
PACER 87 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace
PACER 86 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 85 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 84 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Protective/Confidentiality Order
Request RequestSpace
PDF 82 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Order on Motion to Bifurcate
PACER 81 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Request RequestSpace
PACER 80 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Miscellaneous Correspondence
Request RequestSpace
PACER 79 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 78 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 77 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Miscellaneous Correspondence
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 76 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 75 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 74 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PDF 73 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Motion for Reconsideration
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit
  • Attachment 2: Text of Proposed Order
PACER 72 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 71 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 70 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: 4/10/2013 Motion for Protective Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 69 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: 4/5/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 68 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 67 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace
PACER 66 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 65 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Motion to Bifurcate
Request RequestSpace
PACER 64 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 63 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: 4/1/2013 Answer to Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace
PACER 62 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 61 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 60 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace
PDF 59 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
PACER 58 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 57 Filed: 3/16/2013, Entered: 3/16/2013 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 56 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Response
Request RequestSpace
PDF 55 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Response in Support of Motion
PACER 54 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012 Supplemental
Request RequestSpace
PDF 53 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
PACER 52 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 51 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 Order on Motion for Other Relief
PACER 50 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 49 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 48 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PDF 45 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Amended Complaint
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit 8
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit 9
PDF 44 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Notice (Other)
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit Ex. A
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit Ex. B
PDF 43 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
PACER 42 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Request RequestSpace
PDF 41 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Order on Motion to Dismiss
PACER 40 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: 8/30/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: 8/29/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: 8/8/2012 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Notice of Change of Address
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Motion for Other Relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 Summons Returned Executed
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Summons Returned Executed
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: 3/27/2012 Summons Returned Executed
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Supplemental
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: 12/21/2011 Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: 12/21/2011 QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
PDF 1 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Complaint
COMPLAINT For Damages, Injunctive and other Relief against Bryant Moore, filed by Bryant Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Lightstorm Summons, # 3 Exhibit James Cameron Summons, # 4 Exhibit 20th Century Summos)(Temple, Donald) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit Lightstorm Summons
  • Attachment 3: Exhibit James Cameron Summons
  • Attachment 4: Exhibit 20th Century Summos

Statistics

This case has been viewed 158 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?