USA v. Zauder
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cr-00659-LAK
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.1-12-cr-00659 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul Michael Monteleoni +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2527 paul.monteleoni@usdoj.gov
No Logo Evan Zauder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brafman & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark M. Baker +1 212 750 7800 +1 212 750 3906 mbaker@braflaw.com
Benjamin Brafman +1 212 750 7800 +1 212 750 3906 bbrafman@braflaw.com
Joshua D. Kirshner +1 212 750 7800 +1 212 750 3906 jkirshner@braflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flamhaft, Levy, Kamins, Hirsch & Rendeiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen Flamhaft +1 718 237 1900 +1 718 624 5626 sflamhaft@flkhlaw.com
No Logo Evan Zauder, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Brafman & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joshua D. Kirshner +1 212 750 7800 +1 212 750 3906 jkirshner@braflaw.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/27/2012
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
112-mj-01173-UA
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
182252A.F ACTIVITIES RE MATERIAL CONSTITUTING/CONTAINING CHILD PORNO (TRANSPORTATION, RECEIPT AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHILD PORNOGRAPHY)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
182252A.F ACTIVITIES RE MATERIAL CONSTITUTING/CONTAINING CHILD PORNO (POSSESSION OF CHILD PORNOGRAPHY)
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2422.F
Offense Level 4
182422.F COERCION OR ENTICEMENT OF FEMALE (CHILD ENTICEMENT)
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
182252A.F ACTIVITIES RE MATERIAL CONSTITUTING/CONTAINING CHILD PORNO (DISTRIBUTION OF CHILD PORNOGRAPHY)
Count 3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
182252A.F ACTIVITIES RE MATERIAL CONSTITUTING/CONTAINING CHILD PORNO (CHILD PORNOGRAPHY)
Def Custody Status Released
Flags ECF, PRIOR
  Entries (70) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 35 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Evan Zauder. THE DEFENDANT, BY HIS ATTORNEYS, having requested an order directing the Bureau of Prisons and the MDC Brooklyn to allow Defendant Zauder ("Zowder", 91844-054) to wear a suit, dress shirt, socks, belt, and dress shoes to his April 1, 2014 sentencing and upon due consideration of such request, it is hereby ORDERED, that Defendant's application is granted, and it is further, ORDERED, that the Bureau of Prisons and the MDC Brooklyn, and any of its agents, representatives, employees or designees having custody of Defendant to whom this order shall be presented, is hereby directed to receive said clothing at least 24 hours prior to his sentencing. ENTER: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/26/2014)(bw)
PDF 34 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Evan Zauder. It is hereby ORDERED, that Defendant's application is granted, and it is further, ORDERED, that the Bureau of Prisons and the MDC Brooklyn, and any of its agents, representatives, employees or designees having custody of Defendant to whom this order shall be presented, is hereby directed to receive said clothing at least 24 hours prior to his sentencing. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/11/2014)(jw)
PDF 33 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evan Zauder. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/18/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Rodriguez, Somari)
PDF 32 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evan Zauder re: Conference held on 12/18/13 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2014. (Rodriguez, Somari)
PACER 31 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
Blank  Set Hearings
As to Evan Zauder: Sentencing set for 3/20/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/18/2013) (ajc)
Blank  Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Status onference (Sentencing argument)as to Evan Zauder held on 12/18/2013. Defendant Zauder present with attorneys Benjamin Braffman and Joshua Kirshner. AUSA Paul Monteleoni present. Court reporter present. Sentencing argument heard. The conclusion of the sentencing is scheduled to be held on 3/20/14 at 10:30AM. Defendant remained detained. Kaplan, J. (ajc)
PDF 30 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Evan Zauder. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Kirshner, Joshua)
PDF 29 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Evan Zauder. (Monteleoni, Paul)
PACER 46 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Sealed Document
PACER 28 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Evan Zauder. It is hereby ORDERED, that Defendant's application is granted, and it is further, ORDERED, that the Bureau of Prisons and the MDC Brooklyn, and any of its agents, representatives, employees or designees having custody of Defendant to whom this order shall be presented, is hereby directed to receive said clothing at least 24 hours prior to his sentencing, and it is further. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/10/2013)(jw)
PACER 45 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 Order
PDF 27 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Evan Zauder. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Appendix, # (4) Appendix)(Kirshner, Joshua)
PACER 44 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Letter
PDF 26 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Evan Zauder. The sentencing of defendant Zauder is rescheduled for October 2, 2013 at 4:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/8/2013)(bw)
PACER 43 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/4/2014 Order
PDF 25 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Evan Zauder. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court pay the attached invoice submitted by Kenneth J. Lau, LCSW-R, in the amount of $2,000, for professional services rendered in connection with the above captioned case. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/8/2013)(jw)
PACER 42 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evan Zauder. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 4/1/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
PACER 24 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
PACER 41 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evan Zauder re: Sentence held on 4/1/14 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2014. (Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
PDF 23 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evan Zauder. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 1/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Rodriguez, Somari)
PDF 40 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Evan Zauder (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Dismissed; Count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, Imprisonment: 156 Months to run concurrently. Supervised Release: 5 Years. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons. That consistent with the defendant's security classification he be designated to the FCI Fort Dix West facility. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. The drug testing condition is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. The defendant is to pay an assessment fee of $300.00 due immediately. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/21/2014)(dnd) Modified on 4/21/2014 (dnd). (Entered: 04/21/2014)
PDF 22 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evan Zauder re: Plea held on 1/23/13 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2013. (Rodriguez, Somari)
PACER 39 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
PACER 21 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
PACER 38 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
PDF 20 Waiver of Indictment
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Evan Zauder. (jm)
PACER 37 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
PDF 19 Information - Felony
(S1) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Evan Zauder (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s. (jm)
PACER 36 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Blank  Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report
Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Evan Zauder. (jm)
Blank  Arraignment
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Defendant present with attorneys Benjamin Brafman and Joshua Kirshner. AUSA Chernoff in for Paul Monteleoni. FBI Agent Cindy Wolf also present. Superseding Information, Waiver of Indictment and Plea Agreement were filed in open Court. The Defendant was allocuted as to his waiver of indictment then arraigned as to the superseder. Arraignment as to Evan Zauder (1) Count 1s,2s,3s held on 1/22/2013. PSI was ordered. Plea entered by Evan Zauder (1) Guilty as to Count 1s,2s,3s., as to Evan Zauder( Sentencing set for 5/22/2013 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Court Reporter Kris Sellin) (jm)
PDF 18 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Evan Zauder addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Attorney Joshua D. Kirshner dated November 27, 2012 re: submitted to propose the following modification of the pretrial schedule: The defendant will submit his motions on December 14, 2012, the Government will respond on January 4, 2013, and the defendant will reply on January 11, 2013. The parties, at this time, do not seek to change the conference (argument) or trial dates. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/27/2012)(bw)
PACER 17 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
PDF 16 Protective OrderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Evan Zauder...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/4/12)(jw)
Blank  Cash Bail Returned
CASH BAIL RETURNED as to Evan Zauder dated 08/31/2012, from Judge Judge Paul G. Gardephe, in the amount of $75,000.00, Check No. 00958302, Check Dated 09/05/2012, payable to KEITH ZAUDER and picked up by SAME on 09/11/2012. (jd)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: as to Evan Zauder, Brief due by 12/21/2012, Discovery due by 10/31/2012, Motions due by 1/30/2013, Responses to Brief due by 1/7/2013, Oral Argument set for 1/18/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (jbo)
Blank  Pretrial Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Pretrial Conference as to Evan Zauder held on 9/11/2012. Defendant Zauder present with attorney Benjamin Braffman. AUSA Andrea Surratt present. Court reporter Rebecca Forman present. Discovery to be made by 10/31/12. Defendants motions to be filed by 1/30/12; Governments opposition due by 12/21/12; Reply brief due by 1/7/13; oral argument or a conference set for 1/18/13 at 10:30am. An estimated 2 week trial is scheduled to begin 2/4/13. Time from today through 1/18/13 is excluded from speedy trial calculations in the interests of justice. Defendant remains detained. (jbo)
Blank  Plea Entered
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Plea entered by Evan Zauder (1) Count 1,2 Not Guilty. (jw)
Blank  Arraignment
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis:Arraignment on Bail Disposition Sheet as to Evan Zauder (1) Count 1,2 held on 9/5/2012. Deft present with atty Ben Brafman. AUSA Andrea Surratt present. Deft arraigned and pleads not guilty. Next PTC set for 9/10/12. Time excluded. On defendant's consent. (jw)
PDF 15 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Indictment
INDICTMENT FILED as to Evan Zauder (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
Blank  Case Designated ECF
Case Designated ECF as to Evan Zauder. (jm)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Paul M. Monteleoni by USA as to Evan Zauder in Support re: [9] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (vb)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Evan Zauder re: [9] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 8/1/12 until 8/31/12. Follows oral order of 8/1/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 8/1/12)(vb)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 13 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Paul Monteleoni in Support by USA as to Evan Zauder, the government is requesting a 30-day continuance 8/1/12. (jbo)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Evan Zauder re: [9] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 7/2/12 until 8/1/12. Follows oral order of 7/2/12. P.D. and to review forensic evidence. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 7/2/12)(jbo)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PDF 20 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Evan Zauder. (jm) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
PACER 12 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Evan Zauder. With the consent of the US Attorneys Office, it is hereby that deft's application is granted...that the Bureau of Prisons and the MDC Brooklyn, and any of its agents, representatives, employees or designees having custody of Deft to whom this order shall be presented, is hereby directed to grant continued access to deft Evan Zauder by Dr. Krueger and/or Dr. Kaplan, with prior notification to MDC Brooklyn...that this order shall remain in effect until further notice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 6/19/12)(jbo)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PDF 19 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
(S1) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Evan Zauder (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s. (jm) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
PACER 11 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Evan Zauder...that deft's application is granted...that the Bureau of Prisons and the MDC Brooklyn, and any of its agents, representatives, employees or designees having custody of Deft to whom this order shall be presented, is hereby directed to grant continued access to deft Evan Zauder by Dr. Krueger and/or Dr. Kaplan, with prior notification to MDC Brooklyn...that this order shall remain in effect until further notice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 6/15/2012)(gq)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PDF 18 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Evan Zauder addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Attorney Joshua D. Kirshner dated November 27, 2012 re: submitted to propose the following modification of the pretrial schedule: The defendant will submit his motions on December 14, 2012, the Government will respond on January 4, 2013, and the defendant will reply on January 11, 2013. The parties, at this time, do not seek to change the conference (argument) or trial dates. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/27/2012)(bw) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Blank  Bond Revocation Hearing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger:Bond Revocation Hearing as to Evan Zauder held on 6/8/2012. Deft appears with attys Joshua D. Kirshner and Mark M. Baker. AUSA Andrea Surratt present for the gov't. Bail revoked. Deft remanded. (gq).[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 10 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Evan Zauder. We are requesting direction from the Court. APPLICATION BY PTS IS GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (jbo)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PDF 16 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Evan Zauder...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/4/12)(jw) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of JusticeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Evan Zauder. Time excluded from 6/1/12 until 7/2/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 6/1/12)(jbo)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 8 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Paul Monteleoni in Support by USA as to Evan Zauder, the government is requesting a 30-day continuance until 7/2/12. (jbo)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 7 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Evan Zauder addressed to Honorable Henry Pitman from deft counsel Joshua Kirshner dated 5/31/12 re: deft is currently residing in West Orange, NJ. He respectfully seeks to change his residence to live with his aunt and uncle in West Hempstead, NY. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/31/12)(jbo)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Case Error
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Joshua D. Kirshner as to Evan Zauder: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Notice of Attorney Appearance, Document No. 6. This case is not ECF. (ka)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Case Error
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Mark M. Baker as to Evan Zauder: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Notice of Attorney Appearance, Document No. 5. This case is not ECF. (ka)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Case Error
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Benjamin Brafman as to Evan Zauder: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Notice of Attorney Appearance, Document No. 4. This case is not ECF. (ka)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 6 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua D. Kirshner appearing for Evan Zauder. (Kirshner, Joshua) Modified on 5/15/2012 (ka).[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 5 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark M. Baker appearing for Evan Zauder. (Baker, Mark) Modified on 5/15/2012 (ka).[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 4 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Brafman appearing for Evan Zauder. (Brafman, Benjamin) Modified on 5/15/2012 (ka).[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 3 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Agreement to Forfeit Property
AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT REAL PROPERTY by Evan Zauder. Personal Recognizance Bond in the amount of $ 2 Million PRB, 5 FRP'S; Secured by $75,000 Cash and Property; Sam and Loraine Vogel's Home; Beth Chiger's Home; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY and District of New Jersey; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Home Detention; Electronic Monitoring Condition as Needed by PTS; Deft to Live at 11 Crestwood Drive with Aunt and Uncle in West Orange, NJ; No Unsupervised Contact with Children; Computer Activity Monitored; No Viewing of Sexually Explicit Images Involving Children or Child Erotica; Deft to Be Released Upon Satisfaction of Following Conditions; 5 FRP'S; Post of $75,000; Remaining Conditions to be Met by 5/11/12 (dif)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Detention Hearing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein:Detention Hearing as to Evan Zauder held on 5/4/2012 with Retained Attorney Stephen Flamhaft and AUSA Andrea Surratt for the government. AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: $2,000,000 PRB; Co-Signed by 5 FRP'S; Secured by $75,000 Cash and Property Sam and Loraine Vogel's Home; Beth Chiger's Home; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY and District of New Jersey; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Home Detention; Electronic Monitoring Condition as Needed by PTS; Deft to Live at 11 Crestwood Drive with Aunt and Uncle in West Orange, NJ; No Unsupervised Contact with Children; Computer Activity Monitored; No Viewing of Sexually Explicit Images Involving Children or Child Erotica; Deft to Be Released Upon Satisfaction of Following Conditions: 5 FRP'S; Post of $75,000; Remaining Conditions to Be Met by 5/11/12; (dif)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 2 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Stephen Flamhaft appearing for Evan Zauder. (dif)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
PACER 1 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None ComplaintCourt Filing
COMPLAINT as to Evan Zauder (1). In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 2252A (a) (5) (B) (Child Pornography (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein) (dif)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Initial Appearance
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein:Initial Appearance as to Evan Zauder held on 5/2/2012., with Retained Attorney Stephen Flamhaft and AUSA Andrea Surratt for the government. Detention Hearing Scheduled for 5/4/12 at 10:30 AM (dif)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Arrest
Arrest of Evan Zauder. (dif)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]
Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
Attorney update in case as to Evan Zauder. Attorney Stephen Flamhaft for Evan Zauder added.. (dif)[1:12-mj-01173-UA]

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1,499 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?