Billy Bob Frakes
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-34898
District Judge Douglas O. Tice Jr., presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.vaeb.12-34898 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Billy Bob Frakes, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stuart Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sharon Choi Stuart +1 804 221 2162
No Logo Robert E. Hyman, Trustee
No Logo Victoria Dillera Frakes, Joint Debtor
  Entries (4) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 14 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
U.S. Treasury receipt of Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), List(s)(12-34898-DOT) [misc,2011amd] ( 30.00) filing fee. Receipt number 15342650, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
LBR 3015-2 Chapter 13 Plan and Related Motions Deficiency; Plan Due 9/4/2012. (Alley, Kay)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Meeting of Creditors: 10/04/2012, 11:00 AM, Office of the U.S. Trustee, 701 East Broad St., Suite 4300, Richmond, Virginia. Proofs of Claim due by 01/02/2013. Government Proofs of Claim due by 02/19/2013. Confirmation hearing: 10/31/2012, 11:10 AM, Chief Judge Tice's Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. Interim Trustee: Robert E. Hyman, .
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
U.S. Treasury receipt of Voluntary Petition under Chapter 13(12-34898) [misc,1188] ( 281.00) filing fee. Receipt number 15278933, amount $ 281.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 23 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?