Fawn Togs, Inc. v. Morton-norwich Products, Inc.
USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91060087-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Fawn Togs, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
v.
No Logo Morton-norwich Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Type Opposition
Status Code 9
  Entries (5) Calendar Events Related (2) Tools Right End
Blank 5 Filed: 12/21/1979, Entered: None N
Terminated
Blank 4 Filed: 11/6/1979, Entered: None N
Consent Judgment
Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/1978, Entered: None N
Answer
Blank 2 Filed: 12/14/1977, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Blank 1 Filed: 9/22/1977, Entered: None T
Filed

Statistics

This case has been viewed 11 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?