Wishgard, LLC
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-20613
District Judge Carlota M. Bohm, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.pawb.13-20613 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Brighton Resources, Inc., Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein-Burkley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kirk B. Burkley +1 412 456 8119 +1 412 456 8135 kburkley@bernsteinlaw.com
Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Wishgard, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Wishgard, LLC
  Entries (99) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 99 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
Emergency Motion TO RESCHEDULE DEADLINE FOR FILING PROOFS OF CLAIM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order Notice and Order Setting Hearing on An Expedited Basis # 3 Proposed Order Rescheduling Deadline to File Proofs of Claim) (Burkley, Kirk). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ATTORNEY NEEDS TO REFILE AND REDOCKET THIS ENTRY AS A TWO-PART MOTION USING: BANKRUPTCY/MOTION/(1)GENERIC MOTION (TO RESCHEDULE DEADLINE FOR FILING PROOFS OF CLAIM) AND (2) EXPEDITE HEARING. ALSO PAGES 2 THROUGH 5 WERE FILED LANDSCAPE INSTEAD OF PORTRAIT. PLEASE REFILE CORRECTLY. Modified on 6/27/2013 (gbro). (Entered: 06/26/2013)
PACER 98 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Erin K. Neugebauer Filed by Creditor Internal Revenue Service (Neugebauer, Erin) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
PACER 97 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service of Order Employing Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s): 96 Order on Application to Employ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Service list) (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 96 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
Order Granting Application to Employ Kirk B. Burkley and Bernstein-Burkley, P.C. as Attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related Doc # 82) Signed on 6/21/2013. (gbro) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 95 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
Monthly Financial Report for Filing Period 05/2013 Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (Harrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
PACER 94 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service OF APPLICATION TO EMPLOY BRANDON OTIS AND ALPERN ROSENTHAL AS FINANCIAL ADVISORS TO THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Doc. No. 91) AND ORDER SETTING DATE ON APPLICATION TO EMPLOY BRANDON OTIS AND ALPERN ROSENTHAL AS FINANCIAL ADVISORS TO THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Doc. No. 93) Regarding the Hearing on 7/23/2013. Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s): 91 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, 93 Order or Proceeding Memo Setting Hearing). (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
PACER 93 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
Order Setting Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 91 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2013 at 01:30 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 7/12/2013. (dsaw) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
PACER 92 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of No Objection to Application to Retain Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Regarding the Hearing on 6/26/2013. Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s): 82 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
PACER 91 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
Application to Employ Brandon Otis and Alpern Rosenthal as Financial Advisors Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Verification # 2 Proposed Order) (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
PACER 90 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s): 87 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Notice Date 06/08/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/09/2013)
PACER 89 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing. (Filed with Employee Identification Listed on Declaration). (gbro) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 88 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Order With Notice That the Debtor Shall Within 30 Days of Bar Date Serve a Completed Notice and File a Certificate of Service Within 10 Days. cm: P. Cordaro Signed on 6/6/2013. (gbro) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 87 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/3/2013 at 10:00 AM p12 Room 725 Liberty Center, Pittsburgh. Last day to oppose dischargeability due by 9/3/2013. Proofs of Claims due by 10/1/2013. (gbro) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 86 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (RE: related document(s): 1 Involuntary Petition Chapter 7 filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc.). (PLEASE NOTE: ATTORNEY NEEDS TO PROVIDE THE DEBTOR'S EMPLOYEE IDENTIFICATION NUMBER ON AN AMENDED DECLARATION). (gbro) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 85 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service OF APPLICATION TO RETAIN COUNSEL FOR THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Doc. No. 82) AND ORDER SETTING DATE CERTAIN FOR RESPONSE AND HEARING ON APPLICATION TO RETAIN COUNSEL FOR THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Doc. No. 83) Regarding the Hearing on 6/26/2013. Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s): 82 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
PDF 84 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
Petition Completed Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (Harrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
PACER 83 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
Order Setting Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 82 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). Hearing scheduled for 6/26/2013 at 10:30 AM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 6/18/2013. (dsaw) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
PACER 82 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
Application to Employ Kirk Burkley and Bernstein-Burkley, P.C. as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Verification # 2 Proposed Order) (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
PDF 81 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Statement Appointing Unsecured Creditors Committee
Docket Text: Statement that Unsecured Creditors Committee has been Appointed. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (on Behalf of the United States Trustee by, Joseph M. Fornari Jr)
PACER 80 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 78 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 05/15/2013. (Admin.)
PDF 79 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Notice of Meeting of Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Docket Text: Notice of Meeting of Committee of Unsecured Creditors FORMATION. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (on Behalf of the United States Trustee by, Joseph M. Fornari Jr)
PACER 78 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Order on Application to Employ
Docket Text: Order Granting Application to Employ Campbell & Levine, LLC as Attorneys for the Debtor (Related Doc # 61) Signed on 5/13/2013. (gbro)
PACER 77 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Certificate of No Objection
Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection with Regard to Application of the Debtor to Employ and Retain Campbell & Levine, LLC as its Attorneys, Nunc Pro Tunc, as of the Date of the Order for Relief Regarding the Hearing on 5/14/2013. Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 61 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 62 Order or Proceeding Memo Setting Hearing). (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 76 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Docket Text: 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 1 Involuntary Petition Chapter 7 filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc.). (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 75 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Notice Regarding Modification to Mailing Matrix
Docket Text: Notice Regarding Modification to Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 74 Filed: 5/5/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 68 Order on Motion to Pay). Notice Date 05/05/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 73 Filed: 5/5/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 66 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing). Notice Date 05/05/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 72 Filed: 5/5/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 64 Order on Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to Chapter 11). Notice Date 05/05/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 71 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joseph M. Fornari Jr on Behalf of the United States Trustee by Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (on Behalf of the United States Trustee by, Joseph M. Fornari Jr)
PACER 70 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Certificate of Service
Docket Text: Certificate of Service Regarding the Hearing on 5/14/2013. Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 61 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 62 Order or Proceeding Memo Setting Hearing). (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 69 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Hearing Held
Docket Text: Hearing Held on 05/02/2013 (RE: related document(s): 49 Motion for an Order Authorizing the Continued Use of Pre-Relief Date Bank Accounts filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Movant withdrew Motion orally at hearing. (gbro)
PACER 68 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Order on Motion to Pay
Docket Text: Order Granting Motion For An Order Authorizing (a) the payment of gap priority wages, and (b) reimbursement of business expenses (Related Doc # 48) Signed on 5/2/2013. (gbro)
PACER 67 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Hearing Held
Docket Text: Hearing Held on 05/02/2013 (RE: related document(s): 48 Emergency Motion Authorizing (a) the Payment of Gap Employee Priority Wages, and (b) Reimbursement of Business Expenses filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Motion is GRANTED. Order entered. (gbro)
PACER 66 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Order Scheduling Hearing
Docket Text: Order Signed 05/02/2013 - It is further ORDERED, that the Debtor shall file its schedules, statements of financial affairs and related documents on or before 05/31/2013; and it is further ORDERED, that if the Schedules are not filed pursuant to this order by 05/31/2013, a Rule to Show Cause Why Kip Tygard, Managing General Partner Should Not Be Held in Contemp or Sanctioned will be heard on 6/4/2013 at 01:30 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. (gbro)
PACER 65 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Hearing Held
Docket Text: Hearing Held on 05/02/2013 (RE: related document(s): 47 Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Motion is GRANTED. Order entered. Schedules, etc. are due by 05/31/2013, if not filed Rule to Show Cause set for 06/04/2013 at 1:30 PM. (gbro)
PACER 64 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Order on Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to Chapter 11
Docket Text: Order Granting Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to Chapter 11 (Related Doc # 46) Trustee Natalie Lutz Cardiello removed from the case. Signed on 5/2/2013. (gbro)
PACER 63 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Hearing Held
Docket Text: Hearing Held on 05/02/2013 (RE: related document(s): 46 Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to 11 filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Motion is GRANTED. Order entered. (gbro)
PACER 62 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Order or Proceeding Memo Setting Hearing
Docket Text: Order Setting Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 61 Application to Employ Counsel for Debtor, Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2013 at 01:30 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/10/2013. (ddau)
PACER 61 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Application to Employ
Docket Text: Application to Employ Campbell & Levine as Attorneys Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Paul J. Cordaro # 2 Proposed Order) (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 60 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Supplement/Addendum
Docket Text: Supplement/Addendum to Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 59 Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 59 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Certificate of Service
Docket Text: Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 46 Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to 11 filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 47 Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 48 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 49 Motion filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 55 Order Scheduling Hearing, 56 Order Scheduling Hearing, 57 Order Scheduling Hearing, 58 Order Scheduling Hearing). (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 58 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Order Scheduling Hearing
Docket Text: Order Signed 04/29/2013 Scheduling EMERGENCY Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 49 Motion For An Order Authorizing the Continued Use of Pre-Relief Date Bank Accounts filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2013 at 01:00 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/2/2013 at 12:00 PM. (gbro)
PACER 57 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Order Scheduling Hearing
Docket Text: Order Signed 04/29/2013 Scheduling EMERGENCY Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 48 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2013 at 01:00 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/2/2013 at 12:00 PM. (gbro)
PACER 56 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Order Scheduling Hearing
Docket Text: Order Signed 04/29/2013 Scheduling EMERGENCY Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 47 Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2013 at 01:00 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/2/2013 at 12:00 PM. (gbro)
PACER 55 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Order Scheduling Hearing
Docket Text: Order Signed 04/29/2013 Scheduling EMERGENCY Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 46 Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to 11 filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2013 at 01:00 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/2/2013 at 12:00 PM. (gbro)
PACER 54 Filed: 4/27/2013, Entered: 4/28/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 45 Order Regarding Involuntary Chapter). Notice Date 04/27/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 53 Filed: 4/27/2013, Entered: 4/28/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 42 Order -Non-motion related-). Notice Date 04/27/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 52 Filed: 4/27/2013, Entered: 4/28/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 41 Memorandum Opinion). Notice Date 04/27/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 51 Filed: 4/27/2013, Entered: 4/28/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s): 43 Notice Appointing Trustee). Notice Date 04/27/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 50 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Auto-docket of credit card
Docket Text: Receipt of Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to 11(13-20613-CMB) [motion,mcn7to11] ( 922.00) filing fee. Receipt number 9818407, amount $ 922.00. (U.S. Treasury)
PACER 49 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Motion
Docket Text: Emergency Motion of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Continued Use of Pre-Relief Date Bank Accounts Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS# (3) Proposed Order) (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 48 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Motion to Pay
Docket Text: Emergency Motion to Pay Pursuant to Sections 363(b), 502, 507 and 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (A) the Payment of Gap Employee Priority Wages, and (B) Reimbursement of Business Expenses Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS# (2) Proposed Order) (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 47 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing
Docket Text: Emergency Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS# (2) Proposed Order) (Harrison, Kathryn)
PACER 46 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to 11
Docket Text: Emergency Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 7 to 11 . Fee Amount $922 Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS# (2) Proposed Order) (Harrison, Kathryn)
PDF 45 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Order and Notice Regarding Involuntary Chapter Chater 7 Petition Signed on 4/25/2013. Incomplete Filings due by 5/9/2013.Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/14/2013 at 01:30 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. (llea) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 44 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Order for Relief Signed on 4/25/2013. Incomplete Filings due by 5/9/2013. List of all Creditors and Mailing Matrix due 5/2/2013. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/22/2013. (llea) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 43 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Appointment of Trustee. Natalie Lutz Cardiello added to the case. (llea) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 42 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Order Signed on 4/25/2013. Wishgard's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. An Order for Relief under Chapter 7 of Title 11 of the U.S. Code is granted. (RE: related document(s): 41 Memorandum Opinion). (llea) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PDF 41 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Memorandum Opinion Signed on 4/25/2013. (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case). (llea) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 40 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
Brief/Memorandum Post-Trial Brief of Petitioning Creditors in Support of Involuntary Petition Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (RE: related document(s): 25 Response filed by Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc., Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman, 31 Brief/Memorandum filed by Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc., Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman, 35 Hearing Held, 37 Transcript). (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
PACER 39 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
Brief/Memorandum Post-Trial Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Involuntary Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 35 Hearing Held). (Harrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
PACER 38 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Transcript. Notice is hereby given that a transcript of the hearing held on 4/4/2013 on Motion to Dismiss Involuntary Petition has been filed. Transcripts are available for inspection only at the Clerk's Office or may be purchased from the Court Transcriber during the 90 day restriction period. (RE: related document(s): 37 Transcript). (jhel) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 37 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/4/2013. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office or contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J COURT TRANSCRIBERS, INC, Telephone number (609)586.2311. (RE: related document(s) 36 Transcript Request). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/19/2013. Redaction Request due 5/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission due 5/13/2013. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted through 7/9/2013. (jhel) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 36 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
Transcript Requested by Kathryn Harrison, Esq. (RE: related document(s): 35 Hearing Held 04/04/2013). The transcript is being prepared by J&J COURT TRANSCRIBERS, INC. The estimated completion for this transcript is 04/11/2013. (gbro) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
PACER 35 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
Evidentiary Hearing Held on 04/04/2013 (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Briefs from both sides due in 2 weeks, then Court to take under advisement. (gbro) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
PACER 34 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
Final Pre-Trial Conference Held on 04/03/2013 (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (gbro) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
PACER 33 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
Stipulation By Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC and Between Wishgard, LLC.Joint Stipulation of Facts and Exhibits Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (RE: related document(s): 26 Order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial, 28 Pre-Trial Statement filed by Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc., Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman, 29 Pre-Trial Statement filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 32 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Motion to Compel
Motion to Compel Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 31 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
Brief/Memorandum Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (RE: related document(s): 28 Pre-Trial Statement filed by Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc., Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman, 30 Brief/Memorandum filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 30 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Pre-Trial Statement Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (Harrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 29 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
Pre-Trial Statement of Wishgard, LLC Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (Harrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 28 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
Pre-Trial Statement of Respondents, the Petitioning Creditors Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 19 Order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial, 25 Response filed by Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc., Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman, 26 Order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial). (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 27 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 26 Order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial). Notice Date 03/27/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
PACER 26 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
Order Signed on 3/25/2013 Granting the Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Pre-Trial Statements (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case). Final Pre-Trial Conference RESCHEDULED for 4/3/2013 at 01:30 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Pre-Trial Statements due by 4/1/2013. Evidentiary Hearing is RESCHEDULED for 4/4/2013 at 10:00 AM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. (gbro) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 25 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
Response Petitioning Creditors' Response in Opposition to Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Involuntary Bankruptcy Petition Regarding the Hearing on 04/04/13. Filed by Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Proposed Order # 5 Certificate of Service) (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
PACER 24 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Pre-Trial Statements Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Harrison, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
PACER 23 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 19 Order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial). Notice Date 03/14/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
PACER 22 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 18 Order). Notice Date 03/14/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
PACER 21 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF EMERGENCY MOTION TO ALLOW EVIDENCE AT APRIL 2, 2013 HEARING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION (Doc. 17); ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION (Doc. 18); ORDER SCHEDULING EVIDENTIARY HEARING (Doc. 19) Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (RE: related document(s): 18 Order, 19 Order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial). (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 20 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service OF NOTICE OF JOINDER OF RAYMOND BAUMAN AS PETITIONING CREDITOR (Doc No. 16) Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (RE: related document(s): 16 Notice filed by Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman). (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 19 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
Order Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing/Pretrial Hearing Signed on 3/12/2013. (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case). Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/28/2013 at 03:00 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Pre-Trial Statement due by 3/25/2013. Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/3/2013 at 01:30 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. (gbro) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
PACER 18 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
Order Granting Emergency Motion To Allow Evidence At 04/02/2013 Hearing And Request For Expedited Consideration (Related Doc # 17) Signed on 3/12/2013. The hearing scheduled for 04/02/2013 at 1:30 p.m. on the Debtor's Motion to Dismiss is CANCELLED. A new hearing at which time the parties may present evidence in support of their positions through documents and/or testimony will be set by the Court. The parties are permitted to conduct discovery on the factual issues raised in the petition and the Motion to Dismiss prior to the scheduled hearing. (gbro) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
PACER 17 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
Emergency Motion EMERGENCY MOTION TO ALLOW EVIDENCE AT APRIL 2, 2013 HEARING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION Filed by Petitioning Creditors Raymond Bauman, Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Notice of Hearing) (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
PACER 16 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
Notice Regarding Joinder of Raymond Bauman as Petitioning Creditor. Filed by Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman (RE: related document(s): 11 Involuntary Petition - Add Parties filed by Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC, Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc., Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditor Raymond Bauman). (Lewis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
PACER 15 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service Regarding the Hearing on 4/2/2013. Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC, 14 Order or Proceeding Memo Setting Hearing). (Cordaro, Paul) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
PACER 14 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
Order Setting Hearing on (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 4/2/2013 at 01:30 PM at p02 Courtroom B, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 3/22/2013. (dsaw) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
PACER 13 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC (RE: related document(s): 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC). (Cordaro, Paul) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
PACER 12 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
Motion to Dismiss Case / Motion to Dismiss Involuntary Petition Filed by Debtor Wishgard, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cordaro, Paul) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
PACER 11 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013 Involuntary Petition - Add Parties
Docket Text: 0, and Raymond Bauman added to case. Filed by Creditor Raymond Bauman, Petitioning Creditors Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (Lewis, Joshua)
PACER 10 Filed: 2/16/2013, Entered: 2/17/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): 8 Order Designating Principal Operating Officer/General Partner). Notice Date 02/16/2013. (Admin.)
PACER 9 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Involuntary Summons Service Executed
Docket Text: Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Kip Tygard. Service Executed on: 2/14/2013, Answer Due on: 3/6/2013; Wishgard, LLC. Service Executed on: 2/14/2013, Answer Due on: 3/6/2013. Add 3 days to the answer due date if service was made through the mail. Filed by Petitioning Creditors Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC, Managing General Partner Kip Tygard, Debtor Wishgard, LLC (Lewis, Joshua)
PACER 8 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Order Designating Principal Operating Officer/General Partner
Docket Text: Order Designating Managing General Partner. Kip Tygard Designated as Managing General Partner. Signed on 2/14/2013. (gbro)
PACER 7 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Involuntary Summons Issued
Docket Text: 2 Involuntary Summons Issued on Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC. Issued 02/14/2013 (gbro)
PACER 5 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Statement of Corporate Ownership
Docket Text: Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Brighton Resources, Inc..; Filed by Petitioning Creditor Brighton Resources, Inc. (Burkley, Kirk)
PACER 4 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Statement of Corporate Ownership
Docket Text: Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Southeast Land Services, LLC..; Filed by Petitioning Creditor Southeast Land Services, LLC (Burkley, Kirk)
PACER 3 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Designation of Individual in Involuntary Case
Docket Text: Designation of Individual in Involuntary Case. Kip Tygard added as managing general partner. Filed by Petitioning Creditors Brighton Resources, Inc., Southeast Land Services, LLC (Burkley, Kirk)
PACER 6 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
Corrective Entry (RE: related document(s): 1 Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition. Fee Amount $306 Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Warning: filers not known.. (Burkley, Kirk). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: FILED BY PETITIONING CREDITORS: SOUTHEAST LAND SERVICES, LLC AND BRIGHTON RESOURCES, INC ). (gbro) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
PACER 2 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
Receipt of Involuntary Petition Chapter 7(13-20613) [misc,invol7] ( 306.00) filing fee. Receipt number 9560535, amount $ 306.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 1 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Involuntary Petition Chapter 7
Docket Text: Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition. Fee Amount $306 Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Warning: filers not known.. (Burkley, Kirk). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: FILED BY PETITIONING CREDITORS: SOUTHEAST LAND SERVICES, LLC AND BRIGHTON RESOURCES, INC. Modified on 2/14/2013 (gbro).

Statistics

This case has been viewed 76 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?