Vachagan Gasparyants
North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-30666
District Judge J. Craig Whitley, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ncwb.13-30666 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Anna Gasparyants, Debtor
No Logo Vachagan Gasparyants, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Dillenbeck Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sean Thomas Dillenbeck +1 704 512 0981 +1 866 629 8617
No Logo R. Keith Johnson, Trustee
  Entries (13) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 13 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)10 Final Decree/Case Closed). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
PACER 12 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)9 Order Discharging Debtor). No. of Notices: 27. Notice Date 07/10/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
PACER 11 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
Clerk's Entry to Denote Correction to Docket. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Text changed to indicate only the Final Decree filed. See Document 9 for Discharge. (RE: related document(s)10 Final Decree/Case Closed). (jlb) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
Court Order Discharging Debtor(s) and Final Decree Closing Case. (jlb) Modified on 7/9/2013 (jlb). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Text changed to indicate only the Final Decree filed. See Document 9 for Discharge. (Entered: 07/09/2013)
PACER 9 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
Order Discharging Debtors (auto7) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
PACER 8 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
Financial Management Course Certificate filed by Sean Thomas Dillenbeck on behalf of Anna Gasparyants, Vachagan Gasparyants. (Dillenbeck, Sean) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
PACER 7 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
Financial Management Course Certificate filed by Sean Thomas Dillenbeck on behalf of Anna Gasparyants, Vachagan Gasparyants. (Dillenbeck, Sean) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
PACER 6 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 30. Notice Date 04/04/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
PACER 5 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)4 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/04/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
PACER 4 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/01/2013 at 11:00 AM at 3-Charlotte First Meeting Room Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 07/01/2013. (AutoDkt) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 3 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Sean Thomas Dillenbeck on behalf of Anna Gasparyants. (Dillenbeck, Sean) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
PACER 2 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Sean Thomas Dillenbeck on behalf of Vachagan Gasparyants. (Dillenbeck, Sean) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
PACER 1 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 7 - Filing Fee Amount $ 306 (Dillenbeck, Sean) (Entered: 03/29/2013)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 40 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?