LANNETT COMPANY, INC. et al v. ASHERMAN
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-02006
District Judge John R. Padova, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.paed.2-13-cv-02006 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 Contract: Other
  Entries (15) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 15 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ARTHUR BEDROSIAN, LANNETT COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BURKE, MAURA) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
Exhibit "A" to Plaintiffs' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RETURN OF PRIVLEGED COMMUNICATIONS (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBIT "A" TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RETURN OF PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATIONS UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL BE PERMITTED TO FILE EXHIBIT "A" TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RETURN OF PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATIONS UNDER SEAL TO THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/30/13. 7/31/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document 11 MOTION for Protective Order and Return of Privileged Documents filed by ARTHUR BEDROSIAN, LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order, # 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law)(BURKE, MAURA) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 11 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order and Return of Privileged Documents filed by ARTHUR BEDROSIAN, LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G)(BURKE, MAURA) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 8/5/13 WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/22/13. 7/23/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss filed by RICHARD E. ASHERMAN.Memorandum, Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B (Part 2))(GRECO, PAUL) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, PLEAD, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED FROM 6/4/13 TO 7/10/13. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/31/13. 5/31/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Pursuant to Local R. Civ. P. 7.4 for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by RICHARD E. ASHERMAN. (GRECO, PAUL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/30/2013 (nd, ). (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT RICHARD E. ASHERMAN TO ANSWER, PLEAD, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENED FROM 5/14/13 UNTIL 6/4/13. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/14/13. 5/15/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 5 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Pursuant to Local R. Civ. P. 74 for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by RICHARD E. ASHERMAN. (GRECO, PAUL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/9/2013 (nd, ). (Entered: 05/08/2013)
PACER 4 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J. GRECO on behalf of RICHARD E. ASHERMAN with Certificate of Service(GRECO, PAUL) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARTHUR BEDROSIAN, LANNETT COMPANY, INC. of Complaint and Summons (KRUEGER, GEORGE) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..(jwl, ) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 1 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against RICHARD E. ASHERMAN ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 080290.), filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ARTHUR BEDROSIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Track Form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Designation Form, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(jwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2013: # 16 Exhibit) (jwl, ). (Entered: 04/16/2013)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 28 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?