Dolores Kollmer v. BMW of North America LLC
California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-10444
District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.2-11-cv-10444 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Bmw Of North America LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Roy Morse Brisbois +1 213 250 1800 +1 213 250 7900 brisbois@lbbslaw.com
Eric Y Kizirian +1 213 580 3981 +1 213 250 7900 kizirian@lbbslaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 Contract: Other
  Entries (15) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 15 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED: CV 11-10444-PSG (CWx): Dolores Kollmer v. BMW of North America LLC. SA CV 11-1952-PSG (CWx): Mary Limon v. BMW of North America LLC et al. FURTHER ORDERED that parties file all future pleadings in the following action only: CV 11-7667-PSG (CWx): Brad Aarons v. BMW of North America LLC. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
PACER 14 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez 13 , Defendant BMW of North America LLC answer due 3/12/2012. (lw) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
PACER 13 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 12, 2012 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Request to Extend Time for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC to Respond to Complaint of Plaintiff Dolores Kollmer by an Additional 30 days, Until March 12, 2012)(Kizirian, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 12 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Roy M Brisbois counsel for Defendant BMW of North America LLC. Adding Roy M. Brisbois as attorney as counsel of record for BMW of North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Brisbois, Roy) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
PACER 11 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION for attorney Scott Alan George to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9731392 paid) 7 , for the following reasons: Local counsel reflects a Philadelphia address on the CA State Bar web site; see LR 83-2.3.3. Please refer to the Court's Internet website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov for Local Rules, General Order 10-07 and applicable forms. (jp) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
PACER 10 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION for attorney Scott Alan George to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9731392 paid.)First APPLICATION for attorney Scott Alan George to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9731392 paid.) 7 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Local Counsel lists his address with their Los Angeles office. State Bar has attorney listed in Philadelphia. See LR 83-2.3.3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BMW of North America LLC answer now due 2/9/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by DEFENDANT BMW of North America LLC.(Kizirian, Eric) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT BMW of North America LLC, identifying Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft. (Kizirian, Eric) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
PACER 7 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
First APPLICATION for attorney Scott Alan George to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9731392 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Dolores Kollmer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
PACER 6 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER regarding Newly Assigned Cases: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the Court as well. "To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Fed. R. Civ. P., particularly Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, this Court's Order for Jury Trial, and this Court's Order for CourtTrial. (See document for further details) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ir) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
PACER 5 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re CASE TRANSFERRED TO JUDGE GUTIERREZ: PLEASE BE ADVISED that this action has been reassigned to the Honorable Philip S. Gutierrez, United States District Judge. Accordingly, please substitute the initials PSG in place of the initials JAK(FFMx). The case number will now read: CV 11-10444-PSG (CWx). Henceforth, it is imperative that the initials PSG be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of documents. (see documents for further details) (bm) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
PACER 4 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV11-07667 PSG (CWx). Case transferred from Judge John A Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV11-10444 PSG (CWx).Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (at) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
PACER 3 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Dolores Kollmer. Related Case(s): 2:11-CV-07667-PSG (CWx). (ghap) (yl). (Entered: 12/20/2011)
PACER 2 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dolores Kollmer, identifying Other Affiliate Brad Aarons for Dolores Kollmer. (ghap) (yl). (Entered: 12/20/2011)
PACER 1 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant BMW of North America LLC. Case assigned to Judge John A Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Dolores Kollmer.(ghap) Modified on 12/20/2011 (ghap). (yl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2011: # 1 Summons) (yl). (Entered: 12/20/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 77 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?