USA v. Siofele
Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-00161
District Judge John L. Kane, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cod.1-10-cr-00161 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Sonny Siofele, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
La Fonda R. Traore +1 303 294 7002 +1 303 294 1192 LaFonda_Traore@fd.org
  Entries (22) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 22 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
Receipt for Transfer Document as to Sonny Siofele (mjgsl, ) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
PACER 21 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
Probation/Supervised Release Jurisdiction Transfer to United States District Court - Hawaii as to Sonny Siofele. Transmitted Transfer of Jurisdiction form, with certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer/Transmittal Letter)(mjgsl, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
PACER 20 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT by Judge John L. Kane on 10/4/2010 as to defendant Sonny Siofele (1). Count 1: DISMISSED. Count 2: Defendant is sentenced to a term of imprisonment for 12 months. Supervised release for a term of 1 year, to run concurrent to the term of supervised release ordered in U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii, Case No. 99-00207HG-02. $25 assessment fee. Criminal Case Terminated. (tllsl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for Sentencing held before Judge John L. Kane held on 9/29/2010 as to defendant Sonny Siofele. Defendant plead guilty to Count Two of the Indictment. Defendant is sentenced as reflected on the record. Defendant is remanded. (Court Reporter Kara Spitler) (kfinn) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
SEALED ADDENDUM to Presentence Report 17 as to Sonny Siofele (aarag, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 17 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
SEALED PRESENTENCE REPORT as to Sonny Siofele (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(aarag, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 16 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
SEALED PRESENTENCE REPORT first disclosure for attorney review as to Sonny Siofele (aarag, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF PLEA OF GUILTY by Defendant Sonny Siofele. (kfinn) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Sonny Siofele (kfinn) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for Change of Plea Hearing as to Sonny Siofele held before Judge John L. Kane 7/21/2010; Guilty Plea entered as to Count 2 of the Indictment. Governments oral Motion to Dismiss Count One of the Indictment is GRANTED. Sentencing set for 9/29/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 802 before Judge John L. Kane. Defendant is remanded. (Court Reporter Tracy Weir) (kfinn) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
PACER 12 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER Setting Change of Plea Hearing as to Sonny Siofele re 11 Notice of Disposition: Statement in Advance of Change of Plea and Plea Agreement due by noon on 7/19/2010. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/21/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 802. The jury trial set for 7/19/10 is VACATED. The Motions Hearing/Final Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/9/10 is VACATED, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/24/2010. (mjg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
PACER 11 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disposition by Sonny Siofele (Jones, La Fonda) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER Setting Trial Date and Other Deadlines as to Sonny Siofele: All pretrial motions due by 6/15/2010. Responses due by 6/25/2010. Three day Jury Trial set for 7/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 802. A one-hour hearing on all pending non-evidentiary motions, if any, and Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/9/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 802, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/27/10. (mjg, ) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Discovery Conference Memorandum and ORDER: Estimated Trial Time - less than 4 days as to Sonny Siofele by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/19/10. (lab, ) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Sonny Siofele by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/19/10. (lab, ) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Arraignment, Discovery and Detention Hearing as to Sonny Siofele held on 5/19/2010. AUSA Michael Carey; Defendant present in custody with Edward Harris (For LaFonda Jones); Pretrial Sue Heckman. Plea NOT GUILTY on all counts entered by Sonny Siofele. Discovery memorandum executed. ORDERED: Defendant detained. Counsel to contact chambers. TEXT ENTRY ONLY-NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (Tape #FTR KLM AM) (lab, ) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/14/10 in case as to Sonny Siofele. (lab, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: La Fonda R. Jones appearing for Sonny Siofele (Jones, La Fonda) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
Sealed Document-Financial Affidavit (lab, ) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Initial Appearance as to Sonny Siofele held on 5/14/2010. AUSA Michael Carey; Defendant present in custody without counsel; Pretrial Sue Heckman. Defendant advised. Federal Public Defender appointed. Arraignment, Discovery and Detention Hearing set for 5/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Defendant remanded. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (Tape #FTR KLM PM) (labsl, ) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
PACER 2 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Sonny Siofele. (mjg, ) (Main Document replaced on 3/25/2010) (mjg2, ). Modified on 3/25/2010 to reflect single page document (mjg, ). (Entered: 03/25/2010)
PACER 1 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
INDICTMENT as to Sonny Siofele (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Information Sheet) (mjg, ) (Entered: 03/25/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 66 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?