SPEARS et al v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-02451
District Judge Michael M. Baylson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.paed.2-13-cv-02451 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo AL-AHAID DURECOUT, Plaintiff
No Logo ALTHEA R. BAGBY, Plaintiff
No Logo ALYSSA R. BAGBY, Plaintiff
No Logo AMARI WRIGHT, Plaintiff
No Logo AMAYA REED-CLARK, Plaintiff
No Logo ANAYSIA GRIFFIN, Plaintiff
No Logo ANGEL ST. JOHN, Plaintiff
No Logo ANN T. GROSS, Plaintiff
No Logo ANTORIA VERNON, Plaintiff
No Logo ASIA GALLOWAY, Plaintiff
No Logo BENJAMIN GROSS, Plaintiff
No Logo BERTHA GALLOWAY-HAMPTON, Plaintiff
No Logo BRIDGET GRAHAM, Plaintiff
No Logo CARL J. MATTSON, Plaintiff
No Logo CARLOS PADILLA, Plaintiff
No Logo CASSANDRA CLARK, Plaintiff
No Logo DANIEL M. ROBINSON, Plaintiff
No Logo DANIELLE GROSS, Plaintiff
No Logo DANNY R. PREBLE, Plaintiff
No Logo DARLENE L. MORINA, Plaintiff
No Logo DAVID K. CLEMENT, Plaintiff
No Logo DAWN ROBERTS, Plaintiff
No Logo DESHAUN MYRICKS, Plaintiff
No Logo EDWARD F. MATLOCK, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo ELEANOR DIGIOVACCHINO, Plaintiff
No Logo ELSIE M. JONES, Plaintiff
No Logo FAITH J. CLEMENT, Plaintiff
No Logo FREDERICK SUTER, Plaintiff
No Logo GABRIELLE M. REEVES, Plaintiff
No Logo GREGORY BYNUM, Plaintiff
No Logo GREGORY KERSHAW, Plaintiff
No Logo GRETCHEN MATLOCK, Plaintiff
No Logo HAROLD JOHNSON, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo IRIS CLEMENT, Plaintiff
No Logo IRIS PADILLA, Plaintiff
No Logo IRMA STEVENSON, Plaintiff
No Logo JADEN GAINES, Plaintiff
No Logo JAMES E. WOOD, Plaintiff
No Logo JASON J. BILDERBACK, Plaintiff
No Logo JEAN ALLEVA, Plaintiff
No Logo JEFFERY HAINES, Plaintiff
No Logo JENNA OUELLETTE, Plaintiff
No Logo JOEL OUELLETTE, Plaintiff
No Logo JOSE THORNTON, Plaintiff
No Logo JOSEPH L. MORINA, Plaintiff
No Logo JUDY SUTER, Plaintiff
No Logo JULIE A. SUTER, Plaintiff
No Logo JUNE MAICCO, Plaintiff
No Logo KARIS PADILLA, Plaintiff
No Logo KAYLA HAMPTON, Plaintiff
No Logo KENNETH MATZ, Plaintiff
No Logo KENYA GALLOWAY, Plaintiff
No Logo KERMIT HARRIS, Plaintiff
No Logo KYLE SPEARS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAYSER & FREIWALD PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
AARON J. FREIWALD +1 215 875 8000 ajf@layserfreiwald.com
JOSEPH MARANO +1 215 875 8000 jm@layserfreiwald.com
No Logo LAQWAN SIMS, Plaintiff
No Logo LAURA ALLEVA, Plaintiff
No Logo LAURIE SPEARS, Plaintiff
No Logo LEONARD MAICCO, Plaintiff
No Logo LEVI EPPS, Plaintiff
No Logo LILLIE ANN WOOD, Plaintiff
No Logo LINDA DUNN, Plaintiff
No Logo LORA MATZ, Plaintiff
No Logo LOURDES FLETCHER, Plaintiff
No Logo MAE VICTOR, Plaintiff
No Logo MALINDA TAYLOR, Plaintiff
No Logo MARGARET TRUSTY, Plaintiff
No Logo MARIA S. ORTIZ, Plaintiff
No Logo MARK COOPER, Plaintiff
No Logo MARK MILHOUS, SR., Plaintiff
No Logo MARSHA ROTHMILLER, Plaintiff
No Logo MARY HARRIS, Plaintiff
No Logo MELLISSA GAINES, Plaintiff
No Logo MELVIN CLARK, Plaintiff
No Logo MICHELE PREBLE, Plaintiff
No Logo MILVINIA ST. JOHN, Plaintiff
No Logo MONA M. FLICK, Plaintiff
No Logo NASIR GALLOWAY, Plaintiff
No Logo NATASHA CLEMENT, Plaintiff
No Logo NATHAN ROBINSON, Plaintiff
No Logo NEVAEH GALLOWAY, Plaintiff
No Logo PATRICIA MILLER, Plaintiff
No Logo PATRICK A. BAGBY, Plaintiff
No Logo PRINCILLA JOAN MITCHELL, Plaintiff
No Logo RATHA A. BYNUM, Plaintiff
No Logo RAYMOND R. MILLER, Plaintiff
No Logo RONALD E. DOUGLASS, Plaintiff
No Logo RONALD T. SWANSON, Plaintiff
No Logo SAEED CRITE, Plaintiff
No Logo KEYSER BLDG, Plaintiff
No Logo SHAKIRA MYRICKS, Plaintiff
No Logo SHAMEKA CRITE, Plaintiff
No Logo SOPHIA MITCHELL, Plaintiff
No Logo STEPHEN ASAY, Plaintiff
No Logo STEPHEN MITCHELL, Plaintiff
No Logo SYLVIA N. EPPS, Plaintiff
No Logo TANESHA H. BYNUM, Plaintiff
No Logo TAYLOR GAINES, Plaintiff
No Logo THOMAS GAINES, III, Plaintiff
No Logo TILIKA GRIFFIN, Plaintiff
No Logo TRACEY BROOKS, Plaintiff
No Logo TURQUOISE DAVID, Plaintiff
No Logo VERONICA A. THORNTON, Plaintiff
No Logo VINCENT VOLTAGGIO, Plaintiff
No Logo VITO DIGIOVACCHINO, Plaintiff
No Logo WADE CLEMENT, Plaintiff
No Logo WALTER A. VICTOR, SR., Plaintiff
No Logo WALTER STEVENSON, Plaintiff
No Logo WILLIAM WILLIAMS, Plaintiff
No Logo YOHANCE A. MCDOUGALD, Plaintiff
No Logo ZAKEIRA ROBINSON, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Consolidated Rail Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns, White & Hickton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
DAVID A. DAMICO +1 412 995 3208 +1 412 995 3300 dadamico@bwhllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ALISON C. FINNEGAN +1 215 751 2117 +1 215 751 2205 afinnegan@schnader.com
RALPH G. WELLINGTON +1 215 751 2488 +1 215 751 2205 rwellington@schnader.com
CSX Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Csx Transportation, Inc., Defendant
Exxon Mobil Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
MARC A. ROLLO +1 856 795 2121 mrollo@archerlaw.com
No Logo Gatx Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JACQUELINE M. CAROLAN +1 215 299 2863 +1 215 299 2150 jcarolan@foxrothschild.com
Amy C. Purcell +1 215 299 2798 +1 215 299 2150 apurcell@foxrothschild.com
No Logo MUREX, N.A., LTD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Palmer, Biezup & Henderson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Daniel Harold Wooster +1 215 625 9900 +1 212 625 0185 dwooster@pbh.com
No Logo Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Defendant
No Logo Oxy Vinyls, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NATALIE D'AMORA +1 215 963 3300 ndamora@archerlaw.com
No Logo Union Tank Car Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAVIN O'NEIL RICCI CEDRONE & DISIPIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
WAYNE A. GRAVER +1 215 627 0303 +1 215 627 2551 wgraver@lavin-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 P.I.: Other
  Entries (24) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 24 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (rf, ) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
PDF 23 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
ORDER THAT MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TO REMOVE CSX CORPORATION FROM THE CAPTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/21/13. 5/22/13 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
PDF 22 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(FREIWALD, AARON) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PACER 21 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by OXYVINYLS, LP re 14 MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey and for Severance NOTICE TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A CHANGE OF VENUE AND SEVERANCE (D'AMORA, NATALIE) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PACER 20 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Seminole Gulf Railway, L.P. by KYLE SPEARS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MARANO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PACER 19 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT EXXONMOBILE MAY ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED FOR A PERIOD OF 30 DAYS TO 6/12/2013. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/14/20103. 5/14/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PACER 18 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE M. CAROLAN on behalf of GATX CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(CAROLAN, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PACER 17 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT UNLESS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT, OXYVINLYS NEED NOT FILE AN ANSWER OR A RESPONSIVE PLEADING IN THIS MATTER DURING THE PENDENCY OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND. IF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND IS DENIED, OXYVINYLS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE AN ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO REMAND IS ENTERED. IF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED, OXYVINYLS OBLIGATION TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD SHALL BE DETERMINED BY THE COURT TO WHICH THIS MATTER IS REMANDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/13/13. 5/13/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
PACER 16 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT MUREX N.A., LTD MAY ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO 6/7/13.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/13/13. 5/13/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
PACER 15 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY AND CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION & CSX TRANSPORTATION HAVE UNTIL 5/31/13 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/10/13. 5/10/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
PACER 14 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey and for Severance filed by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.Memorandum, Affidavit (Ex. A) and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(FINNEGAN, ALISON) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
PACER 13 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Occidental Petroleum Corporation with Certificate of Service by OXYVINYLS, LP.(D'AMORA, NATALIE) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
PACER 12 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT GATX CORPORATION AND UNION TANK CAR COMPANY HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 6/10/13 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/9/13. 5/10/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
PACER 11 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. WOOSTER on behalf of MUREX, N.A., LTD (WOOSTER, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
PACER 10 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption to Remove CSX Corporation as a Defendant filed by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(FINNEGAN, ALISON) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
PACER 9 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GATX CORPORATION.(PURCELL, AMY) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
PACER 8 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by GATX CORPORATION. (PURCELL, AMY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/9/2013 (nd, ). (Entered: 05/09/2013)
PACER 7 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, CSX CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form)(rf, ) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
PACER 6 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. DAMICO on behalf of CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DAMICO, DAVID) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
PACER 5 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON C. FINNEGAN on behalf of CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(FINNEGAN, ALISON) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
PACER 4 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CSX Transportation Inc. by CSX CORPORATION.(rt) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
PACER 3 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Norfolk Southern Corporation by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(rt) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
PACER 2 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CSX Corporation, and Norfolk Southern Corporation by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION.(rt) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
PDF 1 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, CSX CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number April Term 2013, 1885, with Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 081315) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form)(rt) (Entered: 05/06/2013)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 78 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?