Michael Totaro
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-26660
District Judge Raymond T. Lyons Jr., presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.njb.12-26660 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Albert Russo, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Albert Russo +1 609 587 6888 +1 609 587 9676 docs@russotrustee.com
No Logo Belinda Totaro, Joint Debtor
No Logo Michael Totaro, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David L. Stevens +1 973 696 8391 dstevens@scuramealey.com
  Entries (88) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 89 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
Amended Schedule(s) : I,J filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 88 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
Third Modified Chapter 13 Plan - After Confirmation. Motions Included: Motion to Avoid Lien. (related document:64 Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motions - After Confirmation filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 87 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Order Resolving Woodlands Community Associations's Motion For Relief From Stay re: 2420 Bayberry Court, Mays Landing, New Jersey and 2702 Evergreen Court, Mays Landing, New Jersey. (Related Doc # 84). The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors's Attorney, Trustee, US Trustee and Movant's Attorney. Signed on 4/25/2013. (bla) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 86 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
Certification in Opposition to Creditor's Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay (related document:84 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 2420 Bayberry Court AND 2702 Evergreen Court. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Eric S. Kershenblatt on behalf of Woodlands Community Association. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2013 at 09:00 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. filed by Creditor Woodlands Community Association) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 85 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
Certification in Opposition to (related document:84 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 2420 Bayberry Court AND 2702 Evergreen Court. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Eric S. Kershenblatt on behalf of Woodlands Community Association. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2013 at 09:00 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. filed by Creditor Woodlands Community Association) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) Modified on 4/8/2013 (seg). /s/ SIGNATURE MISSING (Entered: 04/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 84 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
Motion for Relief from Stay re: 2420 Bayberry Court AND 2702 Evergreen Court. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Eric S. Kershenblatt on behalf of Woodlands Community Association. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2013 at 09:00 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Certification pty mgr certification# 2 Certificate of Service cert of mailing# 3 Proposed Order proposed order) (Kershenblatt, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Trustee Annual Report filed by Albert Russo. (Russo (N/A), Albert) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 82 Filed: 3/2/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 81 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Payment Schedule: $12,993 Paid To Date; $1,800 For 52 Months Beginning 2/1/13.. (related document:64 Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motions - After Confirmation filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro) Motions included in plan are Granted.. The following parties were served: Debtors, Andrew L. Spivack, Esq., Melissa Licker, Esq., William Powers, Esq., Debtors' Attorney, Trustee and US Trustee. Signed on 2/27/2013. The follow up deadline is 10/3/2017. (bla) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 80 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
Post Confirmation Notice of Distribution filed by Albert Russo. (Russo (N/A), Albert) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 79 Filed: 2/10/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/10/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 78 Filed: 2/10/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/10/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 77 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/08/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 76 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
Order Granting Application for Extension of Loss Mitigation (Related Doc # 71). Loss Mitigation Period Extended to: 4/30/13. The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee, Creditor, Creditor's Attorney and US Trustee. Signed on 2/7/2013. (dmi) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 75 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay re: 3133 SIR HAMILTON CIRCLE# 6, TITUSVILLE, FL (Related Doc # 68). The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee, US Trustee and Movant's Attorney. Signed on 2/6/2013. (slf) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 74 Filed: 2/3/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/03/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 73 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
Consent Order IN LIEU OF OBJECTION TO CONFIRMATION AND VACATING STAY AS TO REAL PROPERTYORDER (related document:70 Certificate of Consent filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). Filed by William M. E. Powers III . The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee, US Trustee and Movant's Attorney. Signed on 1/31/2013. (dmi) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 72 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document:64 Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motions - After Confirmation filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). filed by Albert Russo. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Russo (NA), Albert) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 71 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
Application for Extension of Loss Mitigation Period. Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. Objection deadline is 2/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 70 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Consent (related document:64 Modified Chapter 13 Plan - After Confirmation. Motions Included:. filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Filed by William M.E. Powers on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Powers, William) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 69 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
Substitution of Attorney, terminating Melissa N. Licker and adding R.A. Lebron. Filed by R.A. Lebron. (Lebron, R.) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 68 Filed: 1/6/2013, Entered: None
Motion for Relief from Stay re: 3133 Sir Hamilton Circle #6, Titusville, Florida 32780-4963. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Jennifer R. Gorchow on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Hearing scheduled for 2/5/2013 at 09:00 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certification) (Gorchow, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 67 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Plan No. of Notices: 37. Notice Date 12/28/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 66 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Modification of Plan. No. of Notices: 37. Notice Date 12/28/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 65 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
Confirmation Hearing Scheduled (related document:64 Modified Chapter 13 Plan - After Confirmation. Motions Included:.). Confirmation hearing to be held on 2/5/2013 at 09:30 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. Last day to Object to Confirmation 1/29/2013. (jey) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 64 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
Modified Chapter 13 Plan - After Confirmation. Motions Included:. (related document:29 Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motions - Before Confirmation filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit attachment to plan) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 63 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Transfer of Claim re: Claim Transferred From FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. to LVNV Funding LLC. (related document:61 Transfer of Claim). (jey) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 62 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/15/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 61 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
Transfer of Claim. Amount to be transferred $ 2413.25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. (Claim No. 4) To LVNV Funding LLC. (Gaines, Susan) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 60 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
Order Granting Application For Compensation for David L. Stevens, fees awarded: $4769.00, expenses awarded: $382.35 (Related Doc # 46). The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee and US Trustee. Signed on 11/9/2012. (slf) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 59 Filed: 10/28/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/28/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 58 Filed: 10/28/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/28/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 57 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
Order Granting Request For Extension of Loss Mitigation (related document:56 Status Report filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Date Extended to: 1/31/13 The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Creditor, Creditor's Attorney, Trustee and US Trustee. Signed on 10/26/2012. (dmi) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 56 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
Status Report (related document:19 Order on Notice of Request for Loss Mitigation). filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. Objection deadline is 10/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 55 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Alexandra T. Garcia on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., as successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP. (Garcia, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 54 Filed: 10/13/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/13/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 53 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 32. Notice Date 10/12/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 52 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
Post Confirmation Notice of Distribution filed by Albert Russo. (Russo (N/A), Albert) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 51 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
Amended Order (related document:47 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee, Melissa N. Licker,Andrew L. Spivack and US Trustee. Signed on 10/11/2012. (dmi) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 50 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
Hearing Rescheduled from October 29, 2012 at 10:00 am. (related document:46 Application for Compensation for David L. Stevens, Debtor's Attorney, period: 4/30/2012 to 9/18/2012, fee: $7545.00, expenses: $382.35. Filed by David L. Stevens. Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2012 at 10:00 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro) Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2012 at 12:00 PM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (jey) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 49 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Service (related document:46 Application for Compensation for David L. Stevens, Debtor's Attorney, period: 4/30/2012 to 9/18/2012, fee: $7545.00, expenses: $382.35. Filed by David L. Stevens. Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2012 at 10:00 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 48 Filed: 10/7/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/07/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Payment Schedule: $2,100.00 for 60 months beginning 7/1/12. (related document:29 Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motions - Before Confirmation filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Motions included in plan are granted. The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee, Melissa N. Licker,Andrew L. Spivack and US Trustee. Signed on 10/5/2012. The follow up deadline is 11/1/2017. (dmi) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
Application for Compensation for David L. Stevens, Debtor's Attorney, period: 4/30/2012 to 9/18/2012, fee: $7545.00, expenses: $382.35. Filed by David L. Stevens. Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2012 at 10:00 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Invoice# 2 Exhibit Retainer Agreement# 3 Proposed Order) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 45 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
Post Confirmation Notice of Distribution filed by Albert Russo. (Russo (N/A), Albert) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 44 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/26/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Service (related document:37 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
Consent Order resolving objection to confirmation (related document:41 Certificate of Consent filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Filed by David L. Stevens . The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee, US Trustee and Melissa Licker Esq. Signed on 9/24/2012. (dmi) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Consent (related document: deseqno102 Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled). Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/20/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
Consent Order resolving objection to confirmation (related document:38 Certificate of Consent filed by Creditor CITIMORTGAGE, INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION). Filed by Jennifer R. Gorchow . The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Trustee, US Trustee and Movant's Attorney. Signed on 9/17/2012. (dmi) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Consent (related document:27 Objection to Confirmation of Plan filed by Creditor CITIMORTGAGE, INC.). Filed by Jennifer R. Gorchow on behalf of CITIMORTGAGE, INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION. (Gorchow, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) F (related document:35 Amended Schedules filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee and US Trustee. Signed on 9/14/2012. (mmf) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/12/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
Amended Schedule(s) : F Fee Amount $ 30 filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate (admin) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jennifer R. Gorchow on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Gorchow, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Plan No. of Notices: 26. Notice Date 08/29/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document:29 Amended Modified Chapter 13 Plan - Before Confirmation. Motions Included: Motion to Avoid Lien. filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro) filed by Melissa N. Licker on behalf of BAYVIEW, as servicer for M&T BANK. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Licker, Melissa) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
Amended Modified Chapter 13 Plan - Before Confirmation. Motions Included: Motion to Avoid Lien. (related document:26 Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motions - Before Confirmation filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Service (related document:26 First Modified Chapter 13 Plan - Before Confirmation. Motions Included: Motion to Avoid Liens. filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 8/19/2012, Entered: None
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document:26 First Modified Chapter 13 Plan - Before Confirmation. Motions Included: Motion to Avoid Liens. filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro) filed by Andrew L. Spivack on behalf of CITIMORTGAGE, INC.. (Spivack, Andrew) (Entered: 08/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 8/18/2012, Entered: None
First Modified Chapter 13 Plan - Before Confirmation. Motions Included: Motion to Avoid Liens. (related document:2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro, 25 Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motions - Before Confirmation filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 08/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
First Modified Chapter 13 Plan - Before Confirmation. Motions Included: Motion to Avoid Liens. (related document:2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) Modified on 8/17/2012 (jey). DOCUMENT DOES NOT INDICATE IF NOTICE IS OR IS NOT REQUIRED. (Entered: 08/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
Objection to Confirmation of Plan. filed by Andrew L. Spivack on behalf of CITIMORTGAGE, INC.. (Spivack, Andrew) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Document re: Letter Designating Contact Person (related document:19 Order Granting Notice of Request for Loss Mitigation) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Attachments: # 1 Letter Requesting Information# 2 Certificate of Service) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 8/5/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jennifer R. Gorchow on behalf of CITIMORTGAGE, INC.. (Gorchow, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/02/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/02/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
Order Granting Notice of Request for Loss Mitigation(Related Doc # 16). The following parties were served: Debtors, Debtors' Attorney, Creditor, Creditor's Attorney, Trustee and US Trustee. Signed on 7/31/2012. (bla) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document:2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro). filed by Albert Russo. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Russo (NA), Albert) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Prober, Dean) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Request for Loss Mitigation filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. Objection deadline is 07/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 7/14/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Andrew L. Spivack on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., as successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP. (Spivack, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Melissa N. Licker on behalf of BAYVIEW, as servicer for M&T BANK. (Licker, Melissa) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by William M.E. Powers on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Powers, William) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
Change of Address for Citimortgage Inc. From: PO Box 9438, Gaithersburg, MD 20898 To: PO Box 183040, Columbus, OH 43218-3040 filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 7/4/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Plan No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 07/04/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 7/4/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 07/04/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 7/4/2012, Entered: None
Notice and Order to Pay Trustee No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/04/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 7/4/2012, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Confirmation Hearing No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 07/04/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Service (related document:2 Chapter 13 Plan, Motions included: Motion to Avoid Liens and Reclassify Claim from Secured to Completely Unsecured. Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Michael Totaro, Belinda Totaro. filed by Debtor Michael Totaro, Joint Debtor Belinda Totaro) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro, Michael Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
Confirmation Hearing Scheduled (related document:2 Chapter 13 Plan, Motions included: Motion to Avoid Liens and Reclassify Claim from Secured to Completely Unsecured. Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Michael Totaro, Belinda Totaro.). Confirmation hearing to be held on 8/21/2012 at 09:30 AM at RTL - Courtroom 8, Trenton. Last day to Object to Confirmation 8/14/2012. (blh) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 6/30/2012, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Trustee Albert Russo, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Trenton - Robbinsville.Complaint to determine dischargeability of certain debts deadline: 09/24/2012. Proof of claim due by 10/24/2012. (Entered: 06/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Belinda Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Michael Totaro,. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Plan, Motions included: Motion to Avoid Liens and Reclassify Claim from Secured to Completely Unsecured. Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Michael Totaro, Belinda Totaro. (Stevens, David) Modified on 7/2/2012 to ADD MOTION. (blh) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition filed by David L. Stevens of Scura, Mealey, Wigfield & Heyer LLP on behalf of Michael Totaro, Belinda Totaro. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 93 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?