Diane Duffy-Woolfork
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 1:13-bk-02979
District Judge Mary D France, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.pamb.1-13-bk-02979 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Diane Duffy-Woolfork, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kara Katherine Gendron +1 717 232 6650 +1 717 232 0477 karagendronecf@gmail.com
Dorothy L. Mott +1 717 232 6650 +1 717 232 0477 doriemott@aol.com
  Entries (15) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 15 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
Pre-Confirmation Certification of Compliance with Post Petition Domestic Support Obligations in accordance with 11 U.S.C. Section 1325(a)(8) and (A)(9). Filed by Dorothy L Mott on behalf of Diane Duffy-Woolfork. (Mott, Dorothy) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
Objection to Ch. 13 Plan Filed by Trustee (RE: related document(s)3). (dehart, III(db), Charles) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
PACER 13 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Service of Chapter 12/13 Plan (RE: related document(s)11). Notice Date 07/31/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
PACER 12 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice setting Confirmation Hearing (RE: related document(s)11). Notice Date 07/31/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
PACER 11 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Confirmation Hearing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. (Gambini, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
Certification that 341 Meeting of Creditors Held. Notice of confirmation hearing to be sent to all creditors. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.). Last day to Object to Plan Confirmation 8/28/2013. Confirmation hearing to be held on 9/11/2013 at 09:30 AM at 3rd & Walnut Sts., Bankruptcy Courtroom (3rd Floor), Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Harrisburg, PA. (dehart, III(jd), Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
PACER 9 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of 341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13) (RE: related document(s)7). Notice Date 06/09/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
PACER 8 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
Order filing fee due in the amount of $ 281.00 for Voluntary Petition (RE: related document(s)1). Fee due on: 6/14/2013. (Gambini, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
PACER 7 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Trustee Charles J. DeHart, III (Trustee), with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/25/2013 at 11:00 AM at Federal Bldg, Trustee Hearing Rm, Rm 1160, 11th Fl, 228 Walnut St, Harrisburg, PA. Proofs of Claim due by 10/23/2013. Government Proofs of Claim due by 12/03/2013. Objections to Dischargeability due by 09/23/2013. (Docketer, Automatic) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 6 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Certification of No Payment Advices Filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Law Office of Dorothy L. Mott on behalf of Diane Duffy-Woolfork. (Gendron, Kara) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 5 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Law Office of Dorothy L. Mott on behalf of Diane Duffy-Woolfork (RE: related document(s)1). (Gendron, Kara) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 4 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Affidavit of disbursement of Trustee funds upon Dismissal and/or Conversion prior to confirmation Filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Law Office of Dorothy L. Mott on behalf of Diane Duffy-Woolfork. (Gendron, Kara) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 3 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Plan (Includes no Motion(s) to Avoid Liens and no Motion(s) to Value Collateral) Filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Law Office of Dorothy L. Mott on behalf of Diane Duffy-Woolfork (RE: related document(s)1). (Gendron, Kara) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 2 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Law Office of Dorothy L. Mott on behalf of Diane Duffy-Woolfork (RE: related document(s)1). (Gendron, Kara) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 1 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Filing fee due in the amount of $ 281.00 filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Law Office of Dorothy L. Mott on behalf of Diane Duffy-Woolfork. (Gendron, Kara) (Entered: 06/06/2013)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 24 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?