Pruitt et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:13-cv-00726
docket://gov.uscourts.okwd.5-13-cv-00726 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Alan Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alan Wilson (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alan Wilson
No Logo Bill Schuette, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bill Schuette (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bill Schuette
No Logo Derek Schmidt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Derek Schmidt (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Derek Schmidt
No Logo Greg Abbott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Greg Abbott (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Greg Abbott
No Logo John Swallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E Swallow (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John E Swallow
No Logo Jon C Bruning, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jon Bruning (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jon Bruning
No Logo Luther Strange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Luther Strange (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Luther Strange
No Logo Samuel S Olens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sam Olens (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sam Olens
No Logo Scott Pruitt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas Alan Bates +1 405 522 1013 +1 405 522 0085 Tom.Bates@oag.ok.gov
Scott David Boughton +1 405 521 4274 +1 405 521 4518 fc_docket@oag.state.ok.us
Paul C Eubanks +1 405 522 8992 +1 405 522 0608 clayton.eubanks@oag.ok.gov
E. Scott Pruitt +1 405 521 3921

Toggle Switch Represented by Seby Larsen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marian Camille Larsen +1 303 248 3779 mimi.larsen@sebylarsen.com
Paul M. Seby +1 303 248 3772 paul.seby@sebylarsen.com
No Logo Tom Horne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Tom C Horne (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tom C Horne
No Logo Wayne Stenehjem, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Wayne Stenehjem (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Wayne Stenehjem
No Logo Wyoming State of, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jay Jerde (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jay Jerde
v.
United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
James J. Schwartz +1 202 616 8267 +1 202 616 8202 james.schwartz@usdoj.gov
  Entries (26) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 26 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
JUDGMENT - Pursuant to a separate order issued this same date, this action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/18/2013. (ks) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 25 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 18 defendant's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this action (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/18/2013. (ks) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
PACER 24 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 22 defendant's unopposed motion for extention of time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to 18 defendant's motion to dismiss; Defendant shall file its reply on or before November 25, 2013. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/12/2013. (ks) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 Response in Opposition to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, James) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit P. Clayton Eubanks)(Seby, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 19 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Extending the Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response to defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before October 22, 2013. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/27/2013. (ks) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Seby, Paul) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY of Appearance by James J Schwartz on behalf of All Defendants (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 15 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order for Relief from Requirements of Local Civil Rules 83.2 and 83.3. The Attorneys General for plaintiffs States of Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Kansas, Michigan, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, Texas, Utah, and Wyoming are relieved from complying with Local Civil Rules 83.2 and 83.3. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/26/2013. (ks) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Order for Relief from Requirements of LCvR 83.2 and 83.3 and Brief in Support by Scott Pruitt. (Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 13 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Order Extending the Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 17, 2013. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/16/2013. (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY of Appearance by Tamra T Moore on behalf of All Defendants (Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Pruitt. Sanford C Coats served on 7/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Confirmation of Certified Delivery)(Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Pruitt. Eric H Holder, Jr served on 7/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Confirmation of Certified Delivery)(Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Pruitt. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 7/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt)(Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (njr) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY of Appearance by Marian C Larsen on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Larsen, Marian) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY of Appearance by Paul M Seby on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Seby, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
Receipt for Money Received from Angie Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500033857 regarding 1 Complaint. (cpp) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Bates on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Bates, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY of Appearance by Paul C Eubanks on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick R Wyrick on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Wyrick, Patrick) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against United States Environmental Protection Agency filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2/6/13 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - EPA Letter Denying Fee Waiver Request, # 3 Exhibit 3 FOIA Appeal of Fee Waiver Denial, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Email re Appeal Review, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Email re Appeal Review and Ext to 5/31/13, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Denial of Appeal of Fee Waiver, # 7 Exhibit 7 - EPA Emails, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kw, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit 1 - 2/6/13 FOIA Request
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit 2 - EPA Letter Denying Fee Waiver Request
  • Attachment 3: Exhibit 3 FOIA Appeal of Fee Waiver Denial
  • Attachment 4: Exhibit 4 - Email re Appeal Review
  • Attachment 5: Exhibit 5 - Email re Appeal Review and Ext to 5/31/13
  • Attachment 6: Exhibit 6 - Denial of Appeal of Fee Waiver
  • Attachment 7: Exhibit 7 - EPA Emails
  • Attachment 8: Civil Cover Sheet
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 113 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?