Haynes Vs Macphee
Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 97 991236
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Haynes, Carmen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gregory M. Haynes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Haynes, Gregory M. +1 415 546 0777
No Logo Haynes, Melvin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gregory M. Haynes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Haynes, Gregory M. +1 415 546 0777
v.
No Logo Adams Gibson & Macphee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caron, Eastridge & Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caron, Eastridge & Hanson Llp +1 510 521 8748
No Logo Adams, John, Defendant
No Logo Antonini, Adrienna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caron, Eastridge & Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caron, Eastridge & Hanson Llp +1 510 521 8748
No Logo Brewer, Peter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caron, Eastridge & Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caron, Eastridge & Hanson Llp +1 510 521 8748
No Logo Bruce Macphee & Associates, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caron, Eastridge & Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caron, Eastridge & Hanson Llp +1 510 521 8748
No Logo Gibson, John, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caron, Eastridge & Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caron, Eastridge & Hanson Llp +1 510 521 8748
No Logo Macphee, Bruce, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caron, Eastridge & Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caron, Eastridge & Hanson Llp +1 510 521 8748
No Logo Macphee, Robert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caron, Eastridge & Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caron, Eastridge & Hanson Llp +1 510 521 8748
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (106) Calendar Events Related (6) Tools Right End
Blank 106 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998
Memorandum Of Costs (summary)
Blank 105 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998
Off Trial Calendar, Summary Judgment (301/ptr1)
Blank 104 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 Court Filing
Sett Conf Off Calendar, Summary Judgment Granted For Deft By Judge David Garcia (305 Alvarado)
Blank 103 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998
Proof Of Service Of Order On Motion For Summary Judgment
Blank 102 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
Blank 101 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998
Order On Mo For Summary Judgment, Alternatively Summary Adjudication, And For Sanctions
Blank 100 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998
Judgment-microfilmed R/b F: 268-39
Blank 99 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998
Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
Blank 98 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998
Mtn For Sj/sa--argued And Submitted.(301)
Blank 97 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998
Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
Blank 96 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998
Mtn For Sj--cont To October 8, 1998 Pursuant To Stip.(301)
Blank 95 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998
Proceedings Reported By Beldon Yee
Blank 94 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998
Mtn For Sj/sa Sanctions--transferred To Rm 301 For 10/6/98.(302)
Blank 93 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998
Objections To Evidence Submitted In Oppos To Motion
Blank 92 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998
Reply To Oppos To Motion For Summary Judgment/summary Adjudication & For Sanctions
Blank 91 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998
Request Fo Judicial Ntc In Supp Of Motion For Summary Judg-ment/summary Adjudication & For Sanctions
Blank 90 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998
Proof Of Service
Blank 89 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998
Pltf Separate Statement Of Disputed Facts
Blank 88 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998
Declaration Of Melvin Haynes
Blank 87 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998
Declaration Of Carmen Haynes
Blank 86 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998
Pts & Auths In Oppos To Summary Judgment
Blank 85 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998
Declaration Of Gregory M Haynes In Oppos To Summary Judgment
Blank 84 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998
Association Of Counsel, Atty For Defnts
Blank 83 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998
Amended Signature Page Of Motion For Summary Judgment To Beheard On 10/2/98
Blank 82 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
170.6 Ccp Disqualification As Tojudge Quidachay By Deft's
Blank 81 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
Peremptory Challenge
Blank 80 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
Mo For Summ Judgment
Blank 79 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
$100. Pd By: Defts-mo For Summ Judgment
Blank 78 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
Ntc Of Mo For Summ Judgment, Calendar Motion: Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Adjudication Of Issues, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Oct-02-1998 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
Blank 77 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
Declaration Of Peter N Brewer
Blank 76 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts
Blank 75 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
Declaration Of Marthas Louise Caron
Blank 74 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998
Reply To Oppos To Motion To Compel Further Responses To Defnts' Special Interrogatories (set One)
Blank 73 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998
Order Compelling Further Answers To Interrogatories And Forsanctions
Blank 72 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998
Oppos To Mo To Compel
Blank 71 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998
Sample Separate Statement Of Disc Dispute
Blank 70 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998
Declaration Of Gregory M Haynes
Blank 69 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998
Memo Of Pst & Auths In Supp Of Motion
Blank 68 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998
Declaration Of Counsel In Supp Of Motion
Blank 67 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998
Proof Of Service
Blank 66 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998
Ntc Of Motion To Compel Further Answers To Interrogatories;with Memo Of P/a & Declaration Of Counsel, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers Hearing Set For Aug-17-1998 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
Blank 65 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998
Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Oct-21-1998 At 03:00 Pm In Dept 305
Blank 64 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998
Plan I Trial, Deft Demands,
Blank 63 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998
Mailing (ca033) From 07/06/98 X-1 01:30 Pm For 10/21/98 Sc12 03:00 Pm
Blank 62 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998
Osc Status Conference Order
Blank 61 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998
Defts Supplemental Status & Setting Conference Statement
Blank 60 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998
Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Jul-06-1998 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
Blank 59 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998
Mailing (ca070) From 05/29/98 X-1 09:00 Am For 07/06/98 X-1 01:30 Pm
Blank 58 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998
Osc Re Dismissal/sanctions On 7/6/98 @ 1:30 Pm
Blank 57 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998
$380 Pd By: Robert Macphee And Adreinna Antonini
Blank 56 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998
Answer Of Robert Macphee And Adreinna Antonini
Blank 55 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998
Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
Blank 54 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998
Mtn To Reconsider-demurrer--denied.request For Sanctions Denied.(301)
Blank 53 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998
Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For May-29-1998 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
Blank 52 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998
Declaration In Reply To Oppos To Defts' Mo For Reconsidera-tion Re: Demurrer
Blank 51 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998
P&a's In Oppos To Mo For Reconsideration
Blank 50 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998
Declaration Of Gregory M Haynes
Blank 49 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998
Defnts' Suppl Status And Setting Conference Statement
Blank 48 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998
Status Conference Order
Blank 47 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998
Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 04/24/98 X-1 09:00 Am For 05/29/98 X-1 09:00 Am
Blank 46 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998
Defts Initial Status & Setting Conference Statement
Blank 45 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998
Memo Of P&a's In Supp Of Mo For Partial Reconsideration
Blank 44 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998
Ntc Of Mo For Reconsideration Re: Defts' Demurrer, Calendar Motion: Reconsideration Hearing Set For Apr-29-1998 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
Blank 43 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998
Declaration Of Counsel In Supp Of Mo For Reconsiderationn
Blank 42 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998
> And John Gibson
Blank 41 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998
> Brewer, Robert Macphee, Adams Gibson & Macphee >
Blank 40 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998
Answer Of Bruce Macphee & Associates, Inc, Peter>
Blank 39 Filed: 3/26/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998
Order After Hearing On Mo For Sanctions
Blank 38 Filed: 3/26/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998
Order After Hearing On Demurrer Of Defts
Blank 37 Filed: 3/25/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998
Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
Blank 36 Filed: 3/25/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998
Demurrer-cmplt/sanctions--argued And Taken Under Submission(301)
Blank 35 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998
Defts' Reply To Pltfs' Oppos Re: Defts' Mo For Sanctions Pursuant To Ccp 128.7
Blank 34 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998
Defts' Reply To Oppos To Demurrer
Blank 33 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
Proof Of Service-oppos To Demurrer Of Defts
Blank 32 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
Declaration Of Gregory M Haynes
Blank 31 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
Oppos To Demurrer Of Defts
Blank 30 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
Oppos To Mo For Sanction
Blank 29 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
Oppos To Mo For Sanctions
Blank 28 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998
Ntc Of Mo For Sanctions Pursuant To Ccp 128.7 Hearing Set For Mar-25-1998 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
Blank 27 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998
Request For Judicial Ntc
Blank 26 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998
Memo Of P&a's In Supp Of Mo For Sanctions Pursuant To Ccp 128.7
Blank 25 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998
Proof Of Service
Blank 24 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998
Amendment To Demurrer
Blank 23 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
Memo Of P&a In Supp Of Demurrer To Complt
Blank 22 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
Request For Judicial Ntc
Blank 21 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
Proof Of Service
Blank 20 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
Declaration Of Counsel In Supp Of Demurrer To Complt
Blank 19 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
> John Gibson
Blank 18 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
> Robert Macphee, Adams Gibson & Macphee, And >
Blank 17 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
> Ciates Inc, Adreinna Antonini, Peter Brewer, >
Blank 16 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
Demurrer Of Bruce Macphee, Bruce Macphee & Asso->
Blank 15 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
> John Gibson
Blank 14 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
> Robert Macphee, Adams Gibson & Macphee, And >
Blank 13 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
> Associates Inc, Adreinna Antonini, Peter Brewer>
Blank 12 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
$1,740. Pd By: Bruce Macphee, Bruce Macphee & >
Blank 11 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
Ntc Of Demurrer, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Mar-25-1998 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
Blank 10 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998
Proof Of Service
Blank 9 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998
Proof Of Service
Blank 8 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998
Proof Of Service
Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998
Order To Show Cause-hrg On: Mar 17, 1998 At 9:00 Am
Blank 6 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998
Mailing (ca074) From 03/17/98 X-1 09:00 Am For 03/17/98 X-1 09:00 Am
Blank 5 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998
Order To Show Cause - Proof Of Service Hearing Set For Mar-17-1998 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
Blank 4 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 11/20/1997
Civil Cover Sheet Received
Blank 3 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 11/20/1997
Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Apr-24-1998 At 08:45 Am In Dept 212
Blank 2 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 11/20/1997
Summons Issued
Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 11/20/1997
Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle); Malicious Prosecution

Statistics

This case has been viewed 16 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?