Capital One Bank v. George W Wolff Et Al
Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 03 419765
Superior Court Judge Sue M. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunt & Henriques

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hunt, Michael Scott
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 5, Defendant
No Logo Wolff, George W, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (7) Calendar Events Related (1) Tools Right End
PDF 7 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Aug-22-2003 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
PDF 6 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Dismissal Of Entire Action Without Prejudice
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003
Before Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar By Court. (212)
Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Capital One Bank Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Hours
PDF 3 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jul-22-2003 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
PDF 2 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
PDF 1 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Complaint
Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Capital One Bank As To Defendant Wolff, George W Does 1 To 5 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-22-2003 Proof Of Service Due On Jun-23-2003 Case Management Statement Due On Aug-07-2003

Statistics

This case has been viewed 28 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?