Tara Ross v. Hossein Kajouee Et Al
Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 07 459792
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Ross, Tara An Individual, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Waukeen McCoy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Waukeen McCoy +1 415 675 7705 +1 415 675 2530 mccoylawsf@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Hossein Kajouee Dba Hyde Out, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley, Curley, Asiano, Barrabee, Abel & Kowalski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Arthur W. Curley +1 415 464 8888 +1 415 464 8887 acurley@bcamlaw.com
No Logo Hossein, Kajouee Dba Hyde Out, Defendant
No Logo Kajouee, Hossein An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley, Curley, Asiano, Barrabee, Abel & Kowalski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Arthur W. Curley +1 415 464 8888 +1 415 464 8887 acurley@bcamlaw.com
No Logo Kajouee, Jill An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley, Curley, Asiano, Barrabee, Abel & Kowalski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Arthur W. Curley +1 415 464 8888 +1 415 464 8887 acurley@bcamlaw.com
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (29) Calendar Events Related (4) Tools Right End
PDF 29 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
PDF 28 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Minutes For February 25, 2008 At 3:30 Pm
Minutes For February 25, 2008 At 3:30 Pm
Blank 27 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008
Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Mar-10-2008 - Case Settled.
Blank 26 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Court Filing
Settlement Conference Held, Case Settled, Terms Placed On The Record. Judge Diane Elan Wick, Clerk Karissa Shaw, Reporter Joyce Long Csr #8620. (611)
PDF 25 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice Of Non-payment Of Jury Fees
Notice Of Non-payment Of Jury Fees
Blank 24 Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: 12/24/2007
Notice Of Change Of Firm Name, Filed By Attorney For Defendants
Blank 23 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4. (administrative Fee) Is Ordered Off Calendar/fee Paid. Proceedings Reported By: Maureen Howard, Csr# 7156. (212)
Blank 22 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
Mini-minutes For Dec-13-2007 10:30 Am
PDF 21 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Miscellaneous Order To Show Cause (1)
Order To Show Cause To Waukeen Q. Mccoy Set For Dec-13-2007 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No 4. Notice Sent By Court.
Blank 20 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007
Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Defts' Motion To Compel, Issuing A Protective Order And Granting Monetary Sanctions
PDF 19 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
PDF 18 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Order
Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Compel, Issuing A Protective Order And Granting Monetary Sanctions.
PDF 17 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Order
Order - Joint Stipulation & Proposed Order To Extend Deadline For Completion Of Plaintiff's Deposition.
Blank 16 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
Fee Pd: Joint Stip And Proposed Order To Extend Deadline For Completion Of Pl's Deposition Filed By Defendant Kajouee, Hossein An Individual Kajouee, Jill An Individual Hossein Kajouee Dba Hyde Out
PDF 15 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Order
Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Compel, Issuing A Protectiver Order And Granting Monetary Sanctions
PDF 14 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Mar-10-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Feb-25-2008 At 3:30 Pm In Department 611. Notice Sent By Court.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007
Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Dec-20-2007 - By Court.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007
Discovery 610, Defendant Hossein Kajouee's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And Attendance At Deposition. Request For Production Is Granted In Part, Denied In Part. Protective Order: Deposition Is Granted. Monetary Sanctions Is Grant Ed. Monetary Sanctions In The Amount Of $790 Are To Be Paid Within 30 Days Of Notice Of This Order. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan.
Blank 11 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007
Mini-minutes For Jun-25-2007 9:00 Am
Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007
Notice Of Objection To Trial And Settlement Conference Dates Filed By Defendant Kajouee, Hossein An Individual Kajouee, Jill An Individual Hossein Kajouee Dba Hyde Out
Blank 9 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007
Reply To Pltf's Oppos To Motion To Compel, Request For Protective Order And Request For Monetary Sanctions Filed By Defendant Kajouee, Hossein An Individual Kajouee, Jill An Individual Hossein Kajouee Dba Hyde Out
Blank 8 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Ross, Tara An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
PDF 7 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Dec-20-2007 At 3:30 Pm In Department 622. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jan-07-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jun-22-2007 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Blank 6 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
Opposition To Mtn To Compel Oppos. To Req. For Protective Order; Req. For Sanctions And Dec. Of Spencer F Smith Filed By Plaintiff Ross, Tara An Individual
Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Kajouee, Jill An Individual Hossein Kajouee Dba Hyde Out Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
Blank 4 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel, Request For Protective Order And For Sanctions, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Kajouee, Hossein An Individual Kajouee, Jill An Individual Hearing Set For Jun-25-2007 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
PDF 3 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Kajouee, Hossein An Individual Kajouee, Jill An Individual Hossein Kajouee Dba Hyde Out
PDF 2 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
PDF 1 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Complaint
Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Ross, Tara An Individual As To Defendant Kajouee, Hossein An Individual Kajouee, Jill An Individual Hossein, Kajouee Dba Hyde Out Does 1-5 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-22-2007 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-23-2007 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-07-2007

Statistics

This case has been viewed 77 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?