Kelly Sayre v. John R Bisenius
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. CISCV131183

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sayre Kelly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcspadden, John +046248 046 462 4882
v.
No Logo Bisenius John R, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lopez, Gayle +1 510 947 6499
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Sayre Kelly
Complaint 1 Filing Date 1/2/1995
Complaint 1 Status Entry Of Ct. Ordered Dismissal 10/21/1996
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996
Enter Req Dismiss Entire Case
    Blank 10 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996
    Clk Jud Arb Award/notice Entry
      Blank 9 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996
      Cmc Held Further Cmc 10/8/96
        Blank 8 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996
        Reporter:csr#:5936 Carole Sanders
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996
          First Appearance Fee - Superior Court - $182
            Blank 6 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996
            Bisenius John R
              Blank 5 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996
              Answer
                Blank 4 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996
                Bisenius John R
                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996
                  Pay-fe S01568 182.00 1st Apr See Register Of Act Ions.
                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996
                    Begin Automated Register Of Actions.
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: 1/3/1996
                      Pay-fe S01405 182.00 Complain

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 39 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?