Pioneer Financial Llc v. Kathy S Newell
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. CISCV148518

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Kennard +1 916 920 2295
v.
No Logo Kathy S Newell, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Pioneer Financial Llc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 3/8/2004
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 01/07/2005
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009
Writ Of Execution From Sacramento County Returned Satisfied
    Blank 16 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009
    --- Credits In The Amount Of $4,577.73.
      Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006
      Acknowledgment Of Full Satisfaction Of Judgment As To Kathy S Newell Filed By Pioneer Financial Llc
        Blank 14 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
        0002 -- Satisfied
          Blank 13 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
          Acknowledgment Of Full Satisfaction Of Judgment As To Kathy S Newell Filed By Pioneer Financial Llc
            Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005
            (l) Writ Of Execution For Money Issued For Sacramento County In The Amount Of $4,512.93
              Blank 11 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005
              Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment With Accrued Costs Of $24.00 And Accru4d Interest Of $238.10 Filed By Pioneer Financial Llc
                Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                Fee Taken For Abstract Of Judgment Issued.
                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005
                  Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 03/08/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc With Prejudice Filed.
                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005
                    Request For Default Filed And Default Entered On Complaint Filed 03/08/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc As To Kathy S Newell.
                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005
                      Judgment After Default By Court Entered As Follows
                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                        Proof Of Service (personal) Of Summons And Complaint Filed 03/08/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Served On Kathy S Newell With Service Date Of 10/09/04
                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                          Cmc Held
                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                            Reporter:csr#:9444 Denise Gallagher
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004
                              Complaint Contract
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004
                                Pay-fe S01396 135.30 Cmp M
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004
                                  Pay-fe S01397 10.00 Cmp M

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?