Pioneer Financial Llc v. Kelly S Knipe
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. CISCV148768

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ayers, Jonathan +1 916 920 2295
v.
No Logo Kelly S Knipe, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Pioneer Financial Llc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 4/9/2004
Complaint 1 Status Dismissed 11/10/2004
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004
Converted Case Reported To Jbsis: Row - Existing Case Entered Into Cms
    Blank 11 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004
    Converted Hearing Reported To Jbsis: Short Cause Trial
      Blank 10 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004
      Request To Enter Default Presented By Pioneer Financial Llc Returned - Default Not Entered - Reason Answer Of Defendant Filed On 7/20/04
        Blank 9 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
        Cmc Held
          Blank 8 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
          Reporter:csr#:9444 Denise Gallagher
            Blank 7 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
            First Appearance
              Blank 6 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
              Knipe Kelly S
                Blank 5 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                Answer
                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                  Knipe Kelly S
                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                    Pay-fe S01791 142.00 1st A
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004
                      Pay-fe S01171 145.30 Cmp M
                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004
                        Complaint Contract

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?