Sunlight Saunas, Inc V Sundance Saunas, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. CISCV149932

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sunlight Saunas, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kontz, Thornton +1 831 427 2727
v.
No Logo Sundance Saunas, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark & Rude

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Rude +1 408 971 1099 +1 408 971 1133 drude@crlaw.net
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Sunlight Saunas Inc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 9/22/2004
Complaint 1 Status Dismissed 04/28/2005
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
Request For Dismissal Of Entire Action Without Prejudice Filed
    Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
    Entire Action Dismissed
      Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005
      Fee Taken For Copies.
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
        Attorney Record Updated To Show Comstock Thompson Et Al Attorney For Sunlight Saunas, Inc Updated/corrected To Thornton Kontz
          Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004
          First Paper Court Reporter Fee Paid (defendant)
            Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004
            (u) Answer To Complaint Filed 09/22/2004 Of Sunlight Saunas, Inc Filed By Sundance Saunas, Inc, Represented By David Rude
              Blank 4 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
              First Paper Fee Paid By Plaintiff/petitioner Sunlight Saunas, Inc
                Blank 3 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                First Paper Fee Paid By Plaintiff/petitioner Sunlight Saunas, Inc
                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004
                  Case Management Conf Set On 1/20/05 At 8:29 In Dept 9
                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004
                    (u) Complaint Filed

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 25 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?