Amira Anderson v. Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01028

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 11:24 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amira Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L. Knutson +1 619 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 mlk@classactionlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Richard Restis , +1 619 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 wrr@classactionlaw.com
v.
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Chao +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 dhc@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David I Hurwitz +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 dih@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Certify Class Action
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None ERRATA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None For Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/16/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney David I Hurwitz counsel for Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Changing firm name to Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C.. Filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications of America, LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 20 Motion for Class Certification. Plaintiff shall be relieved of the Order of the Court that she file a class certification motion by January 31, 2014; and Plaintiffs motion for class certification shall be filed on or before July 11, 2014, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (nbo) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion For Class Certification filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (see document for details) (mu) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Discovery cut-off 3/27/2015. Motions due by 5/29/2015. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/28/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2015 at 3:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2015 at 9:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (mu) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David H Chao on behalf of Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Attorney David H Chao added to party Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC(pty:dft))(Chao, David) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 weeks, filed by Plaintiff Amira Anderson.. (Restis, William) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, granting Stipulation for Relief from Rule Local Rule 23-3 14 . (twdb) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Amira Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Restis, William) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF INTENT TO SCHEDULE THE CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD, notice is hereby given that on November 25, 2013 the Court will issue a Scheduling Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) establishing dates for the completion of discovery, the filing of motions, pretrial conference, and trial in the above entitled case. No scheduling conference will be held unless ordered by the Court. (see document for details) (mu) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P Rosenbluth re: Stipulation for Protective Order 9 . (See Order for details.) (wr) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, identifying Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order 9 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): Certification of Interested Parties needed for defendant. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dro) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), 1 Answer of Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC To Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amira Anderson, upon Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC served on 7/25/2013, answer due 8/15/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Restis, William) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV12-00903 CJC (JPRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block and Judge James V. Selna to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV13-01028 CJC (JPRx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (dro) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(nbo) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Amira Anderson. Related Case(s): CV12-05660 CJC (JPRx). (nbo) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amira Anderson. (nbo) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (nbo) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Amira Anderson. (nbo) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?