Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. v. John Does 1-35
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03203

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:35 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Kannady, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
a Canadian Corporation Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
v.
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 11, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 12, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #13, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 14, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 15, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 18, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 19, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 21, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 22, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 23, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #24, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #25, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 26, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 27, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 28, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 29, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 3, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 30, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 31, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 32, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 33, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 34, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 35, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 4, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 5, Defendant
No Logo John Doe#6, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 7, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 9, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/19/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (evana, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE In accordance with the Notice of Dismissal of Case filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) on May 16, 2014 ECF No. [31], it is ORDERED that the remaining John Does and this case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/16/2014. (evana, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: [29] Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., John Doe 30 and John Doe 35 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/14/2014. (evana, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: 5/13/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 30 and 35 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Status Report
            Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER re: [26] Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., it is ORDERED that Defendant John Doe # 11 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICEand shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/24/2014. (evana, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 11 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re: [23] Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. it is ORDERED that Defendant John Does # 10, 17, 23, 28 and 33 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/14/2014. (evana, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Status Report
                    Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does 10, 17, 23, 28 and 33 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/7/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER granting [20] Plaintiff's Second Request [Motion] for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants on or before 5/21/2014. No further extensions will be granted absent showing of exceptional cause. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/7/2014. (cpear)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM regarding [20] Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/4/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Letter
                              RESTRICTED Level 2 (trlee, ) Modified on 2/25/2014 (jhawk, ) to restricted document .
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [16] Plaintiff's Request [Motion] for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants by 4/21/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/2014. (mehcd)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM regarding [16] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/11/14. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Status Report
                                      Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [12] Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/5/2014. (mehcd)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM regarding [12] MOTION to Clarify re [11] Order on Motion to Expedite filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/4/14. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Status Report
                                            Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Motion to Clarify
                                              MOTION to Clarify re [11] Order on Motion to Expedite by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/9/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [3] Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/29/14.(jhawk, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/22/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM regarding [3] MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/29/14. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                                        REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (sphil, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Magistrate Judge Consent FormCourt Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. No summons issued. (sphil, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                            Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion to Expedite
                                                              MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 0939599 BC LTD., Corporate Parent Studio West Productions (VCC) Inc. for Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3632787), filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?