Richard Brown v. Susan Brown-Thill
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 13-1708

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802345995 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
28(j) citation filed by Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 01/27/2014 - FOR CAL [4117480] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802337877 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
    ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 for argument in February, at the U.S. Courthouse in Kansas City, Missouri. [4113575] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802336729 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
      ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. George Barton for Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708 for argument in February, at the U.S. Courthouse in Kansas City, Missouri. [4113048] [13-1708, 13-1795] (GB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802253740 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
        CLERK ORDER:Granting [4073188-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr.. brief of Richard L. Brown due on 10/01/2013 [4073298] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802253514 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/01/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 09/06/2013. [4073188] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802249477 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
            ADDENDUM of APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLEE FILED by Appellant Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708, Appellee/Cross Appellant Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1795, w/service 08/30/2013 [4071273] [13-1708, 13-1795] (LAB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 00802249474 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEF FILED - REPLY APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLEE filed by Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708, 13-1795, w/service 08/30/2013. Length: 13,959 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Susan Brown-Thill due 09/09/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Fourth brief of Richard L. Brown due 09/17/2013 [4071272] [13-1708, 13-1795] (LAB)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802249152 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708, 13-1795 [4071091] [13-1708, 13-1795] (SAB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802249149 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                  APPELLANT brief of Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4071090] [13-1708, 13-1795] (SAB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802222549 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [4058199-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Stacy Ann Burrows. Reply Brief of Appellant/Cross-Appellee Susan Brown-Thill due on 08/30/2013 [4058355] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802222222 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 08/30/2013 at 05:00 pm, filed by Attorney Ms. Stacy Ann Burrows for Appellant Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708 w/service 07/24/2013. [4058199] [13-1708, 13-1795] (SAB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802207325 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                        BRIEF FILED - BRIEF APPELLEE/CROSS APPELLANT filed by Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795. w/service 07/01/2013 , Length: 16,485 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Richard L. Brown due 07/08/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Third brief of Susan Brown-Thill brief due on 08/01/2013. [4051041] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802207313 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                          ADDENDUM of APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT FILED by Appellee/Cross Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 , w/service 07/01/2013 [4051032] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802206876 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                            Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 [4050772] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802206873 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                              APPELLEE brief of Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4050771] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802203806 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Mr. Joel B. Laner for Appellee Richard L. Brown and Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708,13-1795. [4049286] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802203801 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                  Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Mr. Joel B. Laner for Appellee Richard L. Brown and Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708,13-1795. [4049285] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802203796 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [4049166-2] motion file brief out of time filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr.. in 13-1708 [4049283] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802201590 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                      Addendum of APPELLEE submitted for review by Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 [4048271] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802201584 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                        APPELLEE brief of Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4048269] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802201201 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                          CLERK ORDER:[4047853-2] The motions for extension of time to file a brief, filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr., are denied as moot, as the requested date has passed and no brief has been submitted for review. [4047849-2] [4047848-2] [4048068] [13-1708, 13-1795] (SRD)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802200818 Filed: 6/22/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 06/24/2013 at 09:00 am, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 06/22/2013. [4047853] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802200806 Filed: 6/22/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for extension of time to file brief, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 06/22/2013. [4047849] [13-1708, 13-1795]--[Edited 06/26/2013 by SRD] (PJL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802200803 Filed: 6/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for extension of time to file brief, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 06/22/2013. [4047848] [13-1708, 13-1795]--[Edited 06/26/2013 by SRD] (PJL)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802179861 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708. w/service 05/20/2013 , Length: 28 pgs 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Susan Brown-Thill due 05/28/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Second brief of aplee/cr. aplnt due on 06/20/2013. [4037719] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802179837 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                    ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708 , w/service 05/20/2013 [4037706] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802179433 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708, 13-1795 [4037507] [13-1708, 13-1795] (SAB)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802179430 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                        APPELLANT brief of Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4037506] [13-1708, 13-1795] (SAB)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802163264 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                          CORPORATE disclosure statement and STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1708/1795. - FOR CAL. [4029485] [13-1708, 13-1795]--[Edited 04/26/2013 by CAH] (PJL)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802163255 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Philip J. Loree Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown w/service 04/25/2013 [4029482] [13-1708] (PJL)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802159835 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Joel B. Laner for Appellee Richard L. Brown w/service 04/22/2013 [4027802] [13-1708] (JBL)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802154545 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE disclosure statement, STATEMENT of issues and STATEMENT of separate appendices filed by Appellant Susan Brown-Thill in 13-1708. - FOR CAL. [4025279] [13-1708, 13-1795]--[Edited 04/26/2013 by CAH] (GB)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802151277 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/20/2013. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Susan Brown-Thill due 05/20/2013.. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [13-1708, 13-1795] (PSA)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802147854 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by George A. Barton Stacy A. Burrows for Appellant Susan Brown-Thill w/service 04/04/2013 [4021904] [13-1708] (GB)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802144457 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/13/2013. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Susan Brown-Thill due 05/13/2013. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4020262] [13-1708] (PSA)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802144452 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Originating court document filed consisting of order and judgment filed 3/8/13, notice of appeal, docket entries, [4020261] [13-1708] (PSA)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802144446 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Civil case docketed. [4020256] [13-1708] (PSA)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802278918 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            BRIEF FILED - REPLY APPELLEE/CR APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 w/service 10/11/2013 , Length: 6,970 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Richard L. Brown due 10/21/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4085477] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802278557 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY brief of Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4085311] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802274114 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708. [4083220] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802273968 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY brief of Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4083144] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802271153 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [4081473-2] motion for leave to file an addendum to reply brief Granting [4081760-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr.. brief of Richard L. Brown due on 10/04/2013, NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. [4081790] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802271070 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/04/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 10/02/2013. [4081760] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802270497 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION Leave to file a Reply Brief Addendum for Review on October 3, 2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 10/01/2013. [4081473] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802268158 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          CLERK ORDER:Granting [4080127-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr.. brief of Richard L. Brown due on 10/03/2013 [4080266] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802267852 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/03/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 09/27/2013. [4080127] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?