Richard Brown v. Susan Brown-Thill
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 13-1795

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802278918 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF FILED - REPLY APPELLEE/CR APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 w/service 10/11/2013 , Length: 6,970 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Richard L. Brown due 10/21/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4085477] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802278557 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
    REPLY brief of Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4085311] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802274114 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
      Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708. [4083220] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802273968 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
        REPLY brief of Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, 13-1795 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4083144] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802271153 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
          CLERK ORDER:Granting [4081473-2] motion for leave to file an addendum to reply brief Granting [4081760-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr.. brief of Richard L. Brown due on 10/04/2013, NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. [4081790] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802271070 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/04/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 10/02/2013. [4081760] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802270497 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION Leave to file a Reply Brief Addendum for Review on October 3, 2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 10/01/2013. [4081473] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802268158 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                CLERK ORDER:Granting [4080127-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr.. brief of Richard L. Brown due on 10/03/2013 [4080266] [13-1708, 13-1795] (YML)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802267852 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/03/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellee Richard L. Brown in 13-1708, Attorney Mr. Philip J. Loree, Jr. for Appellant Richard L. Brown in 13-1795 w/service 09/27/2013. [4080127] [13-1708, 13-1795] (PJL)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 27 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?