Paul M Carrick V Scotty Harris, Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. CISCV159120

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul M Carrick, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Francine Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Scotty Harris, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Lud Ll Ud Complaint Of Paul M Carrick
Complaint 1 Filing Date 1/10/2008
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 01/28/2008
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010
File Returned.
    Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009
    Request For Copies From Juliana Panick @ County Counsel Received
      Blank 20 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008
      Order For Release Of Rents Posted With Court Filed
        Blank 19 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008
        Civil Trust Disbursement To Non-depositor Paul M Carrick
          Blank 18 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
          Case Filed Fwd To Rba For Direction On Both Writs Cv159120
            Blank 17 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
            Reply To Opposition To Motion To Set Aside Filed By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens
              Blank 16 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008
              Opposition To Set Aside Motion Filed By Paul M Carrick
                Blank 15 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                Set For 2/20/08 At 8:30 In Dept Cve
                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                  (u) Motion To Set Aside Default Filed By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens.
                    Blank 13 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                    Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Filed By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens.
                      Blank 12 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                      Order On Application For Waiver Of Fees Filed By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens Granted In The Amount Of $260.00.
                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                        Order Staying Execution Of Judgment/eviction Filed By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens
                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                          Civil Trust Deposit By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens
                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                            Ex Parte Order Stay Of Execution;mtn Set Aside Default Filed By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens
                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                              Ex Parte Application/motion/osc Re Stay Execution Filed By Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens
                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008
                                Writ Of Possession Of Real Property Located At 34000 Loma Prieta Way Los Gatos Ca. 95033 In The County Of Santa Cruz
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008
                                  Request To Enter Default Filed And Default Entered On (ll) Ud Complaint Filed 01/10/2008 Of Paul Carrick As To Scotty Harris, Francine Stevens
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008
                                    Judgment After Default By Clerk For Possession Of Premises:
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                                      Proof Of Service (personal) Of Summons And (ll) Ud Complaint Filed 01/10/2008 Of Paul Carrick Served On Francine Stevens With Service Date Of 01/18/08
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                                        Proof Of Service (personal) Of Summons And (ll) Ud Complaint Filed 01/10/2008 Of Paul Carrick Served On Scotty Harris With Service Date Of 01/18/08
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008
                                          Summons Issued; 5 Day
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008
                                            (ll) Ud Complaint Filed

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 274 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?