Gary Carlton, Et Al v. Juliet Celia-marie Olmos, E
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. CISCV173576

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christine Carlton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Davis, Todd K +1 408 295 6100
No Logo Gary Carlton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Davis, Todd K +1 408 295 6100
v.
No Logo Abrite Childrens Foundation, Defendant
No Logo Abrite, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by zplawla.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Panagiotis +1 310 405 0055 +1 310 405 0056 mpanagiotis@zplawla.com
No Logo Juliet Celia-marie Olmos, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcshane, Brian +1 408 983 1675
No Logo Abrite, Llc, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by zplawla.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Panagiotis +1 310 405 0055 +1 310 405 0056 mpanagiotis@zplawla.com
No Logo Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by zplawla.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Panagiotis +1 310 405 0055 +1 310 405 0056 mpanagiotis@zplawla.com
No Logo Janice K Doney, Phd., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by zplawla.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Panagiotis +1 310 405 0055 +1 310 405 0056 mpanagiotis@zplawla.com
No Logo Cph & Associates Insurance Agency, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cope, Stephen L

Toggle Switch Represented by Barbanel and Treuer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan H Barbanel +1 310 282 8088 abarbanel@btlawla.com
No Logo Philadelphia Insurance Company, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Gary Carlton
Complaint 1 Filing Date 3/16/2012
Complaint 1 Status Dismissed With Prejudice 07/10/2013
Complaint 2 0002 Cc 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite Llc 12062012
Complaint 2 Filing Date 3/16/2012
Complaint 2 Status Dismissed With Prejudice 12/06/2013
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 116 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014
Time Est: 7 - 10 Days
    Blank 115 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013
    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd..
      Blank 114 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013
      Request For Dismissal Of 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc With Prejudice In Its Entirety Filed
        Blank 113 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013
        Request For Dismissal Of Entire Action With Prejudice Filed
          Blank 112 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013
          Civil Sad Before Trial - Entry Of Req. For Dism. - No Adr
            Blank 111 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013
            Notice Of Settlement Of Cross-claims Filed.
              Blank 110 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013
              Declaration Of Jefferson M. Shelton In Support Of Cphs Motion For Summary Judgment Filed.
                Blank 109 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013
                Separate Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                  Blank 108 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013
                  Court Reporter Fee Received For Motion For Summary Judgment
                    Blank 107 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013
                    Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment Set For 1/02/14 At 8:30 In Courtroom 5
                      Blank 106 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013
                      Motion For Summary Judgment/summary Adjudication As To 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                        Blank 105 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013
                        Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Summ Judg-cph & Assoc Atty Shelton
                          Blank 104 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013
                          Request For Dismissal On 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc As To Defendant Philadelphia Insurance Company With Prejudice Filed
                            Blank 103 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013
                            Request For Dismissal Of Complaint Filed 03/16/2012 Of Gary Carlton With Prejudice In Its Entirety Filed
                              Blank 102 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013
                              Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Gary Carlton, Christine Carlton
                                Blank 101 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013
                                Case Management Statement Filed By Abrite, Llc.
                                  Blank 100 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013
                                  Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Juliet Celia-marie Olmos
                                    Blank 99 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013
                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Juliet Celia-marie Olmos
                                      Blank 98 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013
                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency.
                                        Blank 97 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013
                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Gary Carlton, Christine Carlton
                                          Blank 96 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013
                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                            Blank 95 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013
                                            Transcript Of Proceedings Heard On 02/05/13 Filed
                                              Blank 94 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013
                                              Update The Attorney Firm Address Of Attorney Barbanel & Treuer,p.c.
                                                Blank 93 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013
                                                Fee Taken For Photocopy.
                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013
                                                  Proof Of Service By Mail Of Answer To Second-amended Cross Complaint Served On Abrite, Llc Filed. Date Of Mailing: 02/25/13.
                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013
                                                    (u) Answer To 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency, Represented By Alan H Barbanel
                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013
                                                      Notice Of Taking Off Calendar Moiton To Strike/demurrer Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013
                                                        Reply To To Opposition To Motion To Strike Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013
                                                          Reply To Opposition To Demurrer Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013
                                                            Fee Taken For First Paper Fee For J.doney &ginger Raabe.
                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013
                                                              Opposition To Cross-def Philadelphia Indemity Ins. Co Demurrer To 2nd Amended X-complaint Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013
                                                                Opposition To Cross-def. Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co. Motion To Strike Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013
                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Order Graning Xdef. Cph, Motion To Strike On Interested Parties. Method Of Service Mail. Date Of Personal Service Or Mailing 02/06/13
                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013
                                                                    Order Granting Cph & Associates Motion To Strike Portions Of The 2nd Amended Compaint Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency.
                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013
                                                                      Reply P&a In Support Of Mtn To Strike ... - Cph Filed.
                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013
                                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Juliet Celia-marie Olmos
                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013
                                                                          Amended Proof Of Service Re Opposition Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013
                                                                            Proof Of Service By Mail Of Opposition To Cc Deft Cphs Mtn To Strike Portions ... Served On Cph & Associates Insurance Agency, Philadelphia Insurance Company Filed. Date Of Mailing: 01/23/13.
                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013
                                                                              Opposition To Cd Cphs Mtn To Strike Portions Of Second Amended Cc Filed By Abrite, Llc
                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013
                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Gary Carlton, Christine Carlton
                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013
                                                                                  Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013
                                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013
                                                                                      Set For 2/26/13 At 8:30 In 5
                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013
                                                                                        Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Demurrer-aurora Bank,nationstar Etc/daska Babcock
                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
                                                                                          Set For 2/26/13 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
                                                                                            Court Reporter Fee Received For Demurrer To 2nd Amended Cross-comp
                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
                                                                                              Demurrer To 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company, Represented By Michael J O'neill
                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
                                                                                                Court Reporter Fee Received For Motion To Strike
                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013
                                                                                                  Motion To/for To Strike Portions Of 2nd Amended Cross-complaint Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013
                                                                                                    Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Strike-philadelphia Ins Co/michael Oneill
                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013
                                                                                                      Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Demurrer-philadelphia Ins Co/michael Oneill
                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012
                                                                                                        Proposed Order Received From Cph & Associates Insurance Agency.
                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012
                                                                                                          Set For 2/05/13 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012
                                                                                                            Motion To/for To Strike Portions Of Abrites 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012
                                                                                                              Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re To Strike-cope
                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012
                                                                                                                Stipulated Protective Order Filed.
                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012
                                                                                                                  Fee Taken For Stip And Order.
                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012
                                                                                                                    (l) 2nd Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc Filed (amended Complaint/petition)
                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012
                                                                                                                      Notice Of Lodging Of Proposed Ord/ Decl Of Panagiotis Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012
                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012
                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Gary Carlton, Christine Carlton
                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012
                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service By Mail Of Reply P&a Served On Abrite, Llc Filed. Date Of Mailing: 10/30/12.
                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012
                                                                                                                              Points And Authorities Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012
                                                                                                                                Reply To Opposition To Mtn To Strike Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                  Opposition To Cd Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Companys Mtn To Strike ... Filed By Abrite, Llc
                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Cd Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Companys Demurrer To First-amended Cross Complaint Filed By Abrite, Llc
                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Of Opposition To Cd Cph Mtn To Strike ... Served On Gary Carlton Filed. Date Of Mailing: 10/23/12.
                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012
                                                                                                                                        Opposition To Cross-deft Cph & Associates Ins Agencys Mtn To Strike ... Filed By Abrite, Llc
                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012
                                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Juliet Celia-marie Olmos
                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012
                                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012
                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Abrite, Llc.
                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: 10/11/2012
                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Ruling Filed
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012
                                                                                                                                                  Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Made By Brian Mcshane
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012
                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation And Order For Advance Case Management Conference Date Filed.
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Order Submitted Re Stip & Order To Advance Cmc By Abrite, Llc. Forwarded To Judge Paul M. Marigonda.
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012
                                                                                                                                                        Fee Taken For Stip And Order.
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                          Set For 11/06/12 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                            Motion To/for Strike Portions Of The First Amended Complaint Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                              Set For 11/06/12 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                Demurrer To 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company, Represented By Michael J O'neill
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Unavailability Of Counsel Filed By Matthew E Panagiotis
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012
                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service By Mail Of Notice Of Mtn To Strike Served On Abrite, Llc Filed. Date Of Mailing: 09/06/12.
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012
                                                                                                                                                                      Set For 10/16/12 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion To/for Strike Portions Of First-amended Cross Complaint Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012
                                                                                                                                                                          Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Demurrer-philadelphia Ins Co/michael Oneill
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012
                                                                                                                                                                            Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Strike-philadelphia Ins Co/michael Oneill
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: 8/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                              Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Strike-cph & Associates Inc/stephen Cope
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Posting Jury Fees Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Made By Matthew E Panagiotis
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Jury Fee Deposit Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Made By Michael J O'neill
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: 8/8/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Errata Re First Amended Cross Complaint Filed By Abrite, Llc, Janice K Doney, Phd., Ginger R Wilson-raabe, Phd.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                          (u) 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Abrite, Llc Filed (amended Complaint/petition)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Re Cross-defendant Cph Demurrer And Motion To Strike Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency In Support Of Demurrer To Abrites Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency In Support Of Motion To Strike Abrites Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Juliet Celia-marie Olmos
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Abrite, Llc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Of Opposition Cmc Served On Gary Carlton Filed. Date Of Mailing: 07/02/12.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition To Cd Cphs Mtn To Strike Cc Of Deft/cc Abrite Llc Filed By Abrite, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: 6/25/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                            (u) Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 03/16/2012 Of Abrite, Llc Filed By Philadelphia Insurance Company, Represented By Michael J O'neill
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Continuance Of Hearing Re: Demurrer ... Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Gary Carlton, Christine Carlton
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Time And Venue For Hearing Filed By Cph & Associates Insurance Agency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set For 4/19/12 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set For 4/19/12 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: 3/26/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fee Taken For Photocopies.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer In - Original Filing Date: 09/26/11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Receipt Of Transfer From Santa Clara Their Case Number 111cv209838 Date Of Receipt 03/16/12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/certificate Of Mailing Of Notice Of Receipt Of Transfer Signed By Krb Placed In File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (l) Transfer In From Santa Clara County; Original File Date 09/26/11. Original Case Number 111cv209838
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Cross-complaint Of Abrite, Llc Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conf Set On 7/16/12 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Filed 03/16/2012 Of Gary Carlton Filed; Naming Doe/roe 1 As Abrite, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (u) Complaint Filed

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?