Raley Holdings Llc v. Suzanne Leontieff Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. CISCV176438

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Raley Holdings Llc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Coll, Rebecca M +1 415 426 3502
v.
No Logo Slh Management Services Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ballesteros, Daniel +1 408 287 9501
No Logo Suzanne Leontieff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ballesteros, Daniel +1 408 287 9501
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Raley Holdings Llc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 3/8/2013
Complaint 1 Status Active
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 58 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013
Stipulation And Order For Modifying Order Of May 1, 2013 Filed.
    Blank 57 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013
    Fee Taken For Stipulation And Proposed Order.
      Blank 56 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013
      Stipulation And Proposed Order Of May 1, 2013 Received From Suzanne Leontieff, Slh Management Services Llc.
        Blank 55 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013
        Fee Taken For Writ Of Attachment.
          Blank 54 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013
          Writ Of Attachment Issued
            Blank 53 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013
            Stipulation And Order For Lift Of Stay And Admission Of Matthew Bobo Pro Hac Vice Filed.
              Blank 52 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013
              Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                Blank 51 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013
                Stipulation And Order For Continuance Of Case Management Conference Filed.
                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Court Filing
                  Order Submitted Re Stip & Order To Continue Cmc By Raley Holdings Llc. Forwarded To Judge Paul M. Marigonda.
                    Blank 49 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013
                    Fee Taken For Photocopies.
                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013
                      Application/stip For Order To Continue Received From Raley Holdings Llc.
                        Blank 47 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013
                        Fee Taken For Application/stip To Continue Mediation/cmc Hrg.
                          Blank 46 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013
                          Reserved Hearing Date For Osc/motion Re Pro Hac Vice-pl Atty M Bobo
                            Blank 45 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013
                            Set For 7/16/13 At 8:30 In 5
                              Blank 44 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013
                              Proposed Order For Admission Of Prohacvice Received From Raley Holdings Llc.
                                Blank 43 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013
                                Declaration Of Rebecca Coll In Support Of Pro Hac Vice Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                  Blank 42 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013
                                  Proof Of Service Of Application For Pro Hac Vice On Interested Parties. Method Of Service Personal. Date Of Personal Service Or Mailing 06/21/13
                                    Blank 41 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013
                                    Motion To/for Admissions Of Matthew W. Bobo As Pro Hac Vice Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                      Blank 40 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013
                                      Notice Of Application For Admission Of Matthew W. Bobo To The Bar Of This Court Pro Hac Vice Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013
                                        Writ Of Attachment From El Dorado Returned Unsatisfied Filed.
                                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013
                                          Stipulated Protective Order Filed.
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013
                                            Stipulation And Order For Stay Of Action, Writ Of Attachment And Use Of Assets Filed.
                                              Blank 36 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013
                                              (u) First Paper Fee Paid By Defendant/respondent Slh Management Services Llc
                                                Blank 35 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
                                                Proposed Preliminary Injunction Received From Raley Holdings Llc.
                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
                                                  Declaration Of Rebecca M. Coll In Support Of Preliminary Injunction Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
                                                    Proof Of Service Of Reply Brief,declaration On Interested Parties. Method Of Service Mail. Date Of Personal Service Or Mailing 04/16/13
                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
                                                      Fee Taken For Stip And Order.
                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013
                                                        Stipulation & Order Continuing Hrg Date And Continuing Expiration Date Of Tro Filed.
                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 Court Filing
                                                          Order Submitted Re Stip & Ord To Cont Hrg Tro/preliminary Injunction By Raley Holdings Llc. Forwarded To Judge Paul M. Marigonda.
                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013
                                                            Fee Taken For Stip/order To Cont Hearing Re: Preliminary Inj.
                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013
                                                              (u) First Paper Fee Paid By Defendant/respondent Suzanne Leontieff
                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013
                                                                Reply Brief In Support Of Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013
                                                                  Reply To Defendants Objections To Plaintiffs Evicence In Support Of Order To Show Cause Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013
                                                                    Declaration Of Suzanne Leontieff In Support Of Opposition ... Filed.
                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013
                                                                      Opposition To Osc Re: Preliminary Injunction Filed By Suzanne Leontieff
                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013
                                                                        Objection To Plts Evidence In Support Of Exparte Right To Attach ... Filed By Suzanne Leontieff
                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013
                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Order For Temp Injunction And Supporting Docs On Suzanne Leontieff. Method Of Service Mail. Date Of Personal Service Or Mailing 03/28/13
                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                            Fee Taken For Photocopies.
                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                              Writ Of Attachment (exparte) Issued - El Dorado Issued
                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                Writ Of Attachment (exparte) Issued - Sc Issued
                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                  Writ Of Attachment - Sc Issued 3-27-13 Returned - Unsatisfied Filed.
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                    Court Reporter Fee Received For Order To Show Cause
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                      Fee Taken For Writ.
                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                        Fee Taken For Order To Show Cause.
                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013
                                                                                          Fee Taken For Exparte Fee.
                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                            Order (ex Parte) For Temporary Protective Order And Osc Re Preliminary Injunction Filed By Raley Holdings Llc.
                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                              Set For 4/18/13 At 8:30 In Dept 5
                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                Writ Of Attachment (ex Parte) Issued
                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                  Ex Parte Order Re Right To Attach And Issuance Of Writ Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                    Bond # 510392 By Surety Suretec Insurance Company In The Amount Of $10,000.00 Posted By David J Carter & Paul D Fazzio
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                      Application For Right To Attach And Order For Writ Of Attachment Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                        Declaration William Brown In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Right To Attach And Protective Orders Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                          Declaration Of Amanda Cohen In Support Of Ex Parte Right To Attach And Temporary Protective Order Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Raley Holdings Llc In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Protective Order And Right To Attach Order
                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013
                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application/motion/osc Re Temporary Protective Order & Writ To Attach Order Filed By Raley Holdings Llc
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013
                                                                                                                Proof Of Service (personal) Of Summons And Complaint Filed 03/08/2013 Of Raley Holdings Llc Served On Slh Management Services Llc With Service Date Of 03/15/13
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: 3/8/2013
                                                                                                                  Case Management Conf Set On 7/08/13 At 8:29 In Dept 5
                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: 3/8/2013
                                                                                                                    (u) Complaint Filed

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 5,997 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?