Enron Stock United v. Lay, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00571-WYD
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Enron Stockholders United, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Lee Ringgenberg +1 303 932 7134 +1 303 792 9830
v.
No Logo Andy Fastow, Defendant
No Logo Charles A. Lemaistre, Defendant
No Logo Cliff Baxter, Defendant
No Logo Dave Delainey, Defendant
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant
No Logo Greg Whalley, Defendant
No Logo Herbert S. Winokur, Jr., Defendant
No Logo James, Derrick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Clifford Gunter, III +1 713 221 1335 +1 713 221 1212
No Logo Jeffrey K. Skilling, Defendant
No Logo Jerome J. Meyer, Defendant
No Logo John A. Urquhart, Defendant
No Logo John H. Duncan, Defendant
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant
No Logo John Sherriff, Defendant
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant
No Logo Ken L. Harrison, Defendant
No Logo Ken Rice, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Clifford Gunter, III +1 713 221 1335 +1 713 221 1212
No Logo Kevin Hannon, Defendant
No Logo Lou Pai, Defendant
No Logo Mark Frevert, Defendant
No Logo Norman P. Blake, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Defendant
No Logo Richard K. Causey, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert K. Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C. Chan, Defendant
No Logo Stan Horton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Steve Kean, Defendant
No Logo Wendy L. Gramm, Defendant
Office Denver
Filed 3/20/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $100000000
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78 Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Adams
Terminated 7/22/2002
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 02CV0317[Adams Cty Dist Ct]
Def Custody Status
Flags MDL, TERMED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Receipt
RECEIPT of Transmitted documents to the USDC for the Southern District of Texas pursuant to transfer order. Texas case H02-2903 (erv)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Certified Mail Receipt Returned
    RETURN RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL on 7/30/02 (erv)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Transmittal of Documents
      TRANSMITTAL of documents to USDC Southern District of Texas, by certified mail (erv)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Letter
        LETTER from Clerk of Court, USDC Southern District of Texas pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order [6-2] requesting file and certified copy of the docket sheet. (erv)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Order
          Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer ORDER by MDL Panel transferring case to the MDL panel 1466 In Re: Enron Corporation Securities Litigation pending before the Honorable Melinda Harmon, USDC Southern District of Texas (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/24/02 (erv)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Letter
            Copy of LETTER to USDC Southern Dist of TX advising of conditional transfer order re: MDL 1446 In Re: Enron Corp. (lam)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Letter
              Copy of LETTER from MDL Panel to U.S. District Court, Southern District of Texas advising of entry of conditional transfer order re: MDL 1446 In Re: Enron Corp. (gms)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Dfts' motion to extend time to answer [2-1] up to and incl 30 days after a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to answer, move or otherwise respond to Pla's Complaint (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/2/02 (erv)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002, Terminated: 4/1/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                  MOTION by Dfts to extend time to answer (erv)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Notice of Removal
                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Adams Cty Dist Ct Case Number: 02CV0317 (bpm)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Filing Fee Received
                      FILING FEE PAID: on 3/20/02 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 233463. (bpm)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT (bpm)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 96 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?