Apache Corporation v. Tschudy, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00977-LTB-CBS
District Judge Lewis T. Babcock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Apache Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bjork Lindley Little, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter A. Bjork +1 303 892 1400 +1 303 892 1401 pbjork@bjorklindley.com
Space Laura I. Lindley +1 303 892 1400 +1 303 892 1401 llindley@bjorklindley.com
Space Robert Charles Mathes +1 303 892 1400 +1 303 892 1401 rmathes@bjorklindley.com
v.
No Logo Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Caramanian +1 303 844 1499 +1 303 844 1350 lori.caramanian@usdoj.gov
Space William George Pharo +1 303 454 0108 +1 303 454 0404 william.pharo@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gale A. Norton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Caramanian +1 303 844 1499 +1 303 844 1350 lori.caramanian@usdoj.gov
Space William George Pharo +1 303 454 0108 +1 303 454 0404 william.pharo@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jicarilla Apache Nation, The, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NORDHAUS, HALTOM, TAYLOR, TARADASH & BLADH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Elise Grant +1 202 530 1270 +1 202 530 1920 jgrant@nordhauslaw.com
Space Donald H. Grove +1 202 530 1270 +1 202 530 1920 dgrove@nordhauslaw.com
Office Denver
Filed 5/21/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0701 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/9/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STAYDI, TERMED
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER signed 7/8/03 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion of dismissal as the matter has been settled by/between all parties [54-1] dismissing case with prejudice, each bear own fees and costs (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/15/03 (former empl)
    LREF
    Blank 54 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003, Terminated: 7/9/2003 Motion to Dismiss
    JOINT STIPULATION (MOTION) by plaintiff Apache Corporation, defendant Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, defendant Gale A. Norton, intervenor-defendant Jicarilla Apache Nat of dismissal as the matter has been settled by/between all parties pf pf (former empl)
      LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting federal dfts' motion for enlargment of time to file stipulated order of dismissal to and including 7/7/03 [51-1] ; dsm papers ddl set for 7/7/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/17/03 (former empl)
        LREF
        Blank 53 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting to 7/7/03 motion to enlarge the time to file stipulated order of dismissal [50-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/17/03 (former empl)
          LREF
          Blank 51 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
          MOTION by defendant Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, defendant Gale A. Norton for enlargment of time to file stipulated order of dismissal to and including 7/7/03 (former empl)
            LREF
            Blank 50 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/16/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION by defendant Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, defendant Gale A. Norton to enlarge the time to file stipulated order of dismissal (former empl)
              LREF
              Blank 49 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference on Apr 29'003 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1-13) Prepared By: Avery/WoodsReportingServiceInc (certified copy) (former empl)
                LREF
                Blank 48 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [12-1] order ; dsm papers ddl set for 6/16/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/19/03 (former empl)
                  LREF
                  Blank 47 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; mag conference held 5/16/03 and settlement announced; dsm papers ddl set for 6/16/03 ; entry date : 5/19/03 Court Reporter: CBS Civil Tape 2003-82 (former empl)
                    LREF
                    Blank 46 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference on Apr 18'2003 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1-8) Prepared By: Avery/WoodsReportingServiceInc (certified copy) (former empl)
                      LREF
                      Blank 45 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; mag further status conference set for 9:30 5/16/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/2/03 (former empl)
                        LREF
                        Blank 44 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; telephone status conf 4/29/03 ; further status conference set for 9:30 5/16/03 ; entry date : 4/30/03 Court Reporter: CBS CIVIL TAPE 2003-66 (former empl)
                          LREF
                          Blank 43 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                          NOTICE of Change of address of Jill E. Grant to Nordhaus Haltom Taylor Taradash & Bladh, L.L.P. by intervenor-defendant Jicarilla Apache Nat (former empl)
                            LREF
                            Blank 42 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, Foloowing a Status Conf held 4/18/03, it is hereby ORDERED that a Further Status Conf is set ; status conf set for 11:30 4/29/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/22/03 (erv)
                              LREF
                              Blank 41 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; mag conference held 4/18/03 ; further mag conference set for 11:30 4/29/03 ; entry date : 4/21/03 Court Reporter: Tape CBS CIV 2003-59 (dlb)
                                LREF
                                Blank 40 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer after settlement conference held 4/10/03 ; mag telephone status conference set for 1:00 4/18/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/14/03 (former empl)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; settlement conf held 4/11/03 and there was no settlement (former empl)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                                    ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Ann D. Navaro for Gale A. Norton and Deborah Gibbs Tschudy and substituting attorney Lori Caramanian, William G. Pharo (former empl)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; settlement conf set for 1:30 4/10/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/11/03 (former empl)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; mag status conference held 2/4/03 ; settlement conf set for 1:30 4/10/03 ; entry date : 2/11/03 Court Reporter: CBS Civil Tape 2003-21 (former empl)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to postpone (reset) settle conf set for 2/7/03 [34-1] ; mag status conference set for 3:00 2/4/03 ; settlement conf set 2/7/03 is vacated (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/31/03 (former empl)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Motion to Reset
                                            Settlement Status Report and Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Apache Corporation to postpone (reset) settle conf set for 2/7/03 (dlb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                              Confidentiality Agreement and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer : regarding [27-1] motion for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order [27-1] on 11/18/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/27/02 (dlb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for withdrawal of motion for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order [27-1] [28-1], withdrawing motion for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order [27-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/27/02 (dlb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for withdrawal of motion for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order [27-1] [28-1] (dlb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order [27-1] (former empl)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002, Terminated: 11/26/2002 Motion to Withdraw Document
                                                        Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Apache Corporation for withdrawal of motion for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order [27-1] (former empl)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002, Terminated: 11/26/2002 Motion for Protective Order
                                                          Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Apache Corporation for entry of confidentiality agreement and protective order (former empl)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; further settlement conf set for 9:00 2/7/03 Ordered: all discovery is stated pending settlement outcome (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/12/02 (former empl)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Apache Corporation by Peter A. Bjork (former empl)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting request for settlement conference in the report [23-1] ; settlement conf set for 1:00 11/6/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/18/02 (former empl)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002, Terminated: 10/15/2002 Status Report
                                                                  Settlement STATUS REPORT and Request for Court Supervised Settlement Conference by plaintiff Apache Corporation, defendant Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, defendant Gale A. Norton, intervenor-defendant Jicarilla Apache Nat (former empl)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to stay and vacate 9/9/02 scheduling conference [21-1] ; rule 16 conf is vacated ; status report ddl set for 10/4/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/5/02 (former empl)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002, Terminated: 9/4/2002 Motion to Vacate
                                                                      JOINT MOTION by pltf Apache Corporation, defts Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, Gale A. Norton, intervenor-defendant Jicarilla Apache Nat to stay and vacate 9/9/02 scheduling conference (former empl)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to conduct Rule 26(f) conference outside the time period provided for in the FedRCivP and the parties may conduct their Rule 26(f) conference on 8/23/02 at 9:00 [17-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/8/02 (former empl)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to conduct Rule 26(f) conference outside the time period provided for in the FedRCivP and to amend 7/25/02 order as follows: Rul3 23(a)(1) disclosures due 9/3/02, proposed scheduling order due 9/3/02, filing of confidential settlement statements on 9/3/02, and the the scheduling/settlement conference to go forward 9/9/02 [17-1] (former empl)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to appear at 9/9/02 scheduling conference by phone [14-1], granting motion for leave to appear by phone for the scheduling conference [13-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/6/02 (former empl)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002, Terminated: 8/7/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Apache Corporation for leave to conduct Rule 26(f) conference outside the time period provided for in the FedRCivP and to amend 7/25/02 order as follows: Rul3 23(a)(1) disclosures due 9/3/02, proposed scheduling order due 9/3/02, filing of confidential settlement statements on 9/3/02, and the the scheduling/settlement conference to go forward 9/9/02 (former empl)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to appear at 9/9/02 scheduling conference by phone [14-1] (former empl)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to appear by phone for the scheduling conference [13-1] (former empl)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION by defendant Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, defendant Gale A. Norton for leave to appear at 9/9/02 scheduling conference by phone (former empl)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by intervenor-defendant Jicarilla Apache Nat for leave to appear by phone for the scheduling conference (former empl)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Rule 16 conference set for 10:30 9/9/02 (cc: all counsel) (former empl)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER R16 stat stlmt pt pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer signed 7/23/02, filed 7/24/02, by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock (cc: to counsel) (former empl)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                            ANSWER by defendant Deborah Gibbs Tschudy, defendant Gale A. Norton to complaint [1-1] (former empl)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Answer
                                                                                              ANSWER by intervenor-defendant Jicarilla Apache Nat to complaint [1-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER signed 7/18/02 by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion for leave to intervene by Jicarilla Apache Tribe [7-1], and accepting for filing [0-0] document tendered (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/19/02 (former empl)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002, Terminated: 7/18/2002 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION by Jicarilla Apache Nat for leave to intervene or alternatively to participate amicus curiae & memorandum in support thereof. (gms)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Jicarilla Apache Nat by Jill E. Grant (gms)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                      Tendered Answer of Intervenor submitted by Jicarilla Apache Nation re: motion for leave to intervene or alternatively to participate amicus curiae [7-1] (gms)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Jicarilla Apache Nat by Donald H. Grove, Jr. (gms)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Laura Lindley (bpm)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Robert Charles Mathes (bpm)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Statement
                                                                                                              Local Rule 7.4 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by plaintiff re: complaint [1-1] (bpm)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for Review of Administrative Action and For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Summons(es) issued) (bpm)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID: on 5/21/02 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 234975. (bpm)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?