Phillip And Jean Eastman Vs.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo,
Case No. CIV000339458
|
|
|
|
Update Alerts Jump |
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline |
Summary |
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
|
|
Parties |
|
 |
Phillip Eastman, Plaintiff |
|
|
|
|
v. |
|
|
 |
Stephen Rich, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
Other Parties |
|
|
 |
Attorney at Law, Party Representative
Officially listed as "Freda D. Pechner"
|
|
|
|
|
 |
Michael B. Jones, Party Representative |
|
|
|
|
|
Attributes |
Complaint 1 |
0001 Com Complaint Of Phillip Eastman |
Complaint 1 Filing Date |
3/30/1989 |
Complaint 1 Status |
Active |
|
|
Timeline |
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 5/17/1989, Entered: 5/17/1989 |
|
|
X-comp.rune & Iris Forsberg,by Phillip & Jean Eas
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
|
|
|
3 |
Filed: 5/15/1989, Entered: 5/15/1989 |
|
|
Arabic Pasoliquia Group & Liberty Group
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
|
|
|
2 |
Filed: 5/15/1989, Entered: 5/15/1989 |
|
|
Lucas,mary Lucas,rune Forsberg,iris Forsberg,ind.
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
|
|
|
1 |
Filed: 5/15/1989, Entered: 5/15/1989 |
|
|
By Stephen Rich, Sue E.rich,michael Horowitz,norm
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
|
 |
Date: 9/6/1989, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Converted Case** You May Need To Verify Informat |
|
 |
Date: 7/18/1989, Time: 09:30:00, Status: None |
|
Court Trial (short Cause) Time Estimate 00:00 Hours |
|
 |
Date: 7/17/1989, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Hearing: Motion Re: Unknown Unknown By Phillip Eastman |
|
 |
Date: 7/5/1989, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Hearing: Motion Re: Unknown Unknown By Phillip Eastman |
|
 |
Date: 6/28/1989, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Hearing: Motion Re: Unknown Unknown By Phillip Eastman |
|
 |
Date: 6/15/1989, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Converted Hearing - Motion |
|
 |
Date: 6/15/1989, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Hearing: Motion Re: Unknown Unknown By Phillip Eastman |
|
|
|
Statistics
This case has been viewed 15 times.
|
|
|
|