Josef Scigliano, Gisella Sci
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo,
Case No. CIV000373232
|
|
|
|
Update Alerts Jump |
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline |
Summary |
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
|
|
Parties |
|
|
Attributes |
Complaint 1 |
0001 Com Complaint Of Josef Scigliano |
Complaint 1 Filing Date |
5/5/1992 |
Complaint 1 Status |
Active |
|
|
Timeline |
 |
Date: 10/13/1993, Time: 10:30:00, Status: None |
|
Case Management Conference |
|
 |
Date: 8/4/1993, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Converted Case** You May Need To Verify Informat |
|
 |
Date: 8/2/1993, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Case Management Conference |
|
 |
Date: 7/26/1993, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
Case Management Conference |
|
 |
Date: 6/1/1993, Time: 14:00:00, Status: None |
|
Case Management Conference |
|
 |
Date: 5/5/1993, Time: 15:00:00, Status: None |
|
Case Management Conference |
|
|
|
Statistics
This case has been viewed 10 times.
|
|
|
|