Sieverding v. Colorado Bar Assn
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-01950-EWN-OES
District Judge Edward W. Nottingham, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 9:56 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DAVID SIEVERDING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by employmentlawquestion.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. O'Malley +1 303 892 0830 Mike@employmentlawquestion.com
No Logo Ed Sieverding, Plaintiff
No Logo KAY SIEVERDING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Robin Harris +1 303 294 7002 +1 303 294 1192 Edward_Harris@fd.org
No Logo Tom Sieverding, Plaintiff
v.
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia J. Larson +1 312 988 6684 +1 312 988 5217 larsonp@staff.abanet.org
No Logo Anthony (I) Lettunich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Anthony B. Lettunich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Arianthe (I) Stettner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Arianthe Stettner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Art (I) Fiebing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Art Fiebing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Charles (I) Lance, Defendant
No Logo Charles Lance, Defendant
No Logo CIRSA, Defendant
No Logo Colorado Bar Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HUFF LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett N Huff +1 303 232 3622 bhuff@huffandleslie.com
No Logo Daniel (I) Foote, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Daniel Foote, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo David (I) Brougham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo David Brougham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo DAVIS, GRAHAM & STUBBS, L.L.C, Defendant
Officially listed as "Davis Graham Stubbs,LLC"
No Logo Hall Evans, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hall & Evans, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo J. (I) D. Hays, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo J. D. Hays, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo James (I) (Sandy) Horner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplan and Earnest, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Elizabeth Pound +1 303 443 8010 +1 303 440 3967 mpound@celaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo James (I) Engleken, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo James (I) Weber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo James (Sandy) Horner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplan and Earnest, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Elizabeth Pound +1 303 443 8010 +1 303 440 3967 mpound@celaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo James B. F. Oliphant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Booth Fajardo Oliphant
No Logo James Engleken, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo James Garrecht, Defendant
No Logo James Weber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Jane Bennett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ktlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall W. Klauzer +1 970 879 5003 +1 970 879 1131 randy@ktlaw.com
Space J. Richard Tremaine +1 970 879 5003 +1 970 879 1131 rich@ktlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo Kathy (I) Connell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Kathy Connell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Ken (I) Brenner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Ken Brenner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Kerry (I) St. James, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Kerry St. James, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Kevin (I) Bennett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Kevin Bennett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Klauzer & Tremaine, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo Melinda (I) Sherman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Melinda Sherman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo P. (I) Elizabeth Wittemyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo P. Elizabeth Wittemyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Paul (I) Hughes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Paul (I) R. McLimans, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Paul (I) Strong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Paul Hughes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Paul R. McLimans, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Paul Strong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Randall (I) Klauzer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplan and Earnest, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Elizabeth Pound +1 303 443 8010 +1 303 440 3967 mpound@celaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo Randall Klauzer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplan and Earnest, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Elizabeth Pound +1 303 443 8010 +1 303 440 3967 mpound@celaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo Richard (I) Tremaine, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplan and Earnest, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Elizabeth Pound +1 303 443 8010 +1 303 440 3967 mpound@celaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo Richard Tremaine, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplan and Earnest, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Elizabeth Pound +1 303 443 8010 +1 303 440 3967 mpound@celaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell, Siderius, Fleischner, Houghtaling & Craigmile, L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. McConnell +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 mmcconnell@mfhlegal.com
Space Traci L. Van Pelt +1 303 480 0400 +4589 458 458 9520 tvanpelt@mfhlegal.com
No Logo Sandy (I) Fiebing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Sandy Fiebing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper, Defendant

Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

No Logo Steamboat Springs, City of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Defendant

Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

No Logo Suzanne Schlicht, Defendant

Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

No Logo Wendie (I) Schulenburg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
No Logo Wendie Schulenburg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall & Evans, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Brougham +1 303 628 3300 +1 303 293 3238 broughamd@hallevans.com
Office Denver
Filed 10/11/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 3/19/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '05-1301'[], '06-1038'[], '06-1072'[], '06-1439'['USCA'], '06-1465'['USCA'], '06-1466'['USCA'], '08-1297'['USCA'], 04-1108[], 04-1143[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, TERMED
  Entries (1107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USCA ORDER re: 1136 Letter re petition for writ of mandamus. We will not accept any further filings, including appeal and original proceedings from Kay or David Sieverding related to district court case 02-cv-1950 unless the filings rise out of criminal contempt proceedings. The Sieverdings have 10 days to fil written objections to these proposed sanctions. The petition for writ of mandamus is dismissed as frivolous. USCA case no. 11-1257. (bjrsl, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER. Despite this Court's Orders of 09/28/2009 1119 and 10/09/2009 1130 , Plaintiffs continue to file frivolous motions and filings in this case. This case has been closed for years and this court lacks jurisdiction over this matter. The C lerk of the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado shall not accept any further filings in Case No. 02-cv-01950, encaptioned Sieverding, et al. v. Colorado Bar Association, et al. Upon future receipt of any pleading, motion, or other docum ent presented by anyone for filing in Case No. 02-cv-01950, encaptioned Sieverding, et al. v. Colorado Bar Association, et al., the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado shall reject such filing and immediately return the pleading, motion, or other document to the person attempting to file any such pleading, motion, or other document. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/20/2009. (sah, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute ORDER striking 1123 Motion for Judicial Notice. Order striking 1124 Motion for Judicial Notice. Order striking 1125 Motion for to Alter Amend Judgment. The Court will once again warn Plaintiffs that future frivolous filings and failures to adhere to the Rules and Orders of this Court may result in more sanctions up to and including being held in contempt of court and restrictions on Mr. Sieverdings ability to file papers with this Court by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/09/09.(jjh, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER striking 1118 Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Take Judicial Notice. Upon future receipt of any, pleading, motion or any other filing presented by Ms. Sieverding, pro se, the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado is inst ructed to immediately return the document to Ms. Sieverding. This includes any such documents containing Ms. Sieverdings signature, whether submitted by Ms. Sieverding, herself, or by Plaintiff David Sieverding. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/28/2009.(sah, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER denying 1099 Motion for Order; denying 1110 Motion for Order; denying 1112 Motion for Order; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with earlier orders in this case, Defendants shall be relieved of their obligation to confer with Plaintif fs or respond to any dispositive motion filed by Plaintiffs; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with earlier orders in this case, any motion filed by Plaintiffs shall be considered opposed by Defendants. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/11/09.(erv, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/04/2009. (sah, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 1089 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 USCA Appeal Fees
              USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. 08-1297); received appeal payment of $455, receipt number 12573 re [1076] Notice of Appeal filed by David Sieverding, Kay Sieverding (bjr, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 1088 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER denying [1087] Motion for the defense or the court to admit that there are no Rule 11c.6 orders. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/2/2008.(sss, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1087 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008, Terminated: 9/2/2008 Motion for Order
                  MOTION for the defense or the Court to admit that there are no Rule 11 c. 6 orders justifying attorney fee shifting by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1086 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying [1081] Motion to Compel; denying [1082] Motion to Compel; denying [1083] Motion to Compel; denying [1084] Motion to Compel; denying [1085] Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 8/29/2008.(sss, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1085 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                      MOTION to Compel production of any rule 11 c. 6 order to benefit White & Steele by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1084 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                        MOTION to Compel production of any rule 11 c. 6 order to benefit Feldman, Nagel & Oliphant by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1083 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                          MOTION to Compel production of any rule 11 c. 6 order to benefit Faegre & Benson or the Steamboat Pilot by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1082 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                            MOTION to Compel production of any rule 11 c. 6 order to benefit McConnel Siderious by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1081 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008, Terminated: 8/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                              MOTION to Compel production of any rule 11 c.6 order to benefit Lettunich & Vanderbloemen by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1080 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 USCA Case Number
                                USCA Case Number 08-1297 for [1076] Notice of Appeal filed by David Sieverding, Kay Sieverding. Appellants have 30 days to either pay the filing fees or file a proper 1915 motion with the district court. (bjr2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1079 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying Sieverding's [1075] Letter (Motion to Clarify). Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 8/22/08.(ecm, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1078 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER to Cure Deficiency re: [1076] Notice of Appeal filed by David Sieverding, Kay Sieverding. Appellants have 30 days to either pay the filing fees or file a proper 1915 motion with the district court. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 08/22/08. (bjr2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1077 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Letter Transmitting Notice of Appeal
                                      LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [1076] Notice of Appeal filed by David Sieverding, Kay Sieverding to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro se; Fees not paid; 1915 motion not filed) (Attachments: # (1) Docket Sheet, # (2) Preliminary Record including Notice of Appeal)(bjr2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1076 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Notice of Appeal
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [1074] Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Expedite by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. Fee Status: Fees not paid; 1915 motion not filed. Notice mailed to all counsel on 08/21/08. (bjr2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1075 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 8/22/2008 Motion to Clarify
                                          LETTER (Motion to Clarify) for Identification of Statutory Authorities for Sanctions and Evidence Supporting Sanctions by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (ecm, ) Modified on 8/20/2008 to convert to motion (ecm, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1074 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying on the merits [1069] Motion and [1072] Motion; denying as moot [1070] Motion, [1071] Motion and [1073] Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 7/21/2008.(sss, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1073 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion to Expedite
                                              Request (MOTION) to expedite his [1069] 6/20/08 motion to void attorney fee award by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1072 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion for Order
                                                Second Corrected MOTION to know the nature and basis for charges against his wife by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1071 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion for Order
                                                  Corrected MOTION to know the nature and basis of the charges against his wife by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1070 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion for Order
                                                    MOTION to know the nature and basis of the charges against his wife by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1069 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion for Order
                                                      Urgent MOTION under Rule 60b(4) to void award of attorney bills by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1068 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE of related filings in other courts by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1067 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying [1065] Motion to establish for the record that there are no 11-6 orders identifying the basis for attorney fee shifting sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/14/08.(sss, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1066 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of Supreme Court Motion Under Public Law 97-291(2) by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding, Ed Sieverding, Tom Sieverding (sss, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1065 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008, Terminated: 3/14/2008 Motion for Order
                                                              MOTION to establish for the record that there are no 11-6 orders identifying the basis for attorney fee shifting sanctions by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1064 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER denying David Sieverding's [1063] question to the court, stated as a motion. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/12/08.(sss, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1063 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008, Terminated: 3/12/2008 Motion for Order
                                                                  MOTION for Identification of Any Rule 11-6 Orders by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1062 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER denying [1061] David Sieverding's Motion for Evidence of Bond or Assertion of Exemption. Entered by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/12/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1061 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008, Terminated: 2/12/2008 Motion for Order
                                                                      MOTION for Evidence of Bond or Assertion of Exemption Under Colorado Revised Statute 10-3-1004. Defense of Action by Unauthorized Insurer by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1060 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [1059] Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel. Attorney Richard B. Caschette terminated, by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 1/28/08.(sss, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1059 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008, Terminated: 1/28/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Caschette, Richard)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1058 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE of Forms from Supreme Court for Defendants by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (sss, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1057 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              NOTICE of 07-844 Supreme Court Docket 1/9/08 by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding (sss, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1056 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying Kay Sieverding's [1054] Motion for Clarification of Oral Bench Ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 1/3/08.(sss, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1055 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                  NOTICE of revised re-filed Supreme Court Petition by Plaintiff David Sieverding (Attachments: # (1) Continuation of Filing)(sss, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1054 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                    Rule 59 Request (MOTION) for Reconsideration of and Clarification re [1052] Minute Entry by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 12/14/07 before Judge Nottingham. Pages: 1-15. Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (Lindblom, Therese)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1052 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2007 before Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham. ORDERED: [1034] Motion for Order is DENIED; [1038] Motion to Supplement is DENIED; [1049] Motion for Order is DENIED. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom) (ewncd)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1051 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard B. Caschette on behalf of Suzanne Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper (Caschette, Richard)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1050 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER denying [1044] Motion for Leave to be Excused From Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Under U.S. Judicial Cannon IIIB(3). Entered by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/11/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1049 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Motion for Order
                                                                                              Amended Canon IIIb(3) MOTION by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1048 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                Notice of ERRATA re [1042] Reply to Response to Motion under U.S. Judicial Canon IIIB(3) by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1047 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                  Docket Annotation re: [1044] MOTION for Leave to Be Excused from Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Under U.S. Judicial Cannon IIIB(3). Docket entry modified to add filer. Text only entry - no document attached (sss, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1046 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Proposed Substitute Order for [1044] MOTION for Leave to Be Excused from Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Under U.S. Judicial Cannon IIIB(3) by Plaintiff David Sieverding (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(sss, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1045 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [1044] MOTION for Leave to Be Excused from Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Under U.S. Judicial Cannon IIIB(3) filed by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1044 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Be Excused from Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Under U.S. Judicial Cannon IIIB(3) by Defendants Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper and Suzanne Schlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion for Leave to Be Excused from Hearing)(Beall, Christopher) Modified on 11/27/2007 to add filer(sss, ).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1043 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                          Exhibits 1 to 6 in Support of [1042] Reply to Response to Motion under Judicial Canon IIIB(3) by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1 to 7, # (2) Exhibits 8 to 12)(sss, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1042 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [1034] MOTION under U.S. Judicial Canon IIIB(3) filed by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1041 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Statement
                                                                                                              STATEMENT of proposed order by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1039 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [1034] MOTION for Order to filed by Defendants David (I) Brougham, David Brougham, David (I) "Dave" Brougham, David "Dave" Brougham. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Brougham, David)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1040 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Warrant Returned
                                                                                                                  WARRANT Returned Executed as to Kay Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1038 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Supplement and Clarify [1034] MOTION under U.S. Judicial Canon IIIB(3) by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1037 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: A Motion Hearing is set for 12/14/2007 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [1034] MOTION Under U.S. Judicial Canon IIIB(3) filed by David Sieverding. Entered by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/13/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1035 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' [1029] Letter requesting refund of appeal docketing fee. The Clerk of Court is to refund one appellate docketing fee of $455.00, by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/30/07. (sss, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1036 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          NOTICE re. Supreme Court booklet by Plaintiff David Sieverding (sss, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1034 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007, Terminated: 12/14/2007 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                            MOTION under U.S. Judicial Canon IIIB(3) by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1033 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Certificate of Mailing/Service
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service of Supreme Court Booklets by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (sss, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1032 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                LETTER requesting corrected file date re: [1031] Notice by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Certificate of Service, # (2) Notice of Certified Mail Receipt)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1031 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Certificate of Service of Petition for mandamus and prohibition related to sua sponte award of $101,864.82, by Plaintiff David Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1030 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Certification of Judgment
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION of Judgment for Registration in Another District re: Judgment entered 11/14/06 (an appeal was taken from this judgment and the judgment was affirmed by mandate of the court of appeals issued on 7/24/07) (pap, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1029 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007, Terminated: 10/30/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                      LETTER requesting refund for appeals 06-4165 and 06-4166 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1028 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA as to [939] Notice of Appeal, filed by Tom Sieverding, David Sieverding, Ed Sieverding, [932] Notice of Appeal, filed by Kay Sieverding: In cases 06-1465 and 06-1466 we grant the motion to consolidate for the sole purpose of paying a single filing fee. We Dismiss the appeal in 06-1465 as moot. We Dismiss the appeal in 06-1466 for lack of standing. In 06-1524 we Dismiss the appeal as moot. We Deny all other outstanding motions. (USCA case nos. 06-1465 & 06-1466. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1027 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA as to [915] Notice of Appeal filed by David Sieverding, Kay Sieverding:The judgment of the district court is affirmed awarding fees in the amount of $101,864.82 in favor of defendants and against the Sieverdings. We Deny all outstanding motions. (USCA case no. 06-1439) (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1026 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                            Docket Annotation re: [1025] Order. The NEF for this document to Michael O'Malley was returned as undeliverable. Mr. O'Malley cannot be reached at the phone number on his bar record (disconnected, no longer in service) and a new phone number cannot be located for him on the Colorado Supreme Court web site. Pursuant to the instruction of chambers, Mr. O'Malley's notice has been terminated in this case. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1025 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: [1023] Courtroom Minutes re: Order Granting in part [1005] Motion to Restrict and Reject Future Filings by Kay Sieverding. Any future pleadings, motion or any other filings submitted by Ms. Sieverding will be immediately returned. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 6/19/07. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 6/1/07 before Judge Nottingham. Pages: 1-21. Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (Lindblom, Therese)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1023 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007, Terminated: 6/20/2007 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward W. Nottingham : Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2007. United States Marshal shall release Ms. Sieverding from custody pending further proceedings.Granting [968] Motion for Reconsideration of Civil Contempt Proceedings ; Denying as Moot [980] Motion to Stay Contempt of Court Proceedings; Denying [995] Motion for Judicial Notice; Granting in part [1005] Motion to Restrict and Reject Future Filings by Kay Sieverding; Denying as moot [1010] Motion to Close Pleadings Based on Rule 60(b)(3) and Rule 54 ; Denying as Moot [1016] Motion that Kay Sieverding be Released to Fly to Denver for May 18 Meeting; Denying as moot [1021] Motion in Protest of Kay Sieverding Jailing; (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1022 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Return Executed as to [910] Warrant for Arrest of Plaintiff Kay Sieverding, Date Received 5/31/07, Date of Arrest 5/31/07. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1021 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                      DEMAND (MOTION in Protest) for Order for Immediate Release of Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1020 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE from USDC West District of Wisconsin with proceeding docket re [910] Warrant Issued by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1019 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER denying [1018] Motion to Re-Set June 1, 2007 Hearing. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 5/18/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1018 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007, Terminated: 5/18/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue June 1, 2007 Hearing by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Harris, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1017 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                              USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. 06-1465); received $ 455 receipt number 1426 re [932] Notice of Appeal, filed by Kay Sieverding (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1016 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION that Kay Sieverding be Released to Fly to Denver for May 18 Meeting by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1015 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER to correct docket number 1014. The motion hearing scheduled for 5/18/2007 (not 5/25/2007) is vacated and reset to 6/1/2007 at 9:45 AM. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 5/16/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1014 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: The motion hearing set for 5/25/2007 is VACATED and RESET to 6/1/2007 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 5/16/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1013 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation by Christopher P. Beall (Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1012 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [1011] Motion to Excuse Counsel from Appearance at May 18, 2007 Hearing. Mr. Harris is excused. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 5/8/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1011 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/8/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Excuse Counsel by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Harris, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1010 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Close Pleadings Based on Rule 60(b)(3) and Rule 54 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1009 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Order on Motion to ResetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [1008] Motion to Reset. The Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2007 is VACATED and RESET to 5/18/2007 at 9:00 AM before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 4/20/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1008 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 4/20/2007 Motion to Reset
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Reset Hearing Set for May 11, 2007 by Defendants P. Elizabeth Wittemyer, Kevin (I) Bennett, Kevin Bennett, David (I) Brougham, David Brougham, Kathy (I) Connell, Kathy Connell, Hall & Evans, L.L.C., Paul (I) Hughes, Paul Hughes, Ken (I) Brenner, Ken Brenner, James (I) Engleken, James Engleken, Art (I) Fiebing, Art Fiebing, Sandy (I) Fiebing, Sandy Fiebing, Daniel (I) Foote, Daniel Foote, J. (I) D. Hays, J. D. Hays, Anthony (I) Lettunich, Anthony B. Lettunich, Paul (I) R. McLimans, Paul R. McLimans, Steamboat Springs, City of, Wendie (I) Schulenburg, Wendie Schulenburg, Melinda (I) Sherman, Melinda Sherman, Kerry (I) St. James, Kerry St. James, Arianthe (I) Stettner, Arianthe Stettner, Paul (I) Strong, Paul Strong, James (I) Weber, James Weber, P. (I) Elizabeth Wittemyer. (Brougham, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1007 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: A Motion Hearing is set for 5/11/2007 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [1005] MOTION for Order to Restrict and Reject Future Filings By Kay Sieverding. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 4/18/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1006 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Publication of Filing for Writ of Mandamus in the D.C. Court of Appeals by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (Attachments: # (1) Petitioners for Mandamus# (2) Exhibits A part one# (3) Exhibits A part two# (4) Exhibits B, C, Appendix A)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order to Restrict and Reject Future Filings By Kay Sieverding filed by Defendants P. Elizabeth Wittemyer, Kevin (I) Bennett, Kevin Bennett, David (I) Brougham, David Brougham, Kathy (I) Connell, Kathy Connell, Hall & Evans, L.L.C., Paul (I) Hughes, Paul Hughes, Ken (I) Brenner, Ken Brenner, James (I) Engleken, James Engleken, Art (I) Fiebing, Art Fiebing, Sandy (I) Fiebing, Sandy Fiebing, Daniel (I) Foote, Daniel Foote, J. (I) D. Hays, J. D. Hays, Anthony (I) Lettunich, Anthony B. Lettunich, Paul (I) R. McLimans, Paul R. McLimans, Steamboat Springs, City of, Wendie (I) Schulenburg, Wendie Schulenburg, Melinda (I) Sherman, Melinda Sherman, Kerry (I) St. James, Kerry St. James, Arianthe (I) Stettner, Arianthe Stettner, Paul (I) Strong, Paul Strong, James (I) Weber, James Weber, P. (I) Elizabeth Wittemyer. (Brougham, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1004 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service by Publication by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1003 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER/STATEMENT by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1002 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: Ongoing defamation by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1001 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE that the Colorado Dept of Regulatory Agencies does not show Records for Lloyds of London, Beazley, Mutual Insurance based in Hamilton Bermuda, or TIG Insurance by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. Actually titled Motion for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: # (1) Duplicate Notice)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1000 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 999 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER requesting correction of jury demand on docket by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 998 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to defense ex parte conference with Magistrate Schlatter by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 997 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to threats against Mrs. Sieverding posted on Internet by 02-1950 Defendants by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 996 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service on D.C. Court and D.C. Defense Counsel by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 995 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 993 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal, [915] Notice of Appeal, Volumes I - V (USCA case no's. 06-1439; 06-1465; 06-1466) (bjr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 994 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA LETTER as to [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal, [915] Notice of Appeal by Kay Sieverding: District court is to transmit the record on appeals (records sent to USCA on 02/16/07) (USCA case nos. 06-1439; 06-1465; 06-1466 and 06-1524) (bjr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 992 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding, Ed Sieverding, Tom Sieverding for Judicial Notice of their filing in 06-1465/6. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 991 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA affirming the judgment as to [782] Notice of Appeal, filed by Kay Sieverding (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 990 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to USDC(STATEMENT) by Kay Sieverding as to notice of removal of 10th Circuit appeals to the Federal Circuit as to [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal, [782] Notice of Appeal, by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding, Ed Sieverding, Tom Sieverding. (USCA case nos. 06-1465; 06-1466; 06-1038; and 06-1524 which is the appeal number for case 06-cv-02245) (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 989 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER re [984] Response to Motion,,,, to Reconsider Civil Contempt Proceedings by Defendants Klauzer & Tremaine, Randall (I) Klauzer, Jane Bennett, James (Sandy) Horner, Richard Tremaine. (Van Pelt, Traci)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 988 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER re [984] Response to Motion,,,, by Defendant Colorado Bar Association. (Huff, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 987 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [968] MOTION for Reconsideration of Civil Contempt Proceedings In Light of November 14, 2006 10th Circuit Orders filed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 986 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT to emphasize that she is entirely self-respresented and Ed Harris is not her lawyer by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 985 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER re [984] Response to Motion,,,, by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 984 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [968] MOTION for Reconsideration of Civil Contempt Proceedings In Light of November 14, 2006 10th Circuit Orders filed by Defendants P. Elizabeth Wittemyer, Kevin (I) Bennett, Kevin Bennett, David (I) Brougham, David Brougham, Kathy (I) Connell, Kathy Connell, Hall & Evans, L.L.C., Paul (I) Hughes, Paul Hughes, Ken (I) Brenner, Ken Brenner, James (I) Engleken, James Engleken, Art (I) Fiebing, Art Fiebing, Sandy (I) Fiebing, Sandy Fiebing, Daniel (I) Foote, Daniel Foote, J. (I) D. Hays, J. D. Hays, Anthony (I) Lettunich, Anthony B. Lettunich, Paul (I) R. McLimans, Paul R. McLimans, Steamboat Springs, City of, Wendie (I) Schulenburg, Wendie Schulenburg, Melinda (I) Sherman, Melinda Sherman, Kerry (I) St. James, Kerry St. James, Arianthe (I) Stettner, Arianthe Stettner, Paul (I) Strong, Paul Strong, James (I) Weber, James Weber, P. (I) Elizabeth Wittemyer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Re Appellees' Joint Petition for Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc)(Brougham, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 983 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Notice of Appeal in 06-cv-02245-ZLW by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 982 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion to Withdraw Motion for Reconsideration of Judgment in 06-cv-02245-ZLW by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 981 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Irreparable Damage by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 980 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Contempt of Court Proceedings per attached opening brief by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Appellants', the Sieverdings' Opening Brief)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 979 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [977] Kay Sieverding's MOTION for Judicial Notice re Michael J. Burns. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/27/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 978 Filed: 11/24/2006, Entered: 11/24/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion for Reconsideration in 06-cv-2245-ZLW by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 977 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006, Terminated: 11/27/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judicial Notice re Michael J. Burns by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 976 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Compliance Hearing held on 02/14/06 before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Prepared by: Therese Lindblom. Pages: 1-15. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 975 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Compliance Hearing held on 02/02/06 before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Prepared by: Therese Lindblom. Pages: 1-14. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 974 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion that Magistrate Boland either promptly award the writ of habeas corpus or issue an "Order to Show Cause", (06-cv-02245-BNB) by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 973 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT that Edward Harris does not represent Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (erv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 972 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [970] Motion for judicial notice. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/17/06.(rlp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 971 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT regarding motion entered by Edward Harris, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (rlp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 970 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006, Terminated: 11/17/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judicial Notice re Michael J. Burns by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (lam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 969 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER Defendants to respond to [968] MOTION for Reconsideration of Civil Contempt Proceedings In Light of November 14, 2006 10th Circuit Orders filed by Kay Sieverding within 15 days, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/15/06. (gmssl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 968 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration of Civil Contempt Proceedings In Light of November 14, 2006 10th Circuit Orders by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Harris, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 967 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying Ms. Sieverding's [931] Motion to Stay certain orders pending appeal. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/14/06.(gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 966 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Judgment on Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Final Judgment Concerning Attorney Fees, approved by Judge Nottingham. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs Kay and David Sieverding in the total amount of $101,864.82, allocated as follows: Hall & Evans $21,547.61; Lettunich & Vanderblemen $11,196.00; McConnell Siderius $35,857.00; Feldman, Nagel & Oliphant $8,900.00; Faegre & Benson $12,368.00; White & Steele $11,996.21. Postjudgment interest shall accrue at the legal rate of 4.90% from date of entry of this Final Judgment Concerning Attorney Fees. Signed on 11/14/06. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 965 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER re [964] Response to Motion /Plaintiffs' Petition for Stay of contempt of Court Proceedings Pending appel, etc by Defendants Klauzer & Tremaine, Randall Klauzer, Jane Bennett, James (Sandy) Horner, Richard Tremaine. (Van Pelt, Traci)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 964 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [931] MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix of Unpublished Authority)(Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 963 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [961] Motion for judicia notice, etc. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/13/06.(gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 962 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 961 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006, Terminated: 11/13/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judicial Notice that Petitioner Filed the Attached as an Independent Petition by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Appearance)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 960 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Granting [959] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ronald August Podboy terminated.Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/3/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 959 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006, Terminated: 11/3/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Document)(Podboy, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 958 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006, Terminated: 11/3/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Podboy, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 957 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Denying [953] Kay Sieverding's Motion for Judicial Notice; Denying [954] Kay Sieverding's Motion for Judicial Notice; Denying [955] Kay Sieverding's Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/1/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 956 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Case Number 06-1466 for [939] Notice of Appeal, filed by Tom Sieverding, David Sieverding, Ed Sieverding. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 955 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judicial Notice that Judge Nottingham's Order Dismissing this Case with Prejudice was entered on 3/22/04 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 954 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judicial Notice that Warrant Issued by Judge Nottingham is not listed on the NCIC list and Not a Valid Warrant by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 953 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006, Terminated: 11/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judicial Notice of Title 18 Part III Chapter 301 4001 Limitation on Detention by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 952 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT as to [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal, filed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding : Transcript of the 09/22/06 contempt of court hearing ordered. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 951 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER as to: [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal, filed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding re appeal fees. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 950 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental STATEMENT as to [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding re appeal fees. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 949 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER as to: [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal, from Plaintiff Kay Sieverding re appeal fees. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 948 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Case Number 06-1465 for [932] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. Within 30 days, appellant to pay the $455.00 filing fee or apply to the district court for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 947 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying [945] MOTION for Judicial Notice that Kay Sieverding faxed the attached to the US Marshals in Wisconsin ; Denying [946] MOTION for Judicial Notice that Kay Sieverding filed the attached with the 10th Circuit Court of Appeals. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/26/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 946 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006, Terminated: 10/26/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judicial Notice that Kay Sieverding filed the attached with the 10th Circuit Court of Appeals by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 945 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006, Terminated: 10/26/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judicial Notice that Kay Sieverding faxed the attached to the US Marshals in Wisconsin by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 944 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Denying [936] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION for Judicial Notice that Mrs. Sieverding is not a 'fugitve" as defined by U.S.C. Title 18 section 3146. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/25/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 943 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER Defendants shall respond in accordance with the schedule established by the local rules re: [931] MOTION to Stay of Contempt Proceedings Pending Appeal of Order to "terminate all litigation against these defendants" filed by Kay Sieverding. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/25/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 942 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of ERRATA re [939] Notice of Appeal, [932] Notice of Appeal, these appeals are intended to be a joint appeal, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 941 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [939] Notice of Appeal filed by David, Tom and Ed Sieverding to the U.S. Court of Appeals.(Pro se, fees paid) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Appeal# (2) Docket Sheet# (3) Receipt)(bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 940 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Annotation re: [937] USCA Appeal Fees. The appeal fee was incorrectly attached to [932] Notice of Appeal by Kay Sieverding. The fees were paid for [939] Notice of Appeal filed by David, Tom and Ed Sieverding on the same day. Appeal fees for [932] remain unpaid. Text only entry - no document attached. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 938 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of ERRATA re: Sieverding's certificate of service filed 10/23/06 of objection to proposed motion to dismiss appeal of sua sponte award of attorney bills 06-1439 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 936 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006, Terminated: 10/25/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judicial Notice that Mrs. Sieverding is not a 'fugitve" as defined by U.S.C. Title 18 section 3146 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 935 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER to Cure Deficiency re: [932] Notice of Appeal, filed by Kay Sieverding. Plaintiff has 30 days to pay the fee or file a proper 1915 motion. (Fees paid on 10/23/06). Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/24/06. (bjr2, ) Modified on 10/24/2006: Fees were not paid on this appeal, filing fee attached to [939] Notice of Appeal filed by David, Tom and Ed Sieverding.(bjr2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 939 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [926] Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Order, by Plaintiffs David Sieverding, Ed Sieverding, Tom Sieverding. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 271863. Notice mailed to all counsel on 10/24/06. (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 937 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. Unknown); received $ 455 receipt number 271863 re [932] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. (bjr2, ) Modified on 10/24/2006: This receipt should be linked with [939]Notice of Appeal filed by David, Tom and Ed Sieverding which was filed on 10/23/06 also.(bjr2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 934 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibits A and B by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 933 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [932] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro se, Fees not paid, 1915 motion not filed) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Appeal# (2) Docket Sheet)(bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 932 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 8/8/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [926] Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Order, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. Fee Status: Fees not paid, 1915 Motion not filed. Notice mailed to all counsel on 10/23/06. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 931 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay of Contempt Proceedings Pending Appeal of Order to "terminate all litigation against these defendants" by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 930 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re: adjudication of "sanity" by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 929 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Psychological Exam showing "no evidence of thought disorder or psychosis" by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 928 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting [925] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for recognition of supreme court cases. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/17/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 927 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Denying [924] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to admit facts. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/17/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 926 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying [914] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Reconsideration ; denying [917] Motion to Dismiss Civil Contempt Proceedings Because of Her Inability to Comply Due to Mental Illness, or in the Alternative to Impose a Non-Jail Sanction; Denying [919] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Strike [917] Motion to Dismiss Contempt Proceedings ; Denying [920] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order; Denying [921] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/17/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 925 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judicial Recognition of Additional Supreme Court Cases by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 924 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Admit Facts by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 923 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Case Number 06-1439 for [915] Notice of Appeal filed by David Sieverding, Kay Sieverding. Within 30 days, appellants to pay the $455.00 filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees to the district court. (Appeal fees paid on 10/13/06) (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 922 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. Unknown); received $ 455 receipt number 271646 re [915] Notice of Appeal, filed by David Sieverding, Kay Sieverding (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 921 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Not To Allow Further Appearances in this Action by Faegre and Benson/Thomas Kelley/Christopher Beall by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 920 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Terminate Representation by Public Defender Edward Harris by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 919 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Motion Filed by Edward Harris ([917] MOTION to Dismiss Civil Contempt Proceedings Because of Her Inability to Comply Due to Mental Illness, or in the Alternative to Impose a Non-Jail Sanction) by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 918 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment (STATEMENT) to Public Defender's [917] MOTION to Dismiss Civil Contempt Proceedings Because of Her Inability to Comply Due to Mental Illness, or in the Alternative to Impose a Non-Jail Sanction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 917 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Civil Contempt Proceedings Because of Her Inability to Comply Due to Mental Illness, or in the Alternative to Impose a Non-Jail Sanction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Harris, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 916 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [915] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay and David Sieverding to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro se, Fees not paid, 1915 motion not filed) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Appeal# (2) Docket Sheet)(bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 915 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [911] Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. Fee Status: Fees not paid, 1915 Motion not filed. Notice mailed to all counsel on 10/11/06. (bjr2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 914 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration of order to terminate all litigation against these defendants by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 913 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute ORDER denying [912] Motion for defense notice, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/10/06.(gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 912 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006, Terminated: 10/10/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Defense Notice by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - Motion)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 911 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Accepting in part and Rejecting in part [487] Magistrate Judge's Ruling/Recommendation concerning fees. Denying without prejudice [755] Motion for Supplemental Attorney Fees; Clerk shall forthwith enter a Final Judgment Concerning Attorney Fees in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs Kay and David Sieverding in the total amount of $101,864.82, allocated as follows: Hall & Evans $21,547.61; Lettunich & Vanderblemen $11,196.00; McConnell Siderius $35,857.00; Feldman, Nagel & Oliphant $8,900.00; Faegre & Benson $12,368.00; White & Steele $11,996.21. Denying as Frivolous [893] Motion for judicial notice; Denying as Frivolous [896] Motion for judicial notice that the Supreme Court of Cooke v United States; Denying as Frivolous [897] Motion to Stay Contempt of Court Proceedings; Denying as Frivolous [899] Motion for Extension of Time re: Hearing Scheduled for 9/22/06; Denying as Frivolous [900] Motion for Judicial notice dept of justice report on another fictious insurance company also selling malpractive insurance; Denying as Frivolous [902] Motion for judicial notice that Christopher Beall does not deny that he is employed by a RICO-Mutual Insurance of Bermuda; Denying as Frivolous [904] Motion for judicial notice that Faegre and Benson billed Mutual Insurance/Jerome Schaefer on 10/29/04 for conference; Denying as Frivolous [905] Motion for Discovery as to why Beall had an ex parter telephone conference with the 10th circuit clerk's office re: Status of Case. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/27/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 910 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WARRANT of Arrest issued for Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 909 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Show Cause HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward W. Nottingham : Show Cause Hearing held on 9/22/2006. Plaintiff Kay Sieverding failed to appear. Ordered: Arrest warrant shall be issued for Kay Sieverding. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 908 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER Denying [907] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/21/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 907 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006, Terminated: 9/21/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Harris, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 906 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward Robin Harris on behalf of Kay Sieverding (Harris, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 905 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery as to Why Beall had an ex parter telephone conference with the 10th Circuit Clerk's Office re: Status of Case by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 904 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judicial Notice that Faegre and Benson Billed Mutual Insurance/Jerome Schaefer on 10/29/04 for conference by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 903 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Order on Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER APPOIINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Granting [895] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Appoint Federal Public Defender as Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/21/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 902 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judicial Notice that Christopher Beall does not deny that he is employed by a RICO - Mutual Insurance of Bermuda by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 901 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for financial information on Mutual Insurance of Bermuda. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 900 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judicial Notice Dept of Justice Report on another fictitious insurance company also selling malpratice insurance by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 899 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION For 30 Day Extension of Time/Delay of Hearing Scheduled 9/22/06 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 898 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Statement to Defendants re: Delayed filings in the USDC-DC by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 897 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Contempt of Court Proceedings by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 896 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judicial Notice that the Supreme Court Case of Cooke v. United States by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 895 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006, Terminated: 9/21/2006 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Appointment of Federal Public Defender by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 894 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER from the US Court of Appeals Tenth Circuit forwarding documents filed in error re: [893] MOTION to by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Plaintiff Kay Sieverding# (2) Motion filed in USDC- DC# (3) Exhibits A - K# (4) Exhibits L - Z# (5) Exhibits AA - EE)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 893 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 892 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Denying [891] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION for Initial Disclosure under Rule 26 of insurance policies. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/14/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 891 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006, Terminated: 9/14/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Initial Disclosure under Rule 26 of insurance policies by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 890 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testiCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Denying [889] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/13/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 889 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006, Terminated: 9/13/2006 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under USC Title 28 Section 2241 5 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 888 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Denying [887] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION for Factual Clarification as to the Purpose of the Contempt Hearing and What She is or is not Accused. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/13/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 887 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006, Terminated: 9/13/2006 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Factual Clarification as to the Purpose of the Contempt Hearing and What She is or is not Accused of by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 886 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as frivolous [873] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION to Dismiss Contempt Hearing for Failure to State a Cause; denying as frivolous [876] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal or Subject Jurisdiction ; denying as frivolous [877] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION to Cancel Scheduled Contempt of Court Hearing ; denying as frivolous [878] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION for the Court to recognize the Supreme Court Case of Chick Kam ; denying as frivolous [879] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION for Judicial Recognition of Additional Parties of Interest ; denying as frivolous [880] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION for Order to recognize already admitted facts from 10th Circuit ; denying as frivolous [881] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION to Compel Production of October 14, 2003 bill by City Attorney ; denying as frivolous [882] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION to recognize parties. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/11/06.(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 885 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [862] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Against Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for New Contempt of Court filed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 884 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE re [883] Response to Motion Attaching Exhibits A and B by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Transcript of January 4 2006 Court Hearing# (2) Exhibit B - Transcript of September 2 2005 Court Hearing)(Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 883 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [873] MOTION to Dismiss "Contempt Hearing for Failure to State a Cause" filed by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 882 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to recognize parties, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7)(rlp2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 881 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of October 14, 2003 bill by City Attorney by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (erv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 880 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to recognize already admitted facts from 10th Circuit by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (dln, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 879 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Judicial Recognition of Additional Parties of Interest by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 878 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for the Court to recognize the Supreme Court Case of Chick Kam by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 877 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Cancel Scheduled Contempt of Court Hearing by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 876 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal or Subject Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 875 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to withdraw [872] Objections and substituted with motion to dismiss by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 874 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER Defendants shall file responses no later than 9/8/06 to [873] MOTION to Dismiss Contempt Hearing for Failure to State a Cause filed by Kay Sieverding. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 8/24/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 873 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Contempt Hearing for Failure to State a Cause by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 872 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to further contempt of court hearings to by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 871 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional STATEMENT about why there can be no final award of attorney bills by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 870 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Two More OBJECTIONS to Award of Defense Attorney Bills by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 869 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADDITIONAL OBJECTIONS to Award of Defense Attorney Bills by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 868 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: for Plaintiff Kay Sieverding to appear in open court and to show cause why the relief requested in Newspaper Defendants' motion should not be granted. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/22/2006 03:15 PM before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 8/15/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 867 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for Plaintiff Kay Sieverding to show cause in open court why the relief requested in Newspaper Defendants' motion should not be granted. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/22/2006 03:15 PM before Judge Edward W. Nottingham.Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 8/15/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 866 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Order on Motion forJoinderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER Granting [864] Defendants Randall Klauzer, James 'Sandy' Horner, J. Richard Tremaine, Klauzer & Tremaine, LLC, and Jane Bennett's Motion for Joinder in Motion for Entry of Order to Show Cause. Granting [865] The Steamboat Springs Defendants' Motion for Joinder in Motion for Entry of Order to Show Cause. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 8/15/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 865 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Joinder re [862] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Against Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for New Contempt of Court by Defendant Hall & Evans, L.L.C.. (Brougham, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 864 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Joinder re [862] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Against Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for New Contempt of Court by Defendants Klauzer & Tremaine, Randall (I) Klauzer, Randall Klauzer, Jane Bennett, Klauzer & Tremaine, LLC, Randall (I) W. Klauzer, Randall W. Klauzer, Richard (I) Tremaine, Richard Tremaine. (Van Pelt, Traci)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 863 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: Denying [860] Motion for Resubmission of the Missing Attorney Bills re: [465] and Exhibit C attached to [465] attorney bills from defense counsel Brougham and defendant Lettunich by Plaintiff by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 8/11/06. (dln, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 862 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order to Show Cause Against Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for New Contempt of Court by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A1, Part 1# (2) Exhibit A1, pt 2# (3) Exhibit A1, pt 3# (4) Exhibit A, part 2# (5) Exhibit B1, part 1# (6) Exhibit B1, part 2# (7) Exhibit B1, part 3# (8) Exhibit B, part 2# (9) Exhibit C# (10) Exhibit D, part 1# (11) Exhibit D, part 2)(Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 861 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Annotation re: [860] Motion for Resubmission of Attorney Bills. Exhibit C. Entry has been modified to include motion. Text only entry - no document attached. (pap2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 860 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/11/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Resubmission of the Missing Attorney Bills re: [465] and Exhibit C attached to [465] attorney bills from defense counsel Brougham and defendant Lettunich by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, ) (Modified on 8/8/2006 to enter Motion) (pap2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 859 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Denying [858] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion that defense associates cease publishing about plaintiff on the Internet. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 7/31/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 858 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006, Terminated: 7/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request (MOTION) that defense associates cease publishing about plaintiff on the Internet by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C - Part 1# (4) Exhibit C - Part 2)(dln, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 857 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [855] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's MOTION for Indemnification of Any Lawsuit Involving Plaintiff that was Decided "on the merits" by a jury or through Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 4/7/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 856 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Record on Appeal volumes I and II transmitted to US Court of Appeals re [782] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1) Index Continued# (2) Index Continued)(djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 855 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 4/7/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Identification of Any Lawsuit Involving Plaintiff that was Decided "on the merits" by a jury or through Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 854 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA dated 3/28/06 granting appellant's motion to dismiss as to [819] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 853 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appeal Record Returned: volumes I-VII retunred re: [459] Notice of Appeal, [472] Notice of Appeal, [468] Notice of Appeal. Text Only Entry - No Document Attached (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 863 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 852 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying [851] Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate any Filing Restrictions or Injunctions against Plaintiff. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/20/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 851 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Vacate any "filing restrictions" or "injunctions" against plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 850 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [845] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Apparently Unopposed Motion to Strike, denying [846] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Apparently Unopposed Motion to Strike, denying [847] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Apparently Unopposed Motion to Strike, denying [848] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Apparently Unopposed Motion to Strike, denying [849] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Apparently Unopposed Motion to Strike [755] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Apparently UnopposedMOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/17/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 860 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 849 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Apparently Unopposed MOTION to Strike Newspaper Defendants'[755] MOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 848 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Apparently Unopposed MOTION to Strike all discussion of Hall and Evan's financial award by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 847 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Apparently Unopposed MOTION to Strike all discussion of the ABA's financial award by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 846 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Apparently Unopposed MOTION to Strike all discussion of the ABA's financial award by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 845 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006, Terminated: 3/17/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Apparently Unopposed MOTION to Strike all discussion of McConnell Siderious et al. financial award by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 844 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [843]Plaintiff's MOTION that the Court be Required to Follow All the Rules of Civil Procedure. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/13/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 843 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006, Terminated: 3/14/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION that the Court be Required to Follow All the Rules of Civil Procedure by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 842 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit of ECF rule B-7 re [841] Order on Motion for Order by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 841 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [838] Plaintiff's Motion Request to scan exhibits to [833] . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/13/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 840 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER denying [836] Plaintiff's Motion for explanation (to Clarify) re [788] Order, [765] Order (Show Cause Hearing and denying [837] Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration re [835] Order on Motion to Clarify . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/13/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 839 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Attached Motion in the 10th Circuit by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 837 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006, Terminated: 3/13/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [835] Order on Motion to Clarify by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 836 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006, Terminated: 3/13/2006 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for explanation (to Clarify) re [788] Order, [765] Order (Show Cause Hearing), by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 838 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006, Terminated: 3/13/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Request to scan exhibits to [833] by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 835 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER denying [828] Plaintiff's MOTION to Clarify Why Plaintiff's Case is Called Frivolous re [797] Order on Motion for Review . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 3/7/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 834 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Plaintiff Filing "Appeal from Orders Imposing Filing Restrictions" in 06-1038 in the 10th Circuit Court of Appeals by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 833 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibits Conventionally Filed, Exhibits 1 - 77 re [828] MOTION to Clarify re [797] Order on Motion for Review by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 832 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA re [828] MOTION to Clarify re [797] Order on Motion for Review by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 831 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND ERRATA re [824] Brief in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 830 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit A re [824] Brief in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 829 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing date re [826] Statement, [827] Errata by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 828 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Clarify Why Plaintiff's Case is Called Frivolous re [797] Order on Motion for Review by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 827 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA re [825] Supplemental Objection and Affidavits Supporting Objection to Award of Attorney Fees by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 826 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 StatementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Preliminary Examination Hearing 2/8/06 before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker in the USDC Western District of WI re [824] Brief in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 825 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to [824] OBJECTION (Brief in Opposition) to Motion to Award Attorney Fees, by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 824 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION (BRIEF in Opposition) re [755] Defendants' MOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) filed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 823 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 06-1072 for [819] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 822 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER re Appeal from the USCA to appellant advising of the briefing schedule as to [782] Notice of Appeal. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 821 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER Contempt Hearing set 2/27/06 is VACATED. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/24/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 820 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY re: [819] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/23/06. Appellant has 30 days to pay the $255 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal.(djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 819 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006, Terminated: 3/29/2006 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [814] MOTION for 10th Circuit Reconsideration of Attorney Time Bill not Awarded as Final Judgment now being treated as a NOTICE OF APPEAL pursuant to [817] Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. Fee Status: Fees not paid, IFP motion not filed. Notice mailed to all counsel on 2/23/06. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 818 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER denying [811] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Affidavits, denying [812] Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Contempt Hearing, denying [813] Motion for Leave to Use Repeated Motion to Admit Facts. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/22/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 817 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [814] Plaintiff's Motion for 10th Circuit Reconsideration of Attorney Time Bills not Awarded as Final Judgment . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/22/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 816 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Compliance re [807] Order by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 815 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 StatementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Dismiss filed in Washington DC cases in compliance with Judge's Order re [765] Show Cause Hearing, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 814 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006, Terminated: 2/22/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for 10th Circuit Reconsideration of Attorney Time Bills not Awarded as Final Judgment by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 813 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Use Repeated Motions to Admit Facts by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 812 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Stay Contempt Hearing 2/26/06 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 811 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006, Terminated: 2/22/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Affidavits or Law supporting an injunction against Plaintiff Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 810 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Court Proceedings Wisconsin re [792] Arrest Warrant for Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Docket Sheet - WI# (2) Warrant for Arrest# (3) Minutes I# (4) Minutes 2# (5) Contempt Proceedings# (6) Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 809 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: [806] Notice filed by Kay Sieverding and David Sieverding. Kay Sieverding and David Sieverding may within 11 days file opposition to any pending attorney fee request by defendants. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/15/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 808 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Appeal Fees (USCA case no. 06-1038) received $ 255 receipt number 266085 re [782] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 807 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward W. Nottingham : Continued Contempt Hearing/ Status Conference held on 2/14/2006 Hearin Continued Contempt Hearing/Status Conference set for 2/27/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 806 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of intent to file further oppositions to [755] MOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) by Plaintiffs Kay Sieverding, David Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 805 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 USCA OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA dated 2/13/06 denying appellant's emergency motion for stay of contempt actions and hearings before Judge Nottingham pending appeal as to [782] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 804 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Buchan Kelley on behalf of Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper (Kelley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 803 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER denying [800] Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Hearing on 2/14/06.Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/13/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 802 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of "Purging Contempt" re [793] Status Conference, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 801 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from USCA to Plaintiff Kay Sieverding advising her that she is responsible for both a mandamus petition fee and an appeal fee. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 800 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006, Terminated: 2/13/2006 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Vacate Hearing set for 2/14/06 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 799 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of ERRATA re [796] MOTION for Review by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 798 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER Continued Contempt Hearing/Status Conference set for 2/14/2006 08:30 AM before Judge Edward W. Nottingham.Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/8/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 797 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order on Motion for ReviewCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying as frivolous [796] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Review and Proposed Lawsuit. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/7/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 796 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006, Terminated: 2/8/2006 Motion for Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Review of attached draft action by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Steamboat Pilot Archived Story)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 795 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: [779] Certificate of Mailing Addressed to Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 794 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [755] MOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) filed by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - b: Report an Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Noel# (2) Exhibit - C: Order adopting magistrate's report and recommendation# (3) Exhibit - D: Pacer Docket Report)(Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 793 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward W. Nottingham : Status Conference held on 2/2/2006, Kay Sieverding is in contempt of court for failure to comply with her 1/4/06 promise to dismiss cases, for failure to appear at this Status Conference. Clerk shall prepare bench warrant for arrest of Kay Sieverding, US Marshall Service is directed to take Kay Sieverding into custody. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 792 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WARRANT of Arrest issued as to Kay Sieverding for failure to appear. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 791 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Annotation re: [790] MOTION for Leave to Appear. Motion terminated as document is actually an entry of appearance. Text only entry - no document attached. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 790 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 1/31/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (O'Malley, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 789 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Annotation re: [787] MOTION for Leave to Appear. Motion has been termed as document attached is actually an Entry of Appearance. Text only entry - no document attached. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 788 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Imposing Filing Restrictions on Kay Sieverding and David Sieverding re: [455] Order, [765] Show Cause Hearing. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 1/30/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 787 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 1/31/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (O'Malley, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 786 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY re: [782] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 1/30/06. Appellant has 30 days to pay the $255 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 785 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 06-1038 for [782] Notice of Appeal filed by Kay Sieverding. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 784 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the petition for extraodinary writ being treated as a [782] Notice of Appeal. (Pro se; Fees not paid, IFP motion not filed) (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 783 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Annotation re: exhibits added to [782] Notice of Appeal. Text only entry - no document attached. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 781 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA ORDER dated 1/25/06 instructing the USDC to construe Kay Sieverding's petition for mandamus as a notice of appeal from the USDC's order imposing injunctive relief on 1/4/06. The filing date shall be the original date of filing in the USCA. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 780 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk of Court of 1/23/06 [778] Minute Order to David Sieverding and Michael O'Malley (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 779 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk of Court of [778] Minute Order of 1/23/06 to Kay Sieverding (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 778 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/2/2006 02:15 PM before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Kay Sieverding and David Sieverding shall personally appear by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/23/06. (dlb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 777 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re [765] Show Cause Hearing,, (Notice of Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Noncompliance With Court's Orders) by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Docket in DC Case No 05-cv-1283# (2) Exhibit B - Docket in DC Case No 05-cv-1672# (3) Exhibit C - Docket in DC Case No 05-cv-2122# (4) Exhibit D - Docket in Kansas Case No 05-cv-2510# (5) Exhibit E - Petition for mandamus in 10th Cir Case No. 06-1023# (6) Exhibit F - Docket for 10th Cir Case No 06-1023)(Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 782 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006, Terminated: 2/13/2006 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Petition for extraordinary writ being treated as a NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [765] Show Cause Hearing on 1/4/06 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. Petition is being treated as a notice of appeal pursuant to USCA order dated 1/25/06. Fee Status: Fees not paid, IFP motion not filed. Notice mailed to all counsel on 1/26/06. (djs, ) (Modified on 1/26/2006 to add exhibits) (djs, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 776 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from U.S. Court of Appeals advising of filing of petition for extraordinary writ of mandamus on 1/18/06 by Ms. Sieverding (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 775 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: [771] Docket Annotation, Addressed to Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 774 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: [765] Show Cause Hearing, Addressed to Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 773 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA ORDER dated 1/10/06 denying denygin plaintiffs' petition for writ of mandamus. (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 772 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: [765] Show Cause Hearing, [766] Order on Motion, Addressed to Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 770 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion (STATEMENT) to Admit Facts by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 769 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re [765] Show Cause Hearing,, (Submission of Proposed Order Imposing Filing Restrictions on Kay Sieverding and David Sieverding) by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper (Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 771 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Annotation re: [768] Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document. Document is actually a Motion to Withdraw for David Sieverding 05-cv-02122-RMU in the USDC District of Columbia. This document will not be considered as a motion before this court. Text only entry - no document attached. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 768 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006, Terminated: 1/6/2006 Motion to Withdraw Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document by Plaintiff David Sieverding. (Podboy, Ronald) (Modified on 1/6/2006 to clarify entry is a motion to withdraw in case 05-cv-02122-RMU)(pap, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 767 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying [760] Motion to Release Kay Sieverding from Jail based on New Evidence and denying [764] Motion to Clarify Claimed Basis for Proposed $70,000.00 of New Attorney Bills by Faegre & Benson . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 1/4/06. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 766 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [704] Defendants' Motion to Enter Further Relief for New Contempt by Kay Sieverding . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 1/4/06 pursuant to [765] Show Cause Hearing. Text Only Order - No Document Attached. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 765 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Show Cause HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward W. Nottingham : Show Cause Hearing held on 1/4/2006. Granting [704] Defendants' MOTION to Enter Further Relief for New Contempt by Kay Sieverding. Mr. Sieverding will file notice of proof of withdrawal of the cases in other districts no later than Wednesday, January 4, 2006 at 5:00 p.m. Ms. Sieverding is prohibited from filing any further lawsuits anywhere in this country unless she is represented by a lawyer or unless this court specifically approves her filing of a given lawsuit. Ms. Sieverding shall be released January 4, 2006 on the agreement that she dismiss all lawsuits within 11 days.(Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 764 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2006 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Clarify Claimed Basis for Proposed $70,000.00 of New Attorney Bills by Faegre & Benson re: [755] MOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 763 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Preliminary Partial Objection (RESPONSE) to [755] Mr. Beall's MOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) filed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 762 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Additional Defaults in Related Case D of Columbia 05-cv-01672 and notice of Errata to Amendment of Motion for Mandamus by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 761 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA to [759] Amendment of Motion for Mandamus by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 760 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Release Kay Sieverding from Jail Based on New Evidence by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 759 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to 10th Circuit Motion for Mandamus re: [757] Letter by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Evidence in Support of Motion)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 758 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding re: Service of Supreme Court Communication (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 757 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from US Court of Appeals for the 10th Circuit to Kay Sieverding re: Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 756 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER denying [742] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel, denying [743] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel, denying [745] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel, denying [748] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order, denying [749] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Clarify, denying [750] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for More Definite Statement, denying [751] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Clarify, denying [753] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Clarify, denying [754] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Vacate . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/30/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 755 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees (Post-Judgment Fees and Costs) by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey S. Steen, including Exhibits A-1 through A-10# (2) Affidavit Exhibits A-11 through A-20 to Declaration)(Beall, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 754 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005, Terminated: 12/30/2005 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Vacate Hearing set for 1/4/06 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 753 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005, Terminated: 12/30/2005 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Clarification by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 752 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit/Affidavit of 9/2/05 Misrepresentations of Fact, Law, and Due Process re [751] MOTION to Clarify by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 751 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005, Terminated: 12/30/2005 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Clarify 9/2/05 transcript P11 line 20 re: Mr. Beall accused plaintiffs of "not complying with law or rules" by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 750 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005, Terminated: 12/30/2005 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for More Definite Statement of Mr. Beall's representation of contempt procedure by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 749 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005, Terminated: 12/30/2005 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Based on Rule 65 that Chris Beall should State (Clarify) the basis in law for his proposed injunction and explain how it relates to NAACP v. Button by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 748 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005, Terminated: 12/30/2005 Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order under Rule 65 for Chris Beall and Judge Nottingham to provide editing suggestions to Plaintiff's unserved 05-cv-02510 Kansas Complaint by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 747 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (NOTICE of) Service of Amendment of Motion to Stay for Jailing for Alleged Violation of Nonexistent Injunction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 746 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Service of Supreme Court Communications 12/15 and 12/19 (STATEMENT) by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 745 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Any Reason why the Imprisonment of Kay Sieverding should not be considered a criminal conspiracy by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 744 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of FRCP 4.1 and 65 re: the jailing of Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 743 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Evidence of Plaintiff's Violation of Federal or State Law by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 742 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005, Terminated: 12/30/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of Law under which Sieverding is Jailed by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 741 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER denying [740] Kay Sieverding's Motion for Discovery to State Number of Statute for Basis of so Called Injunction Sieverding accused of violating . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/28/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 740 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005, Terminated: 12/28/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Discovery to State Number of Statute for Basis of so Called Injunction Sieverding accoused of violating by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 739 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Order on Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER The court had reviewed the motions and because they are without merit, it is ordered that they are Denied. Denying [732] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Denying [733] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for basis in law showing duty and irreparable harm to World West LLP related to proposed new injunction. Denying [734] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Judicial Notice of FRCP 4.1(b). Denying [735] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for More Definite Statement of what is claimed to be contemptious conduct. Denying [736] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Produce Injunction. Denying [737] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion under Rule 11 to be told why Faegre & Benson Claims that D of Kansas 05-cv-02510 is sanctionable. Ordered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/23/05. Text Only Order - No Document Attached. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 738 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, Motions have been review and found to be without merit and therefore denied. Denying [729] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order to Admit Anti-Injunction Act. Denying [730] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel Explanation of Fear by CBA and ABA, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/23/05. Text Only Order - No Document Attached. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 737 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION under Rule 11 to be told why Faegre & Benson Claims that D of Kansas 05-cv-02510 is sanctionable by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 736 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Produce Injunction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 735 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for More Definite Statement of what is claimed to be contemptious conduct by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 734 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judicial Notice of FRCP 4.1(b) by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 733 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for basis in law showing duty and irreparable harm to World West LLP related to proposed new injunction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 732 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 731 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT that she will not use typing in 05-cv-01283, 05-cv-01672, 05-cv-02510 or other "supect" communitions by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 730 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Explanation of Fear by CBA and ABA by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 729 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005, Terminated: 12/23/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Admit Anti-Injunction Act by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 728 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Denying [723] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel, [724] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel, [725] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Sanctions and [727] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Statement Complaint. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/19/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 727 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              New Complaint (STATEMENT) of procedural violation by the Court by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 726 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion to the 10th Circuit for Stay of All Further Contempt of Court Actions by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 725 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Sanctions as to Mr. Beall by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 724 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Evidence that Bennetts Expansion and Renovation complied with Steamboat Springs Development Laws by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 723 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Evidence that Sieverding Criminally Harassed Jane Bennett by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 722 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER denying [719] Kay Sieverding's Motion under Rule 7 for legal basis of Mr. Bealls recent filing and the court's order for 1/4/06 hearing, denying [720] Kay Sieverding's Motion for Release to attend Christmas with her Mother-in-law, Denying [721] REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for Clarification of Sieverding's visiting privleges under the 14th Amendment, denying [718] REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding to Disqualify or Remove Judge on the Basis of Medical Incapability. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/16/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 721 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for Clarification of Sieverding's visiting privleges under the 14th Amendment. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 720 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 12/16/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Release of Kay Sieverding to attend Christmas with her Mother-in-law by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 719 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 12/16/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION under Rule 7 for legal basis of Mr. Bealls recent filing and the court's order for 1/4/06 hearing by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 718 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding to Disqualify or Remove Judge on the Basis of Medical Incapability. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 717 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute ORDER denying [716] Motion for Order, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/15/05. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 716 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005, Terminated: 12/15/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judicial Notice re: Reversal of Contempt by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 715 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Annotation re: [704] MOTION to Enter Further Relief for New Contempt by Kay Sieverding. This docket entry was modified as the motion was reactivated. The motion was termined in error with the minute order of 12/13/05. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 714 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MINUTE ORDER re: [713]. denying the following motions: [706] MOTION for Order to filed by Kay Sieverding, [707] MOTION for Order to filed by Kay Sieverding, [708] MOTION for Order to filed by Kay Sieverding, [709] MOTION for Order to filed by Kay Sieverding, and [712] Request filed by Kay Sieverding, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/13/05. (gmssl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 713 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005, Terminated: 12/13/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute ORDER denying [704] Motion, denying [706] Motion for Order, denying [707] Motion for Order, denying [708] Motion for Order, denying [709] Motion for Order and denying [712] motion, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/13/05. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 712 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for the Judge to State Which Type of Civil Contempt Sieverding is Accused Of. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 711 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing in Related Case District of Columbia 05-cv-01283 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 710 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Annotation re: [709] MOTION for Order Returning Right of Sieverding Modified 12/12/05 to add Exhibit 1. Text only entry - no document attached. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 709 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005, Terminated: 12/13/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to Return Sieverding's Right to Petition the Court without Penaly of Jail by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, ). (Modified on 12/12/2005 to attach Exhibit 1)(pap, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 708 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005, Terminated: 12/13/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Traci Van Pelt to Produce Elements of a Valid Injunction Against Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 707 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005, Terminated: 12/13/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Dave Broughton to Identify Elements of a Valid Injunction against Sieverding without a Lawyer by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, ) (Modified on 12/12/2005 to correct spelling)(pap2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 706 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005, Terminated: 12/13/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Chris Beall to produce elements of valid injunction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 705 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: [704] MOTION to Enter Further Relief for New Contempt by Kay Sieverding filed by Suzanne Schlicht,Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper, Show Cause Hearing set for 1/4/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/12/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 704 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005, Terminated: 1/4/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Enter Further Relief for New Contempt by Kay Sieverding by Defendants Suzanne Schlicht, Suzanne (I) Schlicht, Steamboat Pilot & Today Newspaper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Beall, Christopher) (Modified on 12/14/2005 to re-activate motion, termed in error) (gms, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 703 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER The following Motions are without merit and therefore Denied. Denying [700] Motion Admit Facts about Related Litigation. Denying [701] Motion to Release Sieverding from Jail because she is unable to perform the additional restriction the court seeks. Denying [702] REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for Clarification Why Plaintiff is in Jail and How She can be Free. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/9/05. Text Only Order - No Document Attached. (pap2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 702 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for Clarification Why Plaintiff is in Jail and How She can be Free. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 701 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005, Terminated: 12/9/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Release Sieverding from Jail because she is unable to perform the additional restriction the court seeks by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 700 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005, Terminated: 12/9/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Admit Facts about Related Litigation by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 699 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of recent communication with C.B.A. by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 698 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's STATEMENT in response to [686] Order, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 696 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Because the Court and Defense have not supplied the elements of a Valid Injunction against Pro Se litigation Sieverding must therefore be immediately release from custody by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 695 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Defense Counsel to Identify What Sieverding Did That was Illegal and Justified Her Jailing by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 694 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION under Rules of Prof Conduct 8.4 for the Defense to Explain Why They have not Taken Affirmative Steps to Restore Sieverding's Physical Liberty and Safety from Threats of Murder by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 693 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Release Sieverding from Jail Based on USC 28 Section 1654 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 692 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Release Kay Sieverding based on American Jurisprudence by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 691 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Free Sieverding because it violates USC Title 18 Section 401 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 690 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Free Sieverding Because She was Denied the Due Process Required by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 689 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER denying [687] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Admit Facts and denying [688] Motion for Judicial Notice . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/6/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 697 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute ORDER denying [690] Motion for Order, denying [691] Motion for Order, denying [692] Motion for Order, denying [693] Motion for Order, denying [694] Motion for Order, denying [695] Motion to Compel, denying [696] Motion for Order, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/6/05. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 688 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005, Terminated: 12/7/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (lam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 687 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005, Terminated: 12/7/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Admit Facts that the Jailing of Kay Sieverding Violated the adopted Col. Rules of Civil Procedure 107 and Rules of Professional Conduct by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (lam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 686 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the referenced motions [681]- [684] are granted.Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/6/05. (lam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 685 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER denying [680] Motion for Release as frivolous, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/5/05. (lam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 684 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for the Court to Recognize USC Title 28 Section 1654 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 683 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Recognize United States Code Title 18 - 241 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 682 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND MOTION to Admit American Jurisprudence as Legal Authority by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 681 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Recognize Federal Procedure Lawyers Edition as Legal Authority by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 680 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for (Order) to Release Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 679 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying [676] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel the Defense to provide a legal basis for the Jailing of Kay Sieverding. Denying [677] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Judicial Notice of American Jurisprudence Authority. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/5/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 678 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to [662] Order on Motion to Admit Facts about the Criminal Use of Force to Prevent Presentment in Court by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 677 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judicial Notice of American Jurisprudence Authority by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 676 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel the Defense to provide a legal basis for the Jailing of Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 675 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying [674] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order for Judicial Notice that No Basis for Any Sanctions has been Produced. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 12/2/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 674 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 12/2/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order for Judicial Notice that No Basis for Any Sanctions has been Produced. by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 673 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER Granting [670] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to recognize "American Jurisprudence" as legal authority. denying [671] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Release from Jail. Overruling [672] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Objection to a previous order. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/30/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 672 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to [659] Order Denying Motion to Admit Facts by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 671 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Release Kay Sieverding from jail so that she can work so Ed Sieverding can go to college by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 670 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Recognize American Juris prudence Authority by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 669 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER to Judge Babcock by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding re: Judge Nottingham's jailing me for filing a civil lawsuit. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 668 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER denying [666] REQUEST/MOTION to Clarify re [637] Order on Order on Motion to Disqualify, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding.Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/30/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 667 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying [665] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order to Admit Facts, denying Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Requests [663] and [664] ,by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/30/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 666 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST/MOTION to Clarify re [637] Order on Order on Motion to Disqualify, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 665 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Admit Facts by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 664 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for Court to Check any conditions under which it will release Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 663 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for CBA to explain recent letter from the Colorado Attorney Regulation Office. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 662 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER denying [660] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Admit Facts About US Code Title 18 criminal statutes 1512, 241, and 242 . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/28/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 661 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF Supporting Criminal Indictment of Judge Nottingham, Magistrate Schlatter, Christopher Beall, David Brougham, Traci Van Pelt and Brett Huff by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Continuation of Main Document)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 660 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005, Terminated: 11/28/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Admit Facts About US Code Title 18 criminal statutes 1512, 241, and 242 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 659 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying [657] Defendant's Motion for Order to Admit Facts . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/22/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 658 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER denying [656] Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Required Elements of a Valid Injunction . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/22/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 657 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Admit Facts by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 656 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Required Elements of a Valid Injunction by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 655 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying [646] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Clarify, denying [647] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order, denying [652] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order, denying [653] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order and denying [654] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Request for Clemancy. Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/17/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 654 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding for Clemancy. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 653 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 11/17/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Release from Civil Contempt Jailing Because of Inability to Comply by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 652 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 11/17/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judicial Notice of Facts by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 651 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying Motions docketed as ## [649] and [650], by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/15/05. (lam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 650 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (NOTICE) Motion for Intention of Court if Plaintiff Appeals to US Supreme Court by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 649 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/15/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Court to Provide Information to Clear Creek Sargent Smith by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 648 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: [632] Order, Addressed to James Booth Fajardo Oliphant. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 645 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying [639] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order and denying [640] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order, denying [643] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order . Entered by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/10/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 647 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order to Release Kay Sieverding from Jail Temporarily so she can attempt to hire a lawyer by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 646 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/17/2005 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Clarify how to Stop the World Company from republishing defamation per se about Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 642 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Annotation re: [641] Brief. This docket entry was modified to correct the file date to be 11/8/05. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 644 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Unsuccessful Attempts to Secure Counsel by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 643 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order to Return Her to Her Family by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 641 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF Supporting Finding of Duress and Undue Influence by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, ) (Modified on 11/9/2005 to correct the file date) (gms, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 640 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Allow David Sieverding to Rejoin by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 639 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Repeat MOTION for Order for Court to State When and Under What Terms Sieverding Will be Released from Jail by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 638 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute ORDER denying [636] Motion Under Cannons II & III, by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/8/05. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 637 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [634] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Disqualify, denying [635] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion to Compel, denying [633] Plaintiff Kay Sieverding's Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/8/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 636 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 11/8/2005 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Clarify [632] Order as to why Motions are "without merit", by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 635 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Defense Counsel to Protest the Continued Jailing of Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 634 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005, Terminated: 11/8/2005 Motion to DisqualifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Disqualify Judge Nottingham and Magistrate Judge Schlatter by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 633 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judicial Notice - Jail is Dangerous by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 632 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [611] Motion for Order, denying [612] Motion for Order, denying [613] Motion for Order, denying [614] Motion to Vacate, denying [617] Motion to Compel, denying [619] Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, denying [620] Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, denying [621] Motion for Order, denying [622] Motion for Order, denying [624] Motion for Order, denying [625] Motion for Order, denying [626] Motion for Order, denying [627] Motion for Sanctions, denying [628] Motion for Order, denying [629] Motion for Order, denying [630] Motion for Order, denying [631] Motion for Order . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 11/1/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 631 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER/MOTION for Judicial notice that the requirements of CR Civ P Rule 107 were violated by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 630 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 629 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to Release Kay Sieverding since US Taxpayers have already paid $6,000 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 627 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Sanctions as to Christopher Beall by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 628 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Under Rule 12(e)for Court to Supply its Basis in Law for the 7 Week Jailing of Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 626 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Under Rule 9 to Proofread Longer Press Release Designed to Get Sieverding out of Jail by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 625 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judicial Notice - Typed Version of Undisputed Press Release by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 624 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Defense Notice of Their Liability for False Imprisonment/Malicious Prosecution and /or Abuse of Process by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 623 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER with information re: [593] Motion Hearing, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 622 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order to Release Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 621 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 620 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify [22] to show Jury Demand filed 1/22/03 by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 619 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify ECF Record re: Plaintiff's amount of Demand by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 618 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [608] Kay Sieverding's Motion for Judicial Notice about Court's Incarceration and denying [609] Kay Sieverding's Motion for Special Prosecutor . Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 10/18/05. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 617 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Defense Counsel to immediately petition the court to release Kay Sieverding for jail by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 616 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Defense Counsel NOTICE thant under Dennis v. Sparks, et al. (United States Supreme Court 1980), the defense counsel are liable for the illegal jailing of Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 614 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Vacate [593] Order granting Oral Motion of Tracy Van Pelt and Christopher Beal to Jail Kay Sieverding, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 613 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order allowing Conjucal Contact Visit by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 615 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: [606] Order on Motion for Order Addressed to James Booth Fajardo Oliphant. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 612 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Special Prosecutor to Investigate Judicial Corruption in Colorado by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 611 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to be told when and under what terms and conditions Kay Sieverding will be released from Jail by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 610 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION (STATEMENT) for the Record that Faegre and Benson requested the incarceration of Plaintiff by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 609 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005, Terminated: 10/18/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Special Prosecutor by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 608 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005, Terminated: 10/18/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judicial Notice about Court's Incarceration of Kay Sieverding by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 607 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDICIAL NOTICE re [593] Motion Hearing, by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (pap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 606 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [604] Motion for Order for Court to Supply Essential Elements. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/29/05. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 605 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Order on Motion to ClarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [598] Motion for explanatory order (Clarify), denying [602] Motion for Order to identify statute, denying [603] Motion for Order for legal authority. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 9/28/05. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 604 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005, Terminated: 9/29/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order to Supply the Eseential Elements of the Defense by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 603 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order for Legal Authority by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 602 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order to Identify the Statute by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 601 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Kay Sieverding re: why she is in jail (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 600 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 598 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2005 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Explain (Clarify) Why Plaintiffs' Claims on these Defendants Were Frivilous/Sanctionable by Plaintiff Kay Sieverding. (gms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 599 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Motion Heaing held on 9/2/05 before Judge Nottingham. Prepared by: Therese Lindblom. Pages: 1-34. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Available in paper format at the Clerk's Office (djs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 323 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?