Robert & Jean Bennett Vs. Al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. CIV000398192
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jean Bennett, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Bennett, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Allstate Insurance Company, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Taitz, Robert J C/o Shane & Taiz, Party Representative
Officially listed as "J. Taitz, Robert"
No Logo Ron Leaf, Party Representative
Attributes
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Robert Bennett
Complaint 1 Filing Date 10/8/1996
Complaint 1 Status Active
Timeline
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997
Ent As Fto Ent Act W/prej! Nmc
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 44 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
Lang In Suprt;pos (hrg 8-14-97)! Wkp
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 43 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
The Dec Of Ron Leaf;supplemental Dec Of Carol
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 42 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
Deft Allstate Insurance Cos Mot 2 Strike
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 41 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
Pltfs Opp 2 Its Sep Stmt In Suprt Of Mot;
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 40 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
Mot 4 Sa;deft Allstate Ins Cos Reply 2
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 39 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
Reply 2 Pltfs Opp 2 Mot 4 Sj,or In The Alt,
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 38 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
Deft Allstate Insurance Companys Memo P&a In
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 37 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997
8-14-97)! Wkp
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 36 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997
R Shane In Suprt;pos;proposed Ord (hrg
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 35 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997
Pltfs Evidentiary Objections 2 Dec Of David
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 34 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997
Joseph Michelucci,jean Bennett In Suprt Of Opp;
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 33 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997
Sj &/or 4 Sa;sep Stmt In Opp;decs Of Ron Leaf,
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 32 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997
Pltfs P&a In Suprt Of Opp 2 Allstates Mot 4
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 31 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
$14 For Continuance Of Mot! Ms
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 30 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
(amended) Of Mot & Mot 4 Sj; Pos (hrg 8-14-97)! M
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 29 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
In Suprt Of Mot; Pos (hrg 8-14-97! Ms
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 28 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
Suprt Of Mot; Decl Of David R. Shane
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 27 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
Facts & Reference 2 Suprtng Evidence In
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 26 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
Is No Substantial Controversy, Associated
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 25 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
Separate Stmt Of Issues As 2 W/c There
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 24 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
Of Mot & Mot 4 Sa; Mpa In Suprt Of Mot;
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 23 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
$100 On Mot! Ms
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 22 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997
(hrg 8-13-97) ºuf
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 21 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997
Carol Lang; Proposed Ord; Pos; $100.00 Pd
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 20 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997
Separate Stmt; Decl Of David R Shane; Decl Of
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 19 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997
W/memo P&a; Separate Stmt Of Non-calif Auth;
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 18 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997
Deft Allstate Ins Co. Ntc Of Mot/mot 4 Sj Along
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 17 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/11/1997
Of Coa & Telephone # By Shane & Taitz! Sca
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 16 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997
2 Set 4 Trial - Sig By Jdg Aram Serverian! Sca
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 15 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997
By Deft. Allstate Ins Co., W/pos !uf
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 14 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997
By Robert & Jean Bennett W/pos !uf
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 13 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997
Dist Crt W/afdvt Of M On 1/22/97 !uf
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997
Of Rcpt Of Papers/pleadings Remanded From Us
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 11 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
District Court!mm
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 10 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
Of Removal Of Civil Action To United States
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 9 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
By Allstate Insurance Company Of Filing Of Ntc
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 8 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
182.00 By Allstate Insurance Company!mm
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 7 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996
Accept)! Nm
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 6 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996
10-22-96 By P (margaret Wilson, Person Auth To
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 5 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996
Allstate Insurance Company Srvd Sum/com/cmc Pkt
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 4 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996
Original Returned! Nm
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996
Civil Case Cover Case !uf
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996
$182.00 On Cmpl !uf
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 1 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996
4 Damages - (sum Iss) !uf
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 13 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?