Weidrick v. Bush, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02451-ZLW
District Judge Zita L. Weinshienk, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Zita L. Weinshienk
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Mary Jo Weidrick, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ABC, Defendant
Ccc: cc - Ccc ccc Cc Cc, IL 60606,
Ibew Local Union 51: Connected - Ibew Local Union 51 301 E. SPRUCE ST. Springfield, IL 62703,
No Logo Al Gore, Defendant
No Logo AL, State of, Defendant
No Logo All Nashville Judges, Defendant
No Logo All U.S. Senators and Congressmen, Defendant
No Logo Atlanta, GA, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Bush, Defendant
No Logo Birmingham, AL, Defendant
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS"
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Chelsea Clinton, Defendant
No Logo Cleveland, OH, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of D.C., Defendant
No Logo Dan Brokaw, Defendant
No Logo Dan Quayle, Defendant
No Logo Dan Rather, Defendant
No Logo Danville, KY, Defendant
No Logo Dick Cheney, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
No Logo GA, State of, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo Gil Morritt, Defendant
No Logo H. W. Bush, Defendant
No Logo Jenna Bush, Defendant
No Logo John Nixon, Defendant
No Logo KY, State of, Defendant
No Logo Lundsville, AL, Defendant
No Logo MO, State of, Defendant
No Logo Nashville Police Dept., Defendant
No Logo Nashville, TN, Defendant
No Logo Nbc, Defendant
No Logo NY, State of, Defendant
No Logo NYC, Defendant
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant
Officially listed as "NYC Police Dept."
No Logo OH, State of, Defendant
No Logo Peter Jennings, Defendant
No Logo SS, Defendant
No Logo St. Louis, MO, Defendant
No Logo TN, State of, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Supreme Court Justices, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
No Logo Vanderbilt University, Defendant
No Logo William J. Clinton, Defendant
Attributes
Office Denver
Filed 12/30/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 2/13/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
Timeline
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
Order and JUDGMENT of Dismissal: by Senior Judge Zita L. Weinshienk dismissing case without prejudice for failure to prosecute ; judgment is entered in favor of Dfts and against Pla (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/14/03 (pap)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Complaint
COMPLAINT (bpm)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter directing clerk to commence civil action and directing pla to cure deficiencies within 30 days. Motion and affidavit for leave to proceed pursuant to 28 USC 1915 is not on proper form. Complaint is not on proper form and there are insufficient copies to serve each defendant regarding [1-1] motion to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/31/02 (bpm)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
MOTION by plaintiff to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (bpm)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 382 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?