Pioneer Financial v. Irene And Raul Miranda
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. CLJ437195

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Irene Miranda, Defendant
No Logo Raul A Miranda, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Pioneer Financialllc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 2/3/2004
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 12/20/2004
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012
Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Mateo County In The Amount Of $24,069.45
    Blank 26 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012
    Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $9,736.65, Costs In The Amount Of $233.00 ---
      Blank 25 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012
      --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
        Blank 24 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010
        Writ Of Execution From San Mateo County Returned Wholly Un Satisfied.
          Blank 23 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010
          --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
            Blank 22 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010
            Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Mateo County In The Amount Of $21,342.60
              Blank 21 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010
              Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $7,119.80, Costs In The Amount Of $123.00 ---
                Blank 20 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009
                Writ Of Execution From San Mateo County Returned Un Satisfied.
                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009
                  Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $6,176.00, Costs In The Amount Of $23.00 ---
                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009
                    --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009
                      Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Mateo County In The Amount Of $20,288.80
                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008
                        Writ Of Money From San Mateo County Returned Un Satisfied.
                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                          Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Mateo County In The Amount Of $17,220.10
                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                            Notice Of Change Of Address Of Attorney Robert Scott Kennard Filed
                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                              Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $3,107.30, Costs In The Amount Of $23.00 ---
                                Blank 12 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004
                                  Judgment After Default By Clerk Entered On 12/20/04 As Follows:
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004
                                    Declaration Pursuant To Ccp 1033(b) Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004
                                      Request For Default Filed And Default Entered On Complaint Filed 02/03/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Irene Miranda.
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004
                                        Default Entered As To Irene Miranda
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004
                                          Original Summons Returned As To Complaint Filed 02/03/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc.
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004
                                            Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 02/03/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc Without Prejudice Filed And Entered.
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004
                                              Proof Of Service (sub-service) Of Summons And Complaint Filed 02/03/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Irene Miranda, By Sub-serving John Doe, Co-occupant. Mailing Date Of 09/30/04.
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004
                                                Declaration Of Due Diligence
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004
                                                  Request For Dismissal On Complaint Filed 02/03/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Defendant Raul A Miranda Without Prejudice Filed And Entered.
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                                                    Summons Issued; 30 Day
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                                                      (l) Complaint Filed - Prayer Amount $10,000.00 Or Less.

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?