Pioneer Financial v. Shawn Bennett
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. CLJ437947

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ayers, Jonathan E
v.
No Logo Shawn E Bennett, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Pioneer Financialllc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 3/11/2004
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 03/14/2005
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010
Supplemental Return On Attachment/execution Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc.
    Blank 24 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
    0002 -- Partially Satisfied
      Blank 23 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
      Writ Of Execution From Los Angeles County Returned Partially Satisfied.
        Blank 22 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007
        Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To Los Angeles County In The Amount Of $11,377.96
          Blank 21 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007
          Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $247.32, Costs In The Amount Of $133.00 ---
            Blank 20 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007
            --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
              Blank 19 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007
              Writ Of Money From San Mateo County Returned Wholly Un Satisfied.
                Blank 18 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                  Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Mateo County In The Amount Of $10,563.07
                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                    Notice Of Change Of Address Of Attorney Jonathan E Ayers Filed
                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                      Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $1,742.43, Costs In The Amount Of $23.00 ---
                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                        (l) Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                          Declaration In Lieu Of Testimony Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc
                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                            Judgment After Default By Clerk Entered On 03/14/05 As Follows:
                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                              Original Summons Returned As To Complaint Filed 03/11/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc.
                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 03/11/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc Without Prejudice Filed And Entered.
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                  Request For Default Filed And Default Entered On Complaint Filed 03/11/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Shawn E Bennett.
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                    Default Entered As To Shawn E Bennett
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                      Declaration Of Due Diligence
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                        Proof Of Service (sub-service) Of Summons And Complaint Filed 03/11/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Shawn E Bennett, By Sub-serving Jane Doe. Mailing Date Of 12/21/04.
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004
                                          Proof Of Service Of Complaint Filed 03/11/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Shawn E Bennett Filed. Not Found.
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                            Proof Of Service Of Complaint Filed 03/11/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Shawn E Bennett Filed. Not Found.
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                              Proof Of Service Of Complaint Filed 03/11/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Shawn E Bennett Filed. Not Found.
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004
                                                (l) Complaint Filed - Prayer Amount $10,000.00 Or Less.
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004
                                                  Summons Issued; 30 Day

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?