Pioneer Financial v. Lusia Tuimavave
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. CLJ438394

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ayers, Jonathan E
v.
No Logo Lusia Tuimavave, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Pioneer Financialllc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 4/1/2004
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 06/30/2004
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009
Acknowledgment Of Full Satisfaction Of Judgment As To Complaint Filed 04/01/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc Filed
    Blank 21 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
    Acknowledgment Of Full Satisfaction Of Judgment As To Complaint Filed 04/01/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc Filed
      Blank 20 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
      0002 -- Satisfied
        Blank 19 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
        Writ Of Money From San Francisco County Returned Partially Satisfied.
          Blank 18 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005
          Writ Of Execution From San Francisco County Returned Un Satisfied.
            Blank 17 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005
            --- Credits In The Amount Of $2,104.97.
              Blank 16 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005
              0002 -- Partially Satisfied
                Blank 15 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005
                Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County In The Amount Of $440.91
                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005
                  Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $155.00, Costs In The Amount Of $23.00 ---
                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004
                    Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Pioneer Financial,llc. Interest In The Amount Of $37.68, Costs In The Amount Of $23.00 ---
                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004
                      --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004
                        Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County In The Amount Of $2,550.86
                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004
                          (l) Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004
                            Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 04/01/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc Without Prejudice Filed And Entered.
                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004
                              Request For Default Filed And Default Entered On Complaint Filed 04/01/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc As To Lusia Tuimavave.
                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004
                                Default Entered As To Lusia Tuimavave
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004
                                  Declaration In Support Of Default Judgment
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004
                                    Judgment After Default By Clerk Entered On 06/30/04 As Follows:
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004
                                      Original Summons Returned As To Complaint Filed 04/01/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc.
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                                        Proof Of Service (personal) Of Summons And Complaint Filed 04/01/2004 Of Pioneer Financial,llc Served On Lusia Tuimavave With Service Date Of 04/26/04.
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004
                                          (l) Complaint Filed - Prayer Amount $10,000.00 Or Less.
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004
                                            Summons Issued; 30 Day

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?