Rand L. Stephens v. Chrysler Corp
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC00-00141

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Rand L. Stephens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Chrysler Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Michael Stead Chrysler-plymouth Jeep, Defendant
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 1/13/2000
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 07/31/2000
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18
Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
    Blank 17 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000
    Request Filed & Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Entire Action
      Blank 16 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000
      Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice
        Blank 15 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000
        Hearing On Osc Was Set For 8/15/00 At 9:00 In Dept. 15
          Blank 14
          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
            Blank 13
            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
              Blank 12 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000
              Clerk`s Tickler Was Set For 6/05/00 At 7:00 In Dept Clk15
                Blank 11 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000
                Stage At Disposition- Case Settled Before Trial
                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000
                  Case Settled Before Trial/letter From Martin Gonsalves
                    Blank 9
                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000
                      Hearing On Osc Was Set For 4/26/00 At 9:00 In Dept. 15
                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
                        Case Entry Complete
                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
                          Color Of File Is Gold
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
                            Hearing On Status Conference Was Set For 5/31/00 At 8:30 In Dept. 15
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
                              Hearing On Osc Re: Failure To File Proof Of Service Was Set For 4/12/00 At 9:00 In Dept. 15
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
                                Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                  Blank 2
                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
                                    Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 15

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?