Gholami V. Shirazi
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC01-00840

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shahnaz Gholami, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson, C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gibson, C Martin +1 415 883 0166 +1 415 883 5081
v.
No Logo Behzad Shirazi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy, Gerald Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Murphy, Gerald Michael +1 415 835 3700
No Logo Colleen Shirazi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy, Gerald Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Murphy, Gerald Michael +1 415 835 3700
No Logo Farshad Kimiai, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelley Susan Buchanan +1 415 566 3526 +1 415 566 3548 buchananshelley@aol.com
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 3/5/2001
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 10/31/2001
Complaint 2 Type Cross Complaint
Complaint 2 Filing Date 4/4/2001
Complaint 2 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 10/31/2001
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001
Request Filed & Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Entire Action
    Blank 34 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001
    Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice
      Blank 33 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001
      Placed On Clerk`s Calendar For 11/21/01 At 7:00 In Dept. 17
        Blank 32 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001
        Stage At Disposition- Case Settled Before Trial
          Blank 31 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001
          Case Dispositioned - Settled Per: Buchanan Call
            Blank 30
            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
              Blank 29
              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                Blank 28 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001
                Status Conference Questionnaire Filed By Shahnaz Gholami
                  Blank 27
                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001
                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Farshad Kimiai
                      Blank 25
                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Shahnaz Gholami
                          Blank 23
                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001
                            (u.j.) Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 04/04/2001 Of Colleen Shirazi Filed By Shahnaz Gholami
                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001
                              Substitution Of Attorney Filed. Pro/per Substitutes Out As Attorney For Behzad Shirazi And Is Replaced By Gerald M. Murphy
                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001
                                Substitution Of Attorney Filed. Pro/per Substitutes Out As Attorney For Colleen Shirazi And Is Replaced By Gerald M. Murphy
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                  Summons Issued On The Cross Complaint Filed 04/04/2001 Of Colleen Shirazi
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                    (u.j.) Cross-complaint Filed By Colleen Shirazi, Behzad Shirazi
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                      (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 03/05/2001 Of Shahnaz Gholami Filed By Farshad Kimiai
                                        Blank 16
                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                          (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 03/05/2001 Of Shahnaz Gholami Filed By Colleen Shirazi, Behzad Shirazi
                                            Blank 14
                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                              Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 03/05/2001 Of Shahnaz Gholami As To Colleen Shirazi With Service Date Of 03/07/01
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 03/05/2001 Of Shahnaz Gholami As To Behzad Shirazi With Service Date Of 03/10/01
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                  Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Request For Entry Of Default Was Set For 7/17/01 At 7:00 In Dept. 17
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                    Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 03/05/2001 Of Shahnaz Gholami As To Farshad Kimiai With Service Date Of 03/07/01
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001
                                                      Notice Of Lis Pendens Filed
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001
                                                        Summons Issued On The Complaint Filed 03/05/2001 Of Shahnaz Gholami
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001
                                                          Case Entry Complete
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001
                                                            Color Of File Is Grey
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001
                                                              Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 6/04/01 At 7:00 In Dept. 17
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001
                                                                Case Management Conference Was Set For 7/23/01 At 8:30 In Dept. 17
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001
                                                                  Complaint Filed. Summons Not Issued
                                                                    Blank 2
                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001
                                                                      Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 17

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 784 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?