Slone Vs. Little
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC01-03868

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Walter Slone, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Derrick Forston, Defendant
No Logo Karen L. Little, Defendant
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 1/1/2001
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 02/15/2002
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002
Correspondence Memo Re: Motion To Reopen Case.
    Blank 26
    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
      Blank 25 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Court Filing
      Judgement Of Dismissal
        Blank 24
        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
          Blank 23
          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
            Blank 22
            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
              Blank 21 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002
              Request By Plaintiff To Appear By Phone/ Granted.
                Blank 20
                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002
                  Ex-parte Application For Req For A Reason For The Denial Of A Court Atty Filed By Walter Slone
                    Blank 18
                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/24/2001, Entered: 12/24/2001
                      Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Walter Slone
                        Blank 16 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001
                        5oscc4 Calendared On 01/14/02 In Dept. 18. Has Been Updated To 01/14/02 In Dept. 05.
                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001
                          5cmc4 Calendared On 02/15/02 In Dept. 18. Has Been Updated To 02/15/02 In Dept. 05.
                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001
                            Default Department Was Changed From 18 To 05
                              Blank 13 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001
                              Hearing On Osc Was Set For 1/14/02 At 9:00 In Dept. 18
                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001
                                We Cannot File/issue Your Motion For Court Apptd Attorney For The Following Reason:
                                  Blank 11
                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Court Filing
                                    Request For Court Apptd Attorney Denied By Judge William M. Kolin
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001
                                      Request For An Attorney Under The Civil Rights Act Of 1964 Filed By Waler Slone
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001
                                        Order Filed On Waiver Of Fees As To Walter Slone Is Granted
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001
                                          Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Filed By Walter Slone
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001
                                            Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 12/05/01 At 7:00 In Dept. 18
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001
                                              Case Management Conference Was Set For 2/15/02 At 8:30 In Dept. 18
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001
                                                Case Entry Complete
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001
                                                  Color Of File Is Lavender
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001
                                                    Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: 1/1/2001
                                                      Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 18

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?