Pereira v. Decierto
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC02-00886

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Frank Pereira, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Becky Decierto, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Johnson, Gary R +1 510 835 0500
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 4/3/2002
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 11/12/2002
Complaint 2 Type Complaint
Complaint 2 Filing Date 4/17/2002
Complaint 2 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 11/12/2002
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006
Copies
    Blank 39
    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
      Blank 38 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
        Blank 37 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002
        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
          Blank 36 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002
          Dismissal Filed/entered On The Complaint Filed 04/17/2002 Of State Compensationinsurance Fund
            Blank 35 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002
            Placed On Clerk`s Calendar For 12/02/02 At 7:00 In Dept. 17
              Blank 34
              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                Blank 33 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002
                Request Filed & Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Entire Action
                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002
                  Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice
                    Blank 31
                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                      Blank 30 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002
                      Status Of Settlement Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant
                        Blank 29 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                        Order Consolidating Actions C02-00886 And C02-01070
                          Blank 28 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                          This Master Case Is Consolidated With The Following Subordinate Cases: C02-01070
                            Blank 27 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                            Stipulation To Consolidate Actions C02-00886 & C02-01070 Filed
                              Blank 26 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                              Ex Parte Fee Collected For Stipulation To Consolidate
                                Blank 25
                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                                  Osc Hearing Re: Failure To File Dismissal Was Set For 11/04/02 At 9:00 In Dept. 17
                                    Blank 23
                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002
                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Becky Decierto
                                        Blank 21
                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002
                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Frank Pereira
                                            Blank 19
                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002
                                              Notice Of Time Of Hearing Issued
                                                Blank 17
                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002
                                                  Placed On Clerk`s Calendar For 9/30/02 At 7:00 In Dept. 17
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002
                                                    Stage At Disposition- Case Settled Before Trial
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002
                                                      Case Dispositioned - Settled Per Phone Call From Pltf (esther)
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002
                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Frank Pereira
                                                          Blank 12
                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002
                                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Becky Decierto
                                                              Blank 10
                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002
                                                                (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 04/03/2002 Of Frank Pereira Filed By Becky Decierto
                                                                  Blank 8
                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                    Case Entry Complete
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                      Color Of File Is Pink
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                        Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 6/25/02 At 7:00 In Dept. 17
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                          Case Management Conference Was Set For 8/21/02 At 8:30 In Dept. 17
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                            Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                              Blank 2
                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                                Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 17

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?