Mavity v. Mulvaney
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC02-02031

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lynn C Mavity, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Thomas F Mulvaney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Andersen& Associates +1 415 267 3600
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 7/10/2002
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 08/12/2004
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 52 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
Jury Fees Held In Trust Forfeited
    Blank 51
    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
      Blank 50 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004
      Request Filed & Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Entire Action
        Blank 49 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004
        Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice
          Blank 48 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
          Judgment Filed/entered-before Trial On 07/15/04
            Blank 47 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
            Return From Arbitration Award Of Arbitrator
              Blank 46 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
              Award Filed For Lynn C Mavity - $26,016.48 By Paul D. Hiles, Esq., Arbitrator Time Spent 5.75 Hours
                Blank 45
                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                  Blank 44
                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004
                    Placed On Clerk`s Calendar For 9/01/04 At 7:00 In Dept. 33
                      Blank 42 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004
                      Stipulation & Order To/for Binding Arbitration Filed
                        Blank 41 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004
                        Notice Of/to Change Of Firm Name & Address Filed On Behalf Of Thomas F Mulvaney
                          Blank 40
                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                            Blank 39
                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                              Blank 38
                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                Blank 37 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003
                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Lynn C Mavity
                                  Blank 36
                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                    Blank 35
                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                      Blank 34 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
                                      Special Set Hearing Was Set For 10/16/03 At 13:30 In Dept. 33
                                        Blank 33 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003
                                        Receipt For Jury Fees Posted
                                          Blank 32
                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003
                                            Jury Fees Posted By Al Hunter (by One Legal) On Behalf Of Thomas F Mulvaney
                                              Blank 30 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003
                                              Notice Of Unavailability Of Attorney Martin T. Gonsalves For Lynn C Mavity For Period 8/25/03 Thru 8/29/03 Filed
                                                Blank 29 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003
                                                Case Management Conference Order Filed.
                                                  Blank 28
                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003
                                                    Reply Fax Sent 6-6-03 To Joel Franciosa Re: Med Is Extended To 6-26-03. Req To Cont Cmc Is Denied
                                                      Blank 26
                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003
                                                        Statement Of Agreement Or Nonagreement - No Agreement
                                                          Blank 24
                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003
                                                            5fcmc1 Calendared On 03/06/03 In Dept. 165. Has Been Updated To 03/06/03 In Dept. 33.
                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002
                                                              Notice Of/to Change Of Firm Name Filed On Behalf Of Thomas F Mulvaney
                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002
                                                                Declaration Of Martin T. Gonsalves Filed Re: Selection And Engagement Of Mediator Michael Welch (emp Deadline 02-27-03)
                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002
                                                                  Stipulation & Order Re: Participation In Adr
                                                                    Blank 19
                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002
                                                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Lynn C Mavity
                                                                        Blank 17
                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002
                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Thomas F Mulvaney
                                                                            Blank 15
                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002
                                                                              Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Thomas F Mulvaney
                                                                                Blank 13
                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002
                                                                                  (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 07/10/2002 Of Lynn Mavity Filed By Thomas F Mulvaney
                                                                                    Blank 11
                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002
                                                                                      Original Summons On Complaint Filed 07/10/2002 Of Lynn Mavity Filed
                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002
                                                                                        Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 07/10/2002 Of Lynn Mavity As To Thomas F Mulvaney With Service Date Of 07/16/02
                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002
                                                                                          Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Request For Entry Of Default Was Set For 8/30/02 At 7:00 In Dept. 165
                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
                                                                                            Case Entry Complete
                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
                                                                                              Color Of File Is Green
                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
                                                                                                Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 9/17/02 At 7:00 In Dept. 165
                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Was Set For 11/27/02 At 8:30 In Dept. 165
                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
                                                                                                    Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 2
                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
                                                                                                        Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 165

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?