VRHABILIS, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:13-cv-01003
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 1:11 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VRHABILIS, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES HATCHER GRAHAM +1 478 953 5606 +1 478 953 0272 govlaw@hatcherlaw.mgacoxmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott D. Slater +1 202 616 0467 scott.slater@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 1/3/2014. Brief due by 1/20/2014. Cross Motions due by 2/7/2014. Response due by 2/21/2014. Reply due by 3/3/2014. Oral Argument set for 3/7/2014 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/20/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    **SEALED**DIGITAL AUDIO RECORDING of Proceedings (status conference) held on 12/20/2013 before Judge Allegra.. (si) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/20/2013 at 2:00 PM (EST)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/19/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/19/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Slater for USA . (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jb) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jb) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Injunctive Relief, filed by VRHABILIS, LLC. Response due by 1/6/2014.(jb) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION to File 1 Complaint Under Seal, filed by VRHABILIS, LLC. Response due by 1/6/2014.(jb) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                    **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by VRHABILIS, LLC. Redaction of 1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. (jb) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                      **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 076059) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by VRHABILIS, LLC. Answer due by 2/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 194 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?