TCYK, LLC v. Doe 24
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00643

Tags
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 9:55 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
Space Catherine Fly Yant +1 813 229 8008 cyant@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Doe 24, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (drn) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing case re 10 Notice of voluntary dismissal. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE the case, terminate any pending motions and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/12/2014. (LMF) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Yant, Catherine) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [6] Motion for Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 10/22/2013. (brh)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant. The Plaintiff shall have until April 30, 2014 in which to serve the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 1/24/2014. (brh) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Fee, Richard)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Motion To Extend TimeCourt Filing
              MOTION to extend time to serve defendant by TCYK, LLC. (Yant, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier.
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Related case order and track 2 noticeCourt Filing
                RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/17/2013. (BJH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
                  NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TCYK, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Standing Order re: 25 pagesCourt Filing
                    STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/9/2013. (drn)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                      CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (drn)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against Doe 24 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number FtM005080) filed by TCYK, LLC.(Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Civil Cover Sheet)(drn)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 102 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?