Malika Kinison -v- Troy L Pierson And Does 1-50
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. BCVBS00222

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Malika Kinison, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Antonio Caiati, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Campbell, Defendant
No Logo Stacey Pierson, Defendant
No Logo Troy Louis Pierson, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Cmp
Complaint 1 Filing Date 4/8/1993
Complaint 1 Status Active
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
Case Deleted From Active List
    Blank 17 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
    Dispo Before Trial - All Other Jdgmts ( 031898 ).
      Blank 16 Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994
      Doc Returned: Corres .
        Blank 15
        Minutes: Minutesconverted Hearing
          Blank 14 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 7/9/1993
          Vacate Cmc 111593 .
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 7/9/1993
            Case Dsmsssd Perct .
              Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 7/9/1993 Court Filing
              Dept 01 Judge Simmons ( 072093-10).
                Blank 11 Filed: 7/6/1993, Entered: 7/6/1993
                Req For Dismissal Filed W/prej ( All Causes Of Ac Tn As Agnst Troy;monte & Stacey Pierson Only)(071
                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/6/1993, Entered: 7/6/1993
                  393-10 ).
                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/24/1993, Entered: 6/24/1993
                    Ntc Of Osc Re: Service (hrg On 070993 @ 0830 In N Dd-1 ) Filed ( 062993-10).
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                      Asgnd Jdg (crt 130 ) (dept 01 ) (jdg Simmons)
                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                        Your Case Is On Fast Track; Case Sched For Cmc Hr G On 111593 @ 0830 ( 041593-10).
                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                          Summons Issued ( On Complt ).
                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                            Complaint Filed W/summons Issued (fee $182 Pd) ( 041593-10).
                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                              Jc-filing
                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                                P/i & P/d - Motor Vehicle
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                                  Attorney For Pltf Malika Kinison : Ralph D Slater .
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/8/1993
                                    P/i & P/d - Motor Vehicle

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 6,355 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?